Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1625716 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1625716



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 944
13.03.2014 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
13.03.2014 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
07.03.2014 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
21.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.02.2014 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
21.02.2014 French translation of claims Opposition 6
21.02.2014 German translation of the claims Opposition 6
21.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.11.2013 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
22.11.2013 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
22.11.2013 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
22.11.2013 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
22.11.2013 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.11.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.11.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.10.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 10
01.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.09.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.09.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.09.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
18.09.2013 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
18.09.2013 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 6
12.09.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
11.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.09.2013 Amended description with annotations Appeal 29
11.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.09.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
15.07.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.07.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
10.07.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 3
10.07.2013 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
24.06.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.06.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
13.06.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
13.06.2013 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
10.06.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
25.04.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
12.04.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.04.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.04.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
10.02.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
07.02.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
06.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
06.02.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.01.2012 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.11.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.11.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.11.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.11.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
24.11.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
24.11.2011 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 29
24.11.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
24.11.2011 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
24.11.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.11.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.11.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
24.11.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
24.11.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.11.2011 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.10.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
20.10.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
11.10.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
20.09.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
20.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.09.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 12
14.09.2011 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 2
10.09.2011 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
26.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.08.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
21.07.2011 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Opposition 1
15.07.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.07.2011 Invitation to file an authorisation Opposition 1
15.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.06.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.06.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
23.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 4
16.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 6
19.04.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 9
19.04.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
19.04.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 5
19.04.2011 Claims Opposition 5
19.04.2011 Claims Opposition 5
19.04.2011 Claims Opposition 5
19.04.2011 Claims Opposition 9
19.04.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
05.04.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
31.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
31.03.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.01.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.01.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.01.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
19.01.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.01.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.03.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.01.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
12.01.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
12.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
12.01.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.11.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 16
06.11.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
06.11.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
06.11.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
24.02.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
18.02.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 52
13.02.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
29.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2009 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
23.01.2009 Claims Opposition 2
23.01.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
21.01.2009 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
21.01.2009 Claims Opposition 2
21.01.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
19.01.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.01.2009 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
19.01.2009 Claims Opposition 2
19.01.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.01.2009 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
25.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
18.09.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
18.09.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
28.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
28.06.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
28.06.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
28.06.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 35
28.06.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 54
28.06.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
25.06.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.06.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
25.06.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
25.06.2008 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
18.10.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.09.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
27.09.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.09.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
27.09.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
27.09.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.08.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
30.08.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.08.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.08.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 44
06.08.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.07.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
31.07.2007 Claims Search / examination 6
31.07.2007 Claims Search / examination 5
31.07.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
31.07.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.07.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
06.07.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.06.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
19.02.2007 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
09.11.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
25.10.2006 Request for change of name Search / examination 2
02.02.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
02.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 6
02.02.2006 Description Search / examination 3
04.01.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
03.01.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.12.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.12.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
06.12.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.12.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
09.11.2005 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
22.09.2005 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.09.2005 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.12.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
10.12.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
10.12.2004 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 44
18.11.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
18.11.2004 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 49
10.06.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
10.06.2004 Claims International Searching Authority 9
10.06.2004 Description International Searching Authority 23
10.06.2004 Drawings International Searching Authority 15