Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1648392 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1648392



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1239
15.03.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 2
06.12.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.12.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
01.12.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
01.12.2016 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
01.12.2016 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
01.12.2016 Means of redress Search / examination 2
01.12.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.11.2016 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.10.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.10.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.10.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 4
17.10.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.10.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
11.10.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
07.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.10.2016 Authorisation Search / examination 1
07.10.2016 Authorisation Search / examination 1
07.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.05.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.05.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.05.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.05.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
18.05.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.05.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
08.12.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
08.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
08.12.2015 Description Search / examination 1
08.12.2015 Description Search / examination 3
08.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.12.2015 Priority document Search / examination 61
08.12.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.10.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.05.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
29.05.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.02.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
05.02.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
15.12.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 1
12.12.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.12.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
26.09.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
28.06.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
25.06.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.06.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.06.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.06.2014 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
25.04.2014 Letter to the Legal Division Appeal 46
24.04.2014 Letter to the Legal Division Appeal 46
13.03.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
13.03.2014 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
28.02.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
28.02.2014 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 3
28.02.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.02.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.02.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
28.02.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
27.02.2014 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
27.02.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
26.02.2014 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 3
26.02.2014 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 10
26.02.2014 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 8
26.02.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
29.01.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.01.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.01.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 45
28.01.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.01.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 45
27.01.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 46
27.01.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.01.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 46
20.01.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
16.01.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
16.01.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
16.01.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
15.01.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
15.01.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
26.11.2013 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 6
14.11.2013 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 17
14.11.2013 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
12.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.11.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.11.2013 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 4
06.11.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.11.2013 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
04.11.2013 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
29.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.10.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
26.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.10.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.10.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.10.2013 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
18.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.10.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.10.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
11.10.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.10.2013 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
08.10.2013 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
18.09.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.09.2013 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 3
24.08.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.08.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.08.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.08.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.08.2013 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
14.08.2013 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
09.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.08.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
24.04.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.04.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
21.03.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
13.03.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.03.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.03.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
11.01.2013 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 3
03.01.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.12.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
18.12.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
18.12.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.12.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.12.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.12.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.12.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 30
18.12.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 50
18.12.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 50
17.12.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
29.10.2012 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 6
14.05.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.05.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
24.02.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.02.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.02.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.02.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.02.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.02.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
18.02.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.02.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.02.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.02.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
17.02.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
20.12.2011 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
15.12.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
09.12.2011 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
10.11.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
05.11.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
02.11.2011 Authorisation Appeal 1
02.11.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.11.2011 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
14.10.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 5
19.08.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
17.08.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
01.08.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 3
01.08.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
28.07.2011 Annex Search / examination 6
28.07.2011 Annex Search / examination 5
28.07.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
27.07.2011 Annex Search / examination 5
27.07.2011 Annex Search / examination 6
27.07.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
21.07.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
11.07.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 6
11.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 50
11.07.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 50
11.07.2011 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 5
11.07.2011 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 5
24.02.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
24.02.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 7
14.02.2011 Annex Search / examination 2
14.02.2011 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 3
25.01.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
25.01.2011 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
06.12.2010 Annex Search / examination 3
06.12.2010 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
01.12.2010 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
18.02.2010 Brief communication to third party Search / examination 1
08.02.2010 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 2
15.01.2010 Brief communication Search / examination 1
23.12.2009 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 6
08.12.2009 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 1
08.12.2009 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 1
04.09.2007 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
08.06.2007 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
08.06.2007 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
22.05.2007 Annex Search / examination 4
22.05.2007 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
21.05.2007 Annex Search / examination 1
21.05.2007 Annex Search / examination 4
15.05.2007 Annex Search / examination 47
15.05.2007 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 2
19.01.2007 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
24.11.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.11.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
24.10.2006 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 6
19.10.2006 Description Search / examination 2
19.10.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
19.10.2006 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
19.10.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
16.08.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
03.08.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.03.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.03.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
31.01.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
14.12.2005 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
02.03.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 34
10.02.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
10.02.2005 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 30
24.08.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
24.08.2004 Claims International Searching Authority 2
24.08.2004 Description International Searching Authority 27
23.08.2004 Authorisation Search / examination 2
23.08.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1