blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1612679

EP1612679 - PROGRAM HANDLING DATA, METHOD THEREOF, AND DEVICE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.09.2010
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.10.2010  [2010/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
For all designated states
SONY UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED
The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge
Surrey KT13 0XW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/01]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0001 / JP
For all designated states
SONY UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED
The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge
Surrey KT13 0XW / GB
Inventor(s)01 / TSUCHIYA, Kazuhisa
c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 1410001 / JP
02 / SYLVESTER BRADLEY, Gareth
SONY UNITED KINGDOM LTD. The Heights, Brooklands
Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB
03 / BEENHAM, Dudley, c/o SONY UNITED KINGDOM LIMITED
The Heights, Brooklands
Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB
 [2006/01]
Representative(s)Turner, James Arthur
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/01]Turner, James Arthur
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date04725509.602.04.2004
[2006/01]
WO2004JP04825
Priority number, dateJP2003010141104.04.2003         Original published format: JP 2003101411
[2006/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004090727
Date:21.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1612679
Date:04.01.2006
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2006/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.10.2004
ClassificationIPC:G06F12/00
[2006/01]
CPC:
G06F9/5027 (EP,US); G06F2209/5018 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/28]
Former [2006/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROGRAMMBEHANDLUNGSDATEN, VERFAHREN DAFÜR UND EINRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2006/01]
English:PROGRAM HANDLING DATA, METHOD THEREOF, AND DEVICE THEREOF[2006/01]
French:DONNEES DE TRAITEMENT DE PROGRAMME, PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF A CET EFFET[2006/01]
Entry into regional phase04.10.2005Translation filed 
04.10.2005National basic fee paid 
04.10.2005Search fee paid 
04.10.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.2005Examination requested  [2006/01]
15.09.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2001292412  (SONY CORP);
 [Y]JP2000276387  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [Y]  - YASUA, H. AND SAKAMOTO, H., "Meta Data no Yakuwari to Sekai Hyojunka no Doko", THE JOURNAL OF THE INSTITUTE OF IMAGE INFORMATION AND TELEVISION ENGINEERS, (20010320), vol. 55, no. 3, pages 328 - 331, XP002984676
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.