blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1628041

EP1628041 - ELASTIC SUPPORT DEVICE AND POWER STEERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2011
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.01.2012  [2012/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/48]For all designated states
JTEKT CORPORATION
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
Former [2006/24]For all designated states
Favess Co., Ltd.
1-18, Miyama Shinpukuji-cho Okazaki-shi
Aichi 444-2106 / JP
For all designated states
TOYODA KOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Asahi-machi
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8652 / JP
For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka
542-8502 / JP
Former [2006/08]For all designated states
Favess Co., Ltd.
1-18, Miyama Shinpukuji-cho Okazaki-shi
Aichi 444-2106 / JP
For all designated states
TOYODA KOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Asahi-machi
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8652 / JP
For all designated states
Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HAMASAKI, Yoshiaki, c/o FAVESS CO. LTD.
1-18, Aza Miyama, Shinpukuji-cho
Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444-2106 / JP
02 / YOSHIHARA, Yoshihito, c/o FAVESS CO. LTD.
1-18, Aza Miyama, Shinpukuji-cho
Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444-2106 / JP
03 / TANIWA, Takashi, c/o FAVESS CO. LTD.
1-18, Aza Miyama, Shinpukuji-cho
Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444-2106 / JP
 [2006/08]
Representative(s)Steil, Christian, et al
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/08]Steil, Christian, et al
Witte, Weller & Partner, Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date04735345.328.05.2004
[2006/08]
WO2004JP07737
Priority number, dateJP2003015317729.05.2003         Original published format: JP 2003153177
[2006/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004106771
Date:09.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1628041
Date:22.02.2006
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2006/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.12.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.2007
ClassificationIPC:F16F15/08
[2006/08]
CPC:
F16F1/3732 (EP,US); F16F15/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2006/36]
Former [2006/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELASTISCHE STÜTZVORRICHTUNG UND SERVOLENKVORRICHTUNG[2006/08]
English:ELASTIC SUPPORT DEVICE AND POWER STEERING DEVICE[2006/08]
French:DISPOSITIF SUPPORT ELASTIQUE ET DIRECTION ASSISTEE[2006/08]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2005Translation filed 
01.12.2005National basic fee paid 
01.12.2005Search fee paid 
01.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/08]
20.01.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
03.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/01]
16.08.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2012/01]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.03.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB863720  (METALASTIK LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS6338732  (KINUGAWA RUBBER IND) [A] 1* the whole document *;
 [A]JPH0285529  (KINUGAWA RUBBER IND) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5307894  (HENEIN NABIL [DE], et al) [Y] 14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2001040325  (WOLF FRANZ JOSEF [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [XY]DE20213916U  (FAIRCHILD FASTENERS EUROPE [DE]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * [Y] 14;
 [A]US2003002919  (MORITA YUJI [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JPS60114267U  ;
 [Y]JPH09249035  (TOYODA GOSEI KK);
 [Y]JPH06286480  (MAZDA MOTOR, et al);
 [Y]JPH0269143U
ExaminationUS5277554
 US5651535
by applicantJPH11334616
 DE20213916U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.