Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1753381

EP1753381 - AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE CONTAINING FRAGRANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2013
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
[2007/08]
Inventor(s)01 / ALBINO, Robert
Plommonvägen 17
S-435 43 Pixbo / SE
02 / LIPSCHUTZ, Oscar
A902/57 Bay Street
Port Melbourne, VIC 3207 / AU
 [2007/22]
Former [2007/08]01 / ALBINO, Robert
Plommonvägen 17
S-435 43 Pixbo / SE
02 / LIPSCHUTZ, Oscar
Karl Johansgatan 5
S-414 59 Göteborg / SE
Representative(s)Andersson, Per Rune , et al
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/42]Andersson, Per Rune , et al
Albihns.Zacco AB Valhallavägen 117
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2010/29]Andersson, Per Rune , et al
Albihns.Zacco AB P. O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2007/08]Romare, Laila Anette , et al
Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date04736711.511.06.2004
[2007/08]
WO2004SE00911
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005120413
Date:22.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1753381
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005
[2007/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1753381
Date:17.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE22.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15, A61L15/46
[2012/19]
Former International [2007/08]A61F13/15, A61L15/46, A61K9/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/08]
TitleGerman:SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL MIT EINEM DUFTSTOFF[2007/08]
English:AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE CONTAINING FRAGRANCE[2007/08]
French:ARTICLE ABSORBANT A PARFUM[2007/08]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2004Translation filed 
08.12.2006National basic fee paid 
08.12.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.12.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/08]
05.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2012Fee for grant paid
06.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.12.2011
Opposition(s)18.07.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
21.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.06.2004
AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
IT17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
TR17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
IE11.06.2013
LU11.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
IT17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
TR17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
IE11.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/20]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
IT17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
IE11.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/08]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
IT17.10.2012
MC17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/37]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
IT17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
RO17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
Former [2013/24]BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
GR18.01.2013
ES28.01.2013
Former [2013/23]CY17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
ES28.01.2013
Former [2013/22]FI17.10.2012
NL17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
ES28.01.2013
Former [2013/21]SE17.10.2012
Cited inInternational search[X]US5951534  (CUMMINGS THEODORE P [US], et al);
 [XP]US2004127866  (ODORZYNSKI THOMAS WALTER [US]);
 [A]EP1090616  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]);
 [A]US5733272  (BRUNNER GORDON FRANCIS [US], et al);
 [A]US5591146  (HASSE MARGARET H [US]);
 [A]WO9309818  (WITTE STEFAN [SE]);
 [A]US6369290  (GLAUG FRANK S [US], et al);
 [A]US4186743  (STEIGER FRED H [US]);
 [A]WO9422500  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]);
 [A]US5769833  (HASSE MARGARET HENDERSON [US]);
 [A]US6746418  (PAULEY SUZANNE [US], et al)