Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1605917 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1605917



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 358
22.11.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.11.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.10.2019 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
23.10.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
27.09.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
27.09.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
19.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.07.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
19.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
17.07.2019 Communication about missing advise for delivery Appeal 2
01.07.2019 Communication about missing advise for delivery Appeal 2
04.06.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.05.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
28.05.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.05.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
24.05.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
21.05.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.06.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
11.04.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
16.08.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
11.08.2017 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.08.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 3
07.04.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.04.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Appeal 2
03.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.04.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
17.02.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
02.02.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
30.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
30.01.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
27.01.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.01.2017 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
01.12.2016 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
01.12.2016 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
01.12.2016 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.08.2016 Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.02.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
26.02.2016 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.01.2016 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
20.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.01.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.01.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
20.01.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
20.01.2016 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
20.01.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.01.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
20.01.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
20.01.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
20.01.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
20.01.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
20.01.2016 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
22.04.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.02.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.02.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
16.02.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
16.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.12.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.12.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.12.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.12.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 11
29.07.2014 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
23.03.2012 Decision on interlocutory revision Search / examination 1
06.03.2012 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 2
05.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
05.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.03.2012 Statement of grounds Search / examination 2
19.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.12.2011 Notice of appeal Search / examination 1
04.11.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
31.10.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
25.10.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
25.10.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
25.10.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
25.10.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
25.10.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 4
25.10.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
22.03.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
22.03.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.03.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
12.03.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.01.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.01.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.09.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
03.09.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.03.2006 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 2
09.11.2005 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.11.2005 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
16.09.2005 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 7
05.07.2005 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
05.07.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
15.02.2005 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.02.2005 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.02.2005 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.02.2005 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
15.02.2005 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
15.02.2005 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
15.02.2005 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
15.02.2005 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.01.2005 Notification of defects in the demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
27.10.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 14
13.10.2004 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.10.2004 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.10.2004 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.10.2004 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.10.2004 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
04.10.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 7
04.10.2004 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 12
29.04.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
29.04.2004 Claims International Searching Authority 2
29.04.2004 Description International Searching Authority 9