Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1605902

EP1605902 - CONTROLLED RELEASE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2008
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 22.09.2010  [2010/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
Midland, Michigan 48611 / US
For all designated states
Givaudan SA
Chemin de la Parfumerie 5
1214 Vernier / CH
[N/P]
Former [2007/35]For all designated states
Dow Corning Corporation
Midland, Michigan 48611 / US
For all designated states
Givaudan S.A.
5, Chemin de la Parfumerie
1214 Vernier / CH
Former [2005/51]For all designated states
DOW CORNING CORPORATION
Midland, Michigan 48611 / US
For all designated states
Givaudan S.A.
5, Chemin de la Parfumerie
1214 Vernier / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BOUZELOC, Sylvie
Rue du Val D'Heure 24
6110 Montigny-le-Tilleul / BE
02 / CREUTZ, Serge
Allée Bietlimé 40
B-4000 Rocourt / BE
03 / LEAYM, Tina, Marie
3245 Cristom Place
Saginaw, MI 48603 / US
 [2006/11]
Former [2005/51]01 / BOUZELOC, Sylvie
Av, General Jacques 8
B-1400 Nivelles / BE
02 / CREUTZ, Serge
Allée Bietlimé 40
B-4000 Rocourt / BE
03 / LEAYM, Tina, Marie
3245 Cristom Place
Saginaw, MI 48603 / US
Representative(s)Kyle, Diana
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/51]Kyle, Diana
Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date04723602.126.03.2004
[2005/51]
WO2004EP04011
Priority number, dateGB2003000699527.03.2003         Original published format: GB 0306995
GB2003002204420.09.2003         Original published format: GB 0322044
[2005/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004084844
Date:07.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/41]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1605902
Date:21.12.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2004
[2005/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1605902
Date:29.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/58, A61Q19/00
[2007/10]
Former International [2005/51]A61K7/00, C11D17/04, D06M15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG[2005/51]
English:CONTROLLED RELEASE COMPOSITIONS[2005/51]
French:COMPOSITIONS A LIBERATION CONTROLEE[2005/51]
Entry into regional phase19.10.2005National basic fee paid 
19.10.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.2005Examination requested  [2005/51]
28.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2007Fee for grant paid
04.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
CY29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SI29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
TR29.08.2007
BG29.11.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
HU01.03.2008
IE26.03.2008
LU26.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
[2010/38]
Former [2010/34]AT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
CY29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SI29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
BG29.11.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
HU01.03.2008
IE26.03.2008
LU26.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2010/33]AT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
CY29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SI29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
BG29.11.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
IE26.03.2008
LU26.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2009/41]AT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
CY29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SI29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
BG29.11.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
IE26.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2009/35]AT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
CY29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SI29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
IE26.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2009/29]AT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SI29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
IE26.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2009/11]AT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
EE29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
IE26.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2009/08]AT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
IE26.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2008/46]AT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2008/28]AT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
RO29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
SE29.11.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
Former [2008/25]AT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
CZ29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
SK29.08.2007
GR30.11.2007
PT29.01.2008
Former [2008/22]AT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
DK29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
GR30.11.2007
Former [2008/14]AT29.08.2007
CH29.08.2007
FI29.08.2007
LI29.08.2007
PL29.08.2007
Former [2008/11]FI29.08.2007
Cited inInternational search[PX]WO03083031  (BOUZELOC SYLVIE ; CREUTZ SERGE (BE); DOW CORNING (US)) [PX] 1-16 * page 3, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 1; claim - *;
 [PX]WO03082356  (SEGHIR HOURIA ; CREUTZ SERGE (BE); MICHEL BERTRAND (BE); LENOBLE BERTR) [PX] 1-16 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]WO0125389  (UNILEVER PLC ; LEVER HINDUSTAN LTD (IN); UNILEVER NV (NL)) [X] 1,2,9,11 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US6083900  (BARA ISABELLE ET AL) [X] 1,9,10 * column 3, line 59 - column 32; claims 1,6,9 *;
 [X]EP0118625  (MARTENS O DR & CO) [X] 1,9,10 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1; example - *;
 [X]WO9619119  (HUGHES IAIN ALLAN ; PROCTER & GAMBLE (US)) [X] 1,9,11 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 7, lines 2-6; claim - *;
 [A]WO9407461  (GIVAUDAN ROURE INT ; ROURKE BRIAN O (FR); SHORT JOHN NORMAN (FR)) [A] 1,3,4 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 5 *;
 [A]EP0549222  (DOW CORNING) [A] 15,16 * claim -; table 1 *