Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1605553

EP1605553 - PRESSURE CONTACT HOLD TYPE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.03.2012
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.04.2012  [2012/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIN-ETSU POLYMER CO., LTD.
3-5, Nihonbashi Honcho 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0023 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/50]For all designated states
SHIN-ETSU POLYMER CO., LTD.
3-5, Nihonbashi Honcho 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SASAKI, Yuichiro, c/o Shinano Polymer Co., Ltd.
2146-5, Oaza, Hirooka, Tateishi
Shiojiri-shi, Nagano 399-0705 / JP
 [2005/50]
Representative(s)Peaucelle, Chantal , et al
Cabinet Armengaud Aîné
3, Avenue Bugeaud
75116 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/50]Peaucelle, Chantal , et al
Cabinet Armengaud Ainé 3, avenue Bugeaud
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date04720980.416.03.2004
[2005/50]
WO2004JP03476
Priority number, dateJP2003007376918.03.2003         Original published format: JP 2003073769
[2005/50]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004084356
Date:30.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1605553
Date:14.12.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2004
[2005/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.09.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/24
[2005/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDER DES DRUCKKONTAKTHALTETYPS[2005/50]
English:PRESSURE CONTACT HOLD TYPE CONNECTOR[2005/50]
French:CONNECTEUR A MAINTIEN PAR PRESSION[2005/50]
Entry into regional phase06.09.2005Translation filed 
06.09.2005National basic fee paid 
06.09.2005Search fee paid 
06.09.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2005Examination requested  [2005/50]
16.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/16]
02.12.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/16]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.06.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
08.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
16.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0838878  (DURTAL SA [CH]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 40 *
International search[X]JP2002246132  ;
 [X]JP2002340930  ;
 [X]JP2002158053  ;
 [Y]JPH1137131  ;
 [Y]JPS5849590U  ;
 [Y]JPS63150474U