Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1642437

EP1642437 - KEY AGREEMENT AND TRANSPORT PROTOCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.07.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2016New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Certicom Corp.
4701 Tahoe Boulevard
Tahoe A, 6th Floor
Mississauga, Ontario L4W 0B5 / CA
[2011/43]
Former [2006/14]For all designated states
Certicom Corp.
5520 Explorer Drive, 4th Floor Mississauga
Ontario L4W 5L1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / STRUIK, Marinus
723 Carlow Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M4K 3K8 / CA
 [2006/14]
Representative(s)Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/43]Fähndrich, Martin , et al
Hogan Lovells International LLP Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2011/52]Skone James, Robert Edmund , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2011/46]Cassie, Matthew David , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2011/38]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London
SW11 1BP / GB
Former [2011/18]Skone James, Robert Edmund , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2010/51]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London
SW11 1BP / GB
Former [2010/08]Rickard, David John , et al
Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London
SW11 1BP / GB
Former [2010/03](deleted)
...
Former [2006/14]Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter
Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10
50389 Wesseling / DE
Application number, filing date04733283.817.05.2004
[2006/14]
WO2004CA00727
Priority number, dateUS2003044048616.05.2003         Original published format: US 440486
[2006/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004102918
Date:25.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/48]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1642437
Date:05.04.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2004
[2006/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1642437
Date:31.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L9/06
[2006/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/14]
TitleGerman:SCHLÜSSELVEREINBARUNGS- UND TRANSPORTPROTOKOLL[2006/14]
English:KEY AGREEMENT AND TRANSPORT PROTOCOL[2006/14]
French:ACCORD SUR DES CLEFS, ET PROTOCOLE DE TRANSFERT[2006/14]
Entry into regional phase24.11.2005National basic fee paid 
24.11.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
24.11.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/14]
17.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2011Fee for grant paid
06.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.01.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.05.2012  14.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Infineon Technologies AG
Am Campeon 1-12
85579 Neubiberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fechner, Benjamin
Wendelsteinstrasse 29A
82031 Grünwald b. München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/28]
Opponent(s)01  31.05.2012   
Infineon Technologies AG
Am Campeon 1-12
85579 Neubiberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Fechner, Benjamin
Wendelsteinstrasse 29A
D-82031 Grünwald b. München / DE
06.07.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.01.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.05.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2015
01.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
11.04.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition21.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1365/16
22.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
03.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1365/16
11.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
05.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.05.2004
AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
PL31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
TR31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
IE17.05.2012
LU17.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
PL31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
TR31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
IE17.05.2012
LU17.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2014/21]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
PL31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
TR31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
IE17.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/29]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
DK31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
PL31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
BG30.11.2011
GR01.12.2011
ES11.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
IE17.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2012/26]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
PL31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
EE31.08.2011
IT31.08.2011
RO31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
SK31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
PT02.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
CZ31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
Former [2012/17]AT31.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
Former [2012/12]AT31.08.2011
CY31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
Former [2012/11]AT31.08.2011
SE31.08.2011
SI31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
Former [2012/10]SE31.08.2011
GR01.12.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0739106  (CERTICOM CORP) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 19 - page 10, line 37 *;
 [A]EP1282260  (SCM MICROSYSTEMS GMBH) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0016] *;
 [A]  - MENEZES A J ET AL, "Handbook of applied cryptography, PASSAGE", HANDBOOK OF APPLIED CRYPTOGRAPHY, CRC PRESS SERIES ON DISCRETE MATHEMATICES AND ITS APPLICATIONS, BOCA RATON, FL, CRC PRESS, US, (1997), ISBN 0-8493-8523-7, page 402,499, XP002247693 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *