Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1608895

EP1608895 - DRIVE HEAT-EXCHANGER UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 28.10.2009  [2009/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Turbo GmbH & Co. KG
Alexanderstrasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2005/52]
Inventor(s)01 / BUSCH, Jörg
Weikersbergstrasse 51/2
89551 Königsbronn-Zang / DE
 [2005/52]
Representative(s)Koch-Huld, Annegret Christa
Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Friedenstrasse 10
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/52]Koch-Huld, Annegret Christa
Dr. Weitzel & Partner, Friedenstrasse 10
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date04724271.430.03.2004
[2005/52]
WO2004EP03354
Priority number, dateDE200311473331.03.2003         Original published format: DE 10314733
[2005/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004088175
Date:14.10.2004
Language:DE
[2004/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1608895
Date:28.12.2005
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004
[2005/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1608895
Date:08.11.2006
Language:DE
[2006/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:F16H57/04
[2005/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/52]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GETRIEBE-WÄRMETAUSCHER-EINHEIT[2005/52]
English:DRIVE HEAT-EXCHANGER UNIT[2005/52]
French:UNITE ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR-TRANSMISSION[2005/52]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2004National basic fee paid 
16.11.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/52]
22.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2006Fee for grant paid
09.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
GB08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
PL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
TR08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
ES19.02.2007
AT30.03.2007
LU30.03.2007
BE31.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
HU09.05.2007
[2009/44]
Former [2009/41]CY08.11.2006
CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
GB08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
PL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
ES19.02.2007
AT30.03.2007
LU30.03.2007
BE31.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
HU09.05.2007
Former [2009/10]CZ08.11.2006
EE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
GB08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
PL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
ES19.02.2007
AT30.03.2007
BE31.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/29]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
GB08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
PL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
ES19.02.2007
AT30.03.2007
BE31.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/22]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
GB08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
PL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
ES19.02.2007
BE31.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/11]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
GB08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
PL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
ES19.02.2007
BE31.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/04]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
GB08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
PL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
ES19.02.2007
BE31.03.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/50]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
GB08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
PL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
ES19.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/47]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
PL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
SI08.11.2006
SK08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
ES19.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/43]CZ08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
IE08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
PL08.11.2006
RO08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
ES19.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/29]FI08.11.2006
NL08.11.2006
PL08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
Former [2007/27]FI08.11.2006
PL08.11.2006
BG08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE19625357  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN) [AD] 1,7 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0812746  (VOITH TURBO KG) [AD] 1 * figures 1,2,4 *;
 [A]DE10058110  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2000356261  ;
 [A]EP0785379  (EATON CORP) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [PA]GB2387206  (COUNTYTRAC LTD ; FORD GLOBAL TECH INC (US)) [PA] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, & JP2000356261 A 20001226 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *