EP1640387 - MASONRY-TREATING AGNET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Akihiko Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND., Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 5668585 / JP | 02 /
MAEDA, Masahiko Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND. Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 5668585 / JP | 03 /
FUKUDA, Teruyuki Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND. Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 5668585 / JP | 04 /
MASUTANI, Tetsuya Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 5668585 / JP | [2013/52] |
Former [2006/24] | 01 /
UEDA, A., Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND., Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 5668585 / JP | ||
02 /
MAEDA, M., Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND. Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 5668585 / JP | |||
03 /
FUKUDA, T., Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND. Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 5668585 / JP | |||
04 /
MASUTANI, T., Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 5668585 / JP | |||
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
Ueda, A., Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND., Ltd. 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 5668585 / JP | ||
02 /
Maeda, M., Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND. Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 5668585 / JP | |||
03 /
Fukuda, T., Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND. Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 5668585 / JP | |||
04 /
Masutani, T., Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND Ltd 1-1, Nishihitotsuya, Settsu-shi Osaka 5668585 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04736265.2 | 07.06.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004JP08243 | Priority number, date | JP20030163462 | 09.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003163462 | [2006/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004108779 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1640387 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1640387 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/22, C08L33/14, C04B41/46 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
C08F220/24 (EP,US);
C04B41/4842 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSMITTEL FÜR MAUERWERK | [2006/13] | English: | MASONRY-TREATING AGNET | [2006/13] | French: | AGENT DE TRAITEMENT UTILISE EN MA ONNERIE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2006 | Translation filed | 09.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2004 | AT | 04.06.2014 | BE | 04.06.2014 | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | CZ | 04.06.2014 | DK | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | ES | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | NL | 04.06.2014 | PL | 04.06.2014 | RO | 04.06.2014 | SE | 04.06.2014 | SI | 04.06.2014 | SK | 04.06.2014 | TR | 04.06.2014 | IE | 07.06.2014 | LU | 07.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | GB | 04.09.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.06.2004 | |
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 07.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GB | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 07.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GB | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 07.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GB | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 07.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 07.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
IE | 07.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2762000 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2001002416 (MATAKAWA SHUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0240557 (ATOFINA [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1568721 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [E] 1-8* the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2003154307 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JPH01315471 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [X]JPS6399285 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [X]JPS6390588 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [Y]JPH07109317 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JPH11507687 ; | [Y]JP2000264757 (DAIKIN IND LTD) | by applicant | JPS5723662 | JPH07109317 | JPH11507687 | EP1225187 | JPH077677 | JPS6390588 | JPS6399285 | JPH01315471 |