Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1623511

EP1623511 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2008
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2007/10]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2006/06]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BAKER, Matthew P.J., Philips Int. Prop. & Stand.
Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
02 / MOULSLEY, Timothy J., Philips Int. Prop. & Stand.
Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
 [2006/06]
Representative(s)Damen, Daniel Martijn , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2007/01]Damen, Daniel Martijn , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2006/06]White, Andrew Gordon
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, Cross Oak Lane Redhill
Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date04728378.320.04.2004
[2006/06]
WO2004IB01324
Priority number, dateGB2003001028903.05.2003         Original published format: GB 0310289
[2006/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004100394
Date:18.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1623511
Date:08.02.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2004
[2006/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1623511
Date:07.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/005
[2006/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2006/06]
English:COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2006/06]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION[2006/06]
Entry into regional phase05.12.2005National basic fee paid 
05.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
05.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/06]
12.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2007Fee for grant paid
22.01.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.12.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2003058821  (LU CHUNG HSIN ET AL) [A] 1-44 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0080] * * claim 1 * * figures 1,4,5b,6,7b,8,9 *;
 [A]US6529482  (LUNDBY STEIN A) [A] 1-44 * abstract * * column 2, line 15 - line 35 * * column 3, line 4 - line 67 * * column 5, line 56 - column 7, line 40 * * claims 1,5,19 * * figure 4 *;
 [A]EP1067706  (CIT ALCATEL) [A] 1-44 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0041] * * claims 1-8 *