Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1618240

EP1618240 - PATTERNED SHEET PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  26.09.2014
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2014Revocation of patentpublished on 29.10.2014  [2014/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson and Johnson GmbH
Kaiserwerther Strasse 270
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
[2006/04]
Inventor(s)01 / RÜHE, Andreas
Haldenstrasse 6
CH-6300 Zug / CH
02 / VAN IMPE, Kristel
Aabachstrasse 4
CH-6300 Zug / CH
03 / HAUSER, Matthias
Am Schmerbroich 110
53757 St. Augustin / DE
04 / ROSATO, Pietro
Adalbertstrasse 8
51379 Leverkusen / DE
 [2006/09]
Former [2006/04]01 / RÜHE, Andreas
Haldenstrasse 6
CH-6300 Zug / CH
02 / VAN IMPE, Kristel
Engelmattstrasse 7
CH-6318 Walchwil / CH
03 / HAUSER, Matthias
Am Schmerbroich 110
53757 St. Augustin / DE
04 / ROSATO, Pietro
Adalbertstrasse 8
51379 Leverkusen / DE
Representative(s)Metten, Karl-Heinz
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/04]Metten, Karl-Heinz
Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date04730530.530.04.2004
[2006/04]
WO2004EP04627
Priority number, dateEP2003007632201.05.2003         Original published format: EP 03076322
EP2003007637205.05.2003         Original published format: EP 03076372
[2006/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004097096
Date:11.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1618240
Date:25.01.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004
[2006/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1618240
Date:30.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/46
[2006/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2006/19]
Former [2006/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FOLIENÄHNLICHES PRODUKT[2006/19]
English:PATTERNED SHEET PRODUCTS[2006/04]
French:PRODUITS EN NAPPE FAÇONNES[2006/04]
Former [2006/04]GEMUSTERTES FOLIEÄHNLICHES PRODUKT
Entry into regional phase17.11.2005National basic fee paid 
17.11.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/04]
27.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2006Fee for grant paid
20.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG
IP - Patente
Unnastasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Farrington, Edward John
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Gothenburg / SE
 03  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA TISSUE FRANCE
60, avenue de l'Europe
92270 Bois-Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
David, Daniel, et al
Gevers France
41, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
 04  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  30.05.2007  06.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/37]
Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG
IP - Patente
Unnastasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Farrington, Edward John
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Gothenburg / SE
 03  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA TISSUE FRANCE
60, avenue de l'Europe
92270 Bois-Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
David, Daniel, et al
Gevers France
41, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
 04  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  30.05.2007  06.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2014/36]
Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Farrington, Edward John
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Gothenburg / SE
 03  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE
60, avenue de l'Europe
92270 BOIS-COLOMBES / FR
Opponent's representative
David, Daniel, et al
Gevers France
41, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
 04  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  30.05.2007  06.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2013/32]
Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Farrington, Edward John
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Gothenburg / SE
 03  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA TISSUE FRANCE
60, avenue de l'Europe
92270 Bois-Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
David, Daniel, et al
Gevers France
41, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
 04  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  30.05.2007  06.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Dreiss, et al
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2013/15]
Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Farrington, Edward John
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Gothenburg / SE
 03  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA TISSUE FRANCE
60, avenue de l'Europe
92270 Bois-Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
David, Daniel, et al
Gevers France
41, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
 04  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  30.05.2007  06.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Friz, Oliver, et al
Dreiss Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2012/21]
Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Farrington, Edward John
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Gothenburg / SE
 03  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE
60, avenue de l'Europe
92270 BOIS-COLOMBES / FR
Opponent's representative
David, Daniel, et al
Gevers France
23bis, rue de Turin
75008 Paris / FR
 04  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  30.05.2007  06.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Friz, Oliver, et al
Dreiss Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2010/50]
Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Farrington, Edward John
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
S-417 56 Gothenburg / SE
 03  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Georgia Pacific France
23 Bld Georges Clemenceau
92415 Courbevoie cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
David, Daniel, et al
Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin
75008 Paris / FR
 04  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  30.05.2007  06.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Friz, Oliver, et al
