Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1634365

EP1634365 - WIND FARM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2015New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Senvion GmbH
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
[2015/36]
Former [2015/27]For all designated states
Senvion SE
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Former [2013/02]For all designated states
REpower Systems SE
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
REpower Systems SE
Alsterkrugchaussee 378
22335 Hamburg / DE
Former [2006/11]For all designated states
Repower Systems AG
Alsterkrugchaussee 378
22335 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ALTEMARK, Jens
Kronwerker Moor 33
24768 Rendsburg / DE
02 / MATZEN, Björn
Am Dorfteich 6a
24395 Nieby / DE
03 / ZEUMER, Jörg
Eckenförder Strasse 15
24768 Rendsburg / DE
 [2007/12]
Former [2006/11]01 / ALTEMARK, Jens
Ricarda-Huch-Strasse 1A
24768 Rendsburg / DE
02 / MATZEN, Björn
Am Dorfteich 6a
24395 Nieby / DE
03 / ZEUMER, Jörg
Flensburger Strasse 46D
24768 Rendsburg / DE
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/11]Hausfeld, Norbert , et al
Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR
Beselerstraße 6
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2013/08]Wetzel, Philipp , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Beselerstraße 6
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2013/01]Emmel, Thomas
Schaefer Emmel Hausfeld Patentanwälte Krohnstieg 43
22415 Hamburg / DE
Former [2006/11]Emmel, Thomas
Schaefer Emmel Hausfeld Patentanwälte Gehölzweg 20
22043 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date04739904.315.06.2004
[2006/11]
WO2004EP06434
Priority number, dateDE200312734416.06.2003         Original published format: DE 10327344
[2006/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004114493
Date:29.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/53]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1634365
Date:15.03.2006
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004
[2006/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1634365
Date:02.01.2013
Language:DE
[2013/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:H02M7/48, H02J3/38, F03D7/04
[2006/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/11]
TitleGerman:WINDENERGIEANLAGE[2006/11]
English:WIND FARM[2006/11]
French:EOLIENNE[2006/11]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2005National basic fee paid 
09.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/11]
16.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2012Fee for grant paid
20.11.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11010030.2  / EP2434632
EP11010031.0  / EP2434148
EP11010032.8  / EP2434607
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.10.2013   
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/45]
Opponent(s)01  01.10.2013   
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
11.11.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.05.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.07.2015Date of oral proceedings
21.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.07.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition15.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1833/15
20.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
24.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
09.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.06.2004
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
AT15.06.2013
IE15.06.2013
LU15.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
AT15.06.2013
IE15.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/51]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
AT15.06.2013
IE15.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/20]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE15.06.2013
BE30.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
Former [2014/18]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
BE30.06.2013
Former [2014/08]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/49]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/48]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/40]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/37]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
Former [2013/36]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
Former [2013/35]CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
Former [2013/34]SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
Former [2013/26]SI02.01.2013
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE10040273  (WOBBEN ALOYS) [X] 1-3,8,18,25-34 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025]; figures 1,2,4 * * paragraphs [0050] - [0059] * [Y] 4,5,7;
 [Y]US4281376  (MUENCHOW EBERHARD ET AL) [Y] 7 * figure 9; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US5083039  (RICHARDSON ROBERT D ET AL) [Y] 4,5 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 13; figure 1 *