Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1634958

EP1634958 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE CHROMAN-CARBOXYLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.01.2010  [2010/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.
5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8324 / JP
[2006/11]
Inventor(s)01 / KYUUKO, Youichi, Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co., Inc.
Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3004247 / JP
02 / KOSHIISHI, Sachiko, Mitsubishi Gas Chem.Co., Inc.
Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3004247 / JP
03 / HIDAKA, Toshio, Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co., Inc.
Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3004247 / JP
 [2006/11]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/11]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date04735497.231.05.2004
[2006/11]
WO2004JP07851
Priority number, dateJP2003015935304.06.2003         Original published format: JP 2003159353
[2006/11]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004108944
Date:16.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1634958
Date:15.03.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004
[2006/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1634958
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.12.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:C12P41/00, C12P17/06
[2008/01]
Former International [2006/11]C12P41/00, // C12P41/00, C12R1/72
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2006/37]
Former [2006/11]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OPTISCH AKTIVEM CHROMAN-CARBONSÄUREESTER[2006/11]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE CHROMAN-CARBOXYLATE[2006/11]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CHROMAN-CARBOXYLATE OPTIQUEMENT ACTIF[2006/11]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2005Translation filed 
01.12.2005National basic fee paid 
01.12.2005Search fee paid 
01.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/11]
21.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2008Fee for grant paid
10.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9640975  (SEPRACHEM INC [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *
International search[Y]JP2002167381  (KURARAY CO);
 [Y]JPH1180149  (KURARAY CO);
 [Y]JPH03119996  (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO);
 [Y]JP2003144190  (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO);
 [A]JPH04234871  (PFIZER);
 [A]JPH01225496  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE);
 [A]JPH11206398  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC)
 [A]  - FERORELLI S. ET AL, "Lipase-mediated kinetic resolution of rigid clofibrate analogues with lipid-modifying activity", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2001), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 853 - 862, XP004241707

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(01)00119-7