Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1605917


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.05.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
04.04.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
21.03.2017 New entry: Appeal number
21.03.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
21.03.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
21.03.2017 New entry: Interlocutory revision of appeal
13.02.2017 Change: Appeal number
13.02.2017 Deletion: Interlocutory revision of appeal
13.02.2017 Deletion: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
13.02.2017 Deletion: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
13.02.2017 Deletion: Appeal number
03.02.2017 Change: Appeal number
31.01.2017 New entry: Appeal number
31.01.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
30.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
21.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
13.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
25.02.2016 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
12.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
05.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
29.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
22.01.2016 Opposition filed published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
15.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
13.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
06.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
03.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
11.09.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.10.2015  [2015/42]
27.03.2015 (Expected) grant published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
13.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.02.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
19.02.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.02.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.12.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.11.2014 Change - French title published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
15.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.03.2012 New entry: Interlocutory revision of appeal
19.03.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2012 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
22.12.2011 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
22.12.2011 New entry: Appeal number
21.10.2011 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
30.03.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.04.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.03.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.01.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.08.2007 First examination report
30.08.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.04.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.06.2006 Change - extension states published on  05.07.2006  [2006/27]
06.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2005 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.12.2005  [2005/51]
04.11.2005 Request for examination filed published on  21.12.2005  [2005/51]
23.07.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
23.07.2005 Amendment by applicant
12.02.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
12.10.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
08.10.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
20.08.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
14.07.2004 PCT data prior to European publication