Patentanwälte, Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Gerokstrasse 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2010/50]
Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Farrington, Edward John
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
S-417 56 Gothenburg / SE
 03  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Georgia Pacific France
23 Bld Georges Clemenceau
92415 Courbevoie cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
David, Daniel, et al
Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin
75008 Paris / FR
 04  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Boon, Graham Anthony, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  30.05.2007  06.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Friz, Oliver, et al
Patentanwälte, Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Gerokstrasse 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2009/36]
Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Farrington, Edward John
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
S-417 56 Gothenburg / SE
 03  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Georgia Pacific France
23 Bld Georges Clemenceau
92415 Courbevoie cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
David, Daniel, et al
Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin
75008 Paris / FR
 04  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Boon, Graham Anthony, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  30.05.2007  06.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Friz, Oliver, et al
Patentanwälte, Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Gerokstrasse 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2008/33]
Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Farrington, Edward John
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
S-417 56 Gothenburg / SE
 03  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Georgia Pacific France
23 Bld Georges Clemenceau
92415 Courbevoie cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
David, Daniel, et al
Cabinet Bloch & Associés 23bis, rue de Turin
75008 Paris / FR
 04  30.05.2007  29.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Boon, Graham Anthony, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  30.05.2007  06.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Friz, Oliver, et al
Patentanwälte, Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Gerokstrasse 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2007/28]
Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.05.2007  04.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Farrington, Edward John
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
S-417 56 Gothenburg / SE
 03  30.05.2007   
Georgia Pacific France
23 Bld Georges Clemenceau
92415 Courbevoie cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
David, Daniel, et al
Cabinet Bloch & Gevers 23 bis, Rue de Turin
75008 Paris / FR
 04  30.05.2007   
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Boon, Graham Anthony, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
GB-Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 05  30.05.2007  06.06.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Friz, Oliver, et al
Patentanwälte, Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Gerokstrasse 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2007/27]
Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007   
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 02  24.05.2007   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Farrington, Edward John
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
S-417 56 Gothenburg / SE
 03  30.05.2007   
Georgia Pacific France
23 Bld Georges Clemenceau
92415 Courbevoie cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
David, Daniel, et al
Cabinet Bloch & Gevers 23 bis, Rue de Turin
75008 Paris / FR
 04  30.05.2007   
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Boon, Graham Anthony, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
GB-Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2007/25]
Opponent(s)01  11.05.2007   
Beiersdorf AG Intellectual Property - Patente
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
04.07.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.01.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.12.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
24.07.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/44]
Appeal following opposition21.02.2011Appeal received No.  T0422/11
29.04.2011Statement of grounds filed
24.07.2014Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
24.07.2014Date of oral proceedings
29.07.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2008/41]
Former [2007/43]IT30.08.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]US4718152  (IMAI SHIGEO ET AL) [X] 1-11,13,15,18,19,21-28 * column 2, line 6 - line 45 * * column 4, line 51 - column 6, line 68; figures 1,3,4,6-13 *;
 [X]US4529480  (TROKHAN PAUL D) [X] 1-3,5-8,11,14,15,19,21 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 22 * * column 18, line 33 - column 20, line 15; figures 1-9 *;
 [X]US4127637  (PIETRENIAK EUGENE J ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-8,14,15,19 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 37; figures 2-4 *;
 [X]US6420013  (HO-KLEINWAECHTER MONICA ET AL) [X] 1-3,21 * column 1, line 19 - line 22 * * column 4, line 45 - column 6, line 14 * * column 7, line 37 - line 62; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO9719808  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO) [X] 1-3,21 * page 4, line 6 - line 16 * * page 5, line 4 - line 16 * * page 16, line 10 - line 29; figures 1,2,7-9 *;
 [AD]EP1032366  (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [AD] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1209270  (UNI CHARM CORP) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003019088  (CARTER NICK MARK) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0171081  (ISHIKAWA KENJI ; KAO CORP (JP); MACHII KOUJI (JP); SHIZUNO AKIHITO (JP) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [AD]EP0705932  (MCNEIL PPC INC) [AD] 1-29 * the whole document *