Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1605917

EP1605917 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CROSS-LINKED GELATIN MICROBEADLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[2015/17]
Former [2005/51]For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DIGUET, Sylvain
28, rue d'Allschwil
F-68220 Neuwiller / FR
02 / HUBER, Torsten
Schildmatt 1
CH-4312 Magden / CH
03 / ULM, Johann
Im Goldbrunnen 32
CH-4104 Oberwil / CH
 [2005/51]
Representative(s)Schwander, Kuno
DSM Nutritional Products Ltd.
Wurmisweg 576
4303 Kaiseraugst / CH
[2015/17]
Former [2005/51]Schwander, Kuno
DSM Nutritional Products Ltd., Wurmisweg 576
4303 Kaiseraugst / CH
Application number, filing date04721495.218.03.2004
[2005/51]
WO2004EP02821
Priority number, dateEP2003000700927.03.2003         Original published format: EP 03007009
[2005/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004084862
Date:07.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1605917
Date:21.12.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004
[2005/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1605917
Date:22.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/16
[2005/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/17]
Former [2005/51]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERNETZTEN GELATINE-MIKROPERLEN[2005/51]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CROSS-LINKED GELATIN MICROBEADLETS[2005/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MICROBILLES DE GÉLATINE RÉTICULÉE[2015/01]
Former [2005/51]PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES GRANULES
Entry into regional phase05.07.2005National basic fee paid 
05.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.07.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/51]
03.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
05.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2015Fee for grant paid
16.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.09.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.01.2016   
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/08]
Opponent(s)01  20.01.2016   
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
26.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.12.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition30.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0280/17
03.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
19.12.2011Appeal received
05.03.2012Statement of grounds filed
23.03.2012Interlocutory revision of appeal
05.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.03.2004
AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
BG22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SE22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE18.03.2016
LU18.03.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/33]HU18.03.2004
AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SE22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
TR22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE18.03.2016
LU18.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU18.03.2004
AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
CY22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SE22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE18.03.2016
LU18.03.2016
Former [2017/40]AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SE22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE18.03.2016
LU18.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
IE18.03.2016
LU18.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
MC22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
LU18.03.2016
Former [2016/47]AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
LU18.03.2016
Former [2016/37]AT22.04.2015
BE22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SI22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT22.04.2015
CZ22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
PL22.04.2015
RO22.04.2015
SK22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
EE22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT22.04.2015
DK22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT22.04.2015
FI22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/49]FI22.04.2015
NL22.04.2015
GR23.07.2015
PT24.08.2015
Former [2015/42]NL22.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]US4670247  (SCIALPI LEONARD J) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB993138  (PFIZER & CO C) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0285682  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5126328  (CHAUNDY FREDERICK K ET AL) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO03017785  (LEUENBERGER BRUNO ; ROCHE VITAMINS AG (CH)) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5356636  (SCHNEIDER JOACHIM U ET AL) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP1074592  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9117821  (DANOCHEMO AS) [Y] 1-11 * example - *;
 [Y]FR2243727  (STORK AMSTERDAM) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5487916  (CHRISTENSEN BORGE H) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5364563  (STOLLER HANSJOERG ET AL) [Y] 1-11 * example - *;
 [Y]EP0982038  (BASF AG) [Y] 1-11 * example 1 *;
 [Y]US5811609  (JENSEN NINA MUSAEUS ET AL) [Y] 1-11 * example - *;
 [Y]EP0807431  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5668183  (LEUENBERGER BRUNO) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - CORTESI R ET AL, "Sugar cross-linked gelatin for controlled release: microspheres and disks", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (199809), vol. 19, no. 18, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 1641 - 1649, XP004161435 [A] 1-11

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(98)00034-9