Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1616903

EP1616903 - FILTRATION DEVICE FOR VOLUME REDUCING GEL-LIKE POLYSTYRENE RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.09.2013
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hamano, Shigenobu
1-11, Sukematsu-cho 1-chome
Izumiotsu-shi, Osaka 595-0071 / JP
For all designated states
MEISHIN KOGYO KABUSHIKIGAISHA
758-1, Gotanda, Futamisuguchi-machi
Yatsushiro-shi, Kumamoto 869-5171 / JP
[2006/03]
Inventor(s)01 / HAMANO, Shigenobu
1-11, Sukematsu-cho, 1-chome
Izumiotsu-shi, Osaka 5950071 / JP
02 / HAYASHI, Noriomi
327, Futamisuguchi-machi
Yatsushiro-shi, Kumamoto 8695171 / JP
 [2006/03]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2012/46]
Former [2006/03]Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date04726763.809.04.2004
[2006/03]
WO2004JP05151
Priority number, dateJP2003010770611.04.2003         Original published format: JP 2003107706
[2006/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004092258
Date:28.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1616903
Date:18.01.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2004
[2006/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1616903
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.10.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:B29B17/02, B01D29/35, B01D33/11
[2012/22]
Former International [2006/03]C08J11/08, B01D35/02, B01D33/11
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/03]
TitleGerman:FILTRATIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR VOLUMENREDUZIERENDES GELARTIGES POLYSTYROLHARZ[2006/03]
English:FILTRATION DEVICE FOR VOLUME REDUCING GEL-LIKE POLYSTYRENE RESIN[2006/03]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FILTRAGE POUR RESINE DE POLYSTYRENE GELIFIANTE A REDUCTION DE VOLUME[2006/03]
Entry into regional phase07.10.2005Translation filed 
11.11.2005National basic fee paid 
11.11.2005Search fee paid 
11.11.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
11.11.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/03]
03.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2012Fee for grant paid
01.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.02.2010
Opposition(s)15.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
28.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.04.2004
AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
GB09.04.2013
IE09.04.2013
LU09.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
GB09.04.2013
IE09.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/20]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
GB09.04.2013
IE09.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/11]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
GB09.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
FR30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/09]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
GB09.04.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/08]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
CH30.04.2013
LI30.04.2013
Former [2014/01]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
MC14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/37]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
IT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/35]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/28]BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/27]BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/26]CY14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/24]CY14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
GR15.02.2013
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/23]CY14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
ES25.02.2013
Former [2013/21]SE14.11.2012
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPS5532695  (HEBERLE WILHELM);
 [A]JPH0533084B  ;
 [A]JPH05293827  (TOYO DAINAMU KK)