EP1616461 - ADVANCED PROCESSING BASED ON A COMPLEX-EXPONENTIAL-MODULATED FILTERBANK AND ADAPTIVE TIME SIGNALLING METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby Sweden AB Gävlegatan 12A 113 30 Stockholm / SE | [2008/39] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Coding Technologies AB Döbelnsgatan 64 113 52 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGDEGARD, Jonas Wenströmsvägen 6 S-11543 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
VILLEMOES, Lars Mandolinvägen 22 S-175 56 Järfälla / SE | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2006/03] | Zinkler, Franz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 D-82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04730525.5 | 30.04.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004EP04607 | Priority number, date | SE20030001273 | 30.04.2003 Original published format: SE 0301273 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004097794 | Date: | 11.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1616461 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1616461 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04S3/00 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
G10L19/008 (EP,KR,US);
G10L19/02 (KR);
H03H17/0266 (EP,US);
H04S5/00 (EP,US);
G10L19/0204 (EP,US);
H04S2420/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERWEITERTE VERARBEITUNG AUF DER BASIS EINER MIT KOMPLEXER EXPONENTIALFUNKTION MODULIERTEN FILTERBANK UND ADAPTIVE ZEITSIGNALISIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/03] | English: | ADVANCED PROCESSING BASED ON A COMPLEX-EXPONENTIAL-MODULATED FILTERBANK AND ADAPTIVE TIME SIGNALLING METHODS | [2006/03] | French: | TRAITEMENT PERFECTIONNE REPOSANT SUR UN BANC DE FILTRES A MODULATION EXPONENTIELLE COMPLEXE ET SUR DES PROCEDES DE SIGNALISATION TEMPORELLE ADAPTATIFS | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06026639.2 / EP1768454 | EP09009940.9 / EP2124485 | EP10180679.2 / EP2265040 | EP10180688.3 / EP2265041 | EP10183592.4 / EP2265042 | EP17173333.0 / EP3244637 | EP17173334.8 / EP3244638 | EP17173336.3 / EP3244639 | EP17173337.1 / EP3247135 | EP17173338.9 / EP3244640 | EP20193070.8 / EP3823316 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | BG | 30.09.2009 | CY | 30.09.2009 | CZ | 30.09.2009 | DK | 30.09.2009 | EE | 30.09.2009 | FI | 30.09.2009 | IT | 30.09.2009 | NL | 30.09.2009 | PL | 30.09.2009 | RO | 30.09.2009 | SE | 30.09.2009 | SI | 30.09.2009 | SK | 30.09.2009 | TR | 30.09.2009 | GR | 31.12.2009 | ES | 10.01.2010 | PT | 01.02.2010 | HU | 01.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | IE | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | LU | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
LU | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 01.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
BG | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
IT | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
GR | 31.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
DK | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
NL | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.09.2009 | |
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 30.09.2009 | |
CY | 30.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 30.09.2009 | |
CZ | 30.09.2009 | ||
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
SK | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CZ | 30.09.2009 | |
EE | 30.09.2009 | ||
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
RO | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
PT | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 30.09.2009 | |
FI | 30.09.2009 | ||
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
ES | 10.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
PL | 30.09.2009 | ||
SE | 30.09.2009 | ||
SI | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 30.09.2009 | |
SE | 30.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9120167 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US]) [Y] 1-21,27 * page 7, line 4 - page 10, line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0843503 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US6104996 (YIN LIN [US]) [A] 22* column 6, line 9 - line 17 *; | [A]GB2353926 (CENTRAL RESEARCH LAB LTD [GB]) [A] 1-21 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 3; figures 1-3 *; | [YDA]WO03007656 (CODING TECHNOLOGIES SWEDEN AB [SE], et al) [YD] 1-21,27 * page 6, line 1 - line 2 * * page 6, line 13 - line 18; figure 1 * [A] 22; | [A] - SCHUIJERS E ET AL, "ADVANCES IN PARAMETRIC CODING FOR HIGH-QUALITY AUDIO", PREPRINTS OF PAPERS PRESENTED AT THE AES CONVENTION, XX, XX, (20030322), pages 1 - 11, XP008021606 [A] 1-21 * figure 9 * |