Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1609290

EP1609290 - MANAGING CONTEXT-RELATED INFORMATION WITH A MOBILE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.07.2010
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[2005/52]
Inventor(s)01 / JALKANEN, Janne
Aleksis Kiven katu 52-54
FIN-00510 Helsinki / FI
02 / HUOMO, Heikki
Vilkkupoiju 15 A 4
FIN-02320 Espoo / FI
03 / LAKKALA, Harri
Mäkipäänkatu, 28-30 E 130
FIN-33500 Tampere / FI
04 / SALMINEN, Ilkka
Teiskontie 10 A 13
FIN-33540 Tampere / FI
05 / SUOMELA, Riku
Hallituskatu 17 D 108
FIN-33200 Tampere / FI
 [2005/52]
Representative(s)Higgin, Paul , et al
Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/39]Higgin, Paul , et al
Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Former [2009/34]Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London
EC1A 7DH / GB
Former [2009/31]Higgin, Paul , et al
Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Former [2005/52]Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date04725462.802.04.2004
[2005/52]
WO2004IB50390
Priority number, dateUS20030460316P03.04.2003         Original published format: US 460316 P
[2005/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004089006
Date:14.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1609290
Date:28.12.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004
[2005/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1609290
Date:02.09.2009
Language:EN
[2009/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.01.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08
[2005/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/52]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWALTUNG VON KONTEXT-BEZOGENER INFORMATION MIT EINER MOBILSTATION[2005/52]
English:MANAGING CONTEXT-RELATED INFORMATION WITH A MOBILE STATION[2005/52]
French:GESTION DE DONNEES CONTEXTUELLES AVEC UNE STATION MOBILE[2005/52]
Entry into regional phase30.09.2005National basic fee paid 
30.09.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.2005Examination requested  [2005/52]
11.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2009Fee for grant paid
25.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.06.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
BG02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
TR02.09.2009
GR03.12.2009
PT04.01.2010
HU03.03.2010
IE02.04.2010
LU02.04.2010
CH30.04.2010
LI30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
BG02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
GR03.12.2009
PT04.01.2010
HU03.03.2010
IE02.04.2010
LU02.04.2010
CH30.04.2010
LI30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2012/42]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
BG02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
GR03.12.2009
PT04.01.2010
HU03.03.2010
IE02.04.2010
CH30.04.2010
LI30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2012/41]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
BG02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
GR03.12.2009
PT04.01.2010
IE02.04.2010
CH30.04.2010
LI30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/14]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
IT02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
GR03.12.2009
PT04.01.2010
IE02.04.2010
CH30.04.2010
LI30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/10]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
GR03.12.2009
PT04.01.2010
IE02.04.2010
CH30.04.2010
LI30.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2011/07]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
GR03.12.2009
PT04.01.2010
IE02.04.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2010/50]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
GR03.12.2009
PT04.01.2010
MC30.04.2010
Former [2010/35]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
DK02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/30]AT02.09.2009
BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/28]BE02.09.2009
CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/24]CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
SK02.09.2009
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/22]CY02.09.2009
CZ02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
PT04.01.2010
Former [2010/20]CY02.09.2009
EE02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
Former [2010/16]CY02.09.2009
FI02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
Former [2010/11]FI02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
SI02.09.2009
Former [2010/10]FI02.09.2009
NL02.09.2009
PL02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
Former [2010/09]FI02.09.2009
SE02.09.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1217859  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [X] 1-62,1-62,1-62 * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0017] , [0027] - [0034] - [0037] - [0043] - [0048] , [0049] , [0053] , [0056] * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0017] , [0027] - [0034] - [0037] - [0043] - [0048] , [0049] , [0053] , [0056] * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0017] , [0027] - [0034] - [0037] - [0043] - [0048] , [0049] , [0053] , [0056] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1241830  (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-62,1-62,1-62 * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0041] , [0072] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0041] , [0072] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] - [0041] , [0072] - [0074] *;
 [A]WO0211396  (HRL LAB LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-62,1-62,1-62 * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 9 * * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 9 * * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 9 *;
 [A]US2001047125  (QUY ROGER J [US]) [A] 1-62,1-62,1-62 * paragraphs [0013] - [0021] - [0028] , [0042] , [0043] , [0054] , [0061] - [0067] * * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0021] - [0028] , [0042] , [0043] , [0054] , [0061] - [0067] * * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0021] - [0028] , [0042] , [0043] , [0054] , [0061] - [0067] * * figure 4 *
 [A]  - MANDATO D ET AL, "CAMP: a context-aware mobile portal", SERVICE PORTABILITY AND VIRTUAL CUSTOMER ENVIRONMENTS, 2000 IEEE SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 1 DEC. 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (2001), ISBN 0-7803-7133-X, pages 52 - 61, XP010551463 [A] 1-62,1-62,1-62 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SPVCE.2000.934161
ExaminationWO0106364
    - PEDDEMORS A.J.H. ET AL, "Combining presence, location and instant messaging in a location aware mobile application framework", (20020320), pages 1 - 13, URL: https://doc.telin.nl/dsweb/Get/Document-21982/PLIM_d28.pdf
by applicantEP1217859
 WO0106364
    - A.J.H PEDDEMORS; M.M LANKHORST; J DE HEER, TELEMATICA INSTITUUT, (200203), pages 1 - 13