Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1640787

EP1640787 - DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.02.2010
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.02.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.03.2010  [2010/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/14]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Former [2006/13]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TOKUI, Kei
2-24-7-B208 Honda-cho Midori-ku Chiba-shi
Chiba 266-0005 / JP
02 / IWAUCHI, Kenichi
125-1-104 Tonohiraga Matsudo-shi
Chiba 270-0004 / JP
 [2008/49]
Former [2006/13]01 / TOKUI, Kei
/
Osaka / JP
02 / IWAUCHI, Kenichi
/
Osaka / JP
Representative(s)Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [2006/13]Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
GB-London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date04729977.128.04.2004
[2006/13]
WO2004JP05669
Priority number, dateJP2003017628220.06.2003         Original published format: JP 2003176282
[2006/13]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004114004
Date:29.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1640787
Date:29.03.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004
[2006/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1640787
Date:01.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.12.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/13357, G02B6/00
[2007/27]
Former International [2006/13]G02F1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2006/39]
Former [2006/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANZEIGE[2006/13]
English:DISPLAY[2006/13]
French:ECRAN D'AFFICHAGE[2006/13]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2006Translation filed 
20.01.2006National basic fee paid 
20.01.2006Search fee paid 
20.01.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
20.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/13]
30.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2009Fee for grant paid
13.02.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5953469  (ZHOU XIAOCHUAN [US]) [Y] 1-14 * column 10, line 56 - column 11, line 14 * * column 17, line 3 - line 15 * * column 20, line 36 - line 40 * * figures 2,3,6C,15 * * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 1 * * column 16, line 22 - line 36 *;
 [Y]WO0221042  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 19 - line 26 * * page 7, line 8 - line 25 * * figures 1,2,6 *;
 [A]WO03040616  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; BRUNING GERT W [NL]; MUTHU SUBRAM) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 13 - line 19 *;
 [A]WO03009046  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]; KIMURA KOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1,2,13 *
International search[Y]JP2002049325  ;
 [Y]JP2000066168  ;
 [Y]JP2003029170  ;
 [Y]JP2001159871  ;
 [Y]JP2001235729  ;
 [XP]JP2004152515
ExaminationWO2004027499