Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1694898

EP1694898 - POLYETHYLENE-BASED, SOFT NONWOVEN FARBIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Revocation of patentpublished on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fitesa Germany GmbH
Woltorfer Strasse 124
31224 Peine / DE
[2014/16]
Former [2007/09]For all designated states
Fiberweb Corovin GmbH
Woltorfer Strasse 124
31224 Peine / DE
Former [2006/35]For all designated states
Corovin GmbH
Woltorfer Strasse 124
31224 Peine / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HABERER, Markus
Weidenstrasse 34a
49080 Osnabrück / DE
02 / RÖTTGER, Henning
Else-Stapel-Strasse 23
24568 Kaltenkirchen / DE
 [2006/45]
Former [2006/43]01 / HABERER, Markus
Otawistrasse 25
13351 Berlin / DE
02 / RÖTTGER, Henning
Else-Stapel-Strasse 23
24568 Kaltenkirchen / DE
Former [2006/35]01 / HABERER, Markus
Otawistrasse 25
13351 Berlin / DE
02 / RÖTTGER, Henning
Habichtweg 4
38108 Braunschweig / DE
Representative(s)van Wijk, Alexander Pieter
Mainstay IP
Kallenkoterallee 82 A
8331 AJ Steenwijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/11]Schulz, Björn , et al
Maxton Langmaack & Partner
Postfach 51 08 06
50944 Köln / DE
Former [2011/14]Maxton Langmaack & Partner
Postfach 51 08 06
50944 Köln / DE
Former [2006/35]Maxton Langmaack & Partner
Postfach 51 08 06
50944 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date04730532.130.04.2004
[2006/35]
WO2004EP04640
Priority number, dateDE200316084520.12.2003         Original published format: DE 10360845
[2006/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005061773
Date:07.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1694898
Date:30.08.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005
[2006/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1694898
Date:06.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:D04H3/00, D04H1/54, D04H1/56, D01F8/04, D01D5/00, D01D5/08
[2006/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/35]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WEICHE VLIESSTOFFE AUS POLYÄTHYLENFASERN[2006/35]
English:POLYETHYLENE-BASED, SOFT NONWOVEN FARBIC[2006/35]
French:TEXTILE NON TISSE SOUPLE A BASE DE POLYETHYLENE[2006/35]
Entry into regional phase21.06.2006National basic fee paid 
21.06.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/35]
19.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2010Date of oral proceedings
30.03.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2011Fee for grant paid
25.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10002592.3  / EP2218811
EP10012719.0  / EP2341174
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.01.2012  16.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim/Bergstrasse / DE
Opponent's representative
Banse & Steglich Patentanwälte PartmbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/40]
Opponent(s)01  05.01.2012  16.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim/Bergstrasse / DE
Opponent's representative
Banse & Steglich
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23
80336 München / DE
Former [2012/07]
Opponent(s)01  05.01.2012   
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim/Bergstrasse / DE
Opponent's representative
Steglich, Gregor
Banse & Steglich
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23
DE-80336 München / DE
14.02.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.08.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
28.11.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.11.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
24.04.2018Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/30]
Appeal following opposition29.01.2014Appeal received No.  T0213/14
31.03.2014Statement of grounds filed
24.04.2018Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
24.04.2018Date of oral proceedings
03.05.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HU06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
SK06.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
IE30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
LU30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
GB06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
NL01.11.2013
[2016/07]
Former [2014/14]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HU06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
SK06.04.2011
TR06.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
IE30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
LU30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
GB06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
NL01.11.2013
Former [2013/47]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HU06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
SK06.04.2011
TR06.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
IE30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
LU30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
GB06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2013/45]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HU06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
SK06.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
IE30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
LU30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
GB06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2013/29]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
SK06.04.2011
CH30.04.2011
IE30.04.2011
LI30.04.2011
LU30.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
GB06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2012/01]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
MC30.04.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2011/49]CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
GR07.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2011/47]SI06.04.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2011/41]SI06.04.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2002138359  ;
 [X]EP0527489  (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 1,7,8 * page 3, lines 26-36 *;
 [X]EP1039007  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [X] 1,7,8,45 * paragraphs [0026] - [0043] *;
 [X]US2001003693  (GESSNER SCOTT L [US], et al) [X] 39 * paragraphs [0022] , [0026]; examples 3-5; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US2002114857  (FUJII TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 18-38 * paragraphs [0007] , [0029]; example 1 *;
 [X]US3792944  (CHIMURA K, et al) [X] 17 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 39 *;
 [A]US4283364  (CAPPS SPENCER W, et al) [A] 18-38 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 48; example 1 *;
 [X]US5616408  (OLESZCZUK ANDREW R [US], et al) [X] 45 * column 11, line 30 - column 12, line 56 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020904), vol. 2002, no. 09, [X] 1,7,8 * abstract *