Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1654769

EP1654769 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF GROUP IB-IIIA-VIA QUATERNARY OR HIGHER ALLOY SEMICONDUCTOR FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2018Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 07.02.2018  [2018/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Johannesburg
Cnr. Kingsway and University Road Auckland Park
Johannesburg 2006 / ZA
[2018/06]
Former [2006/25]For all designated states
University of Johannesburg
Cnr. Kingsway and University Road Auckland Park
Johannesburg 2006 / ZA
Former [2006/20]For all designated states
University of Johannesburg
Cnr. Kingsway and University Road
2006 Auckland Park / ZA
Former [2006/19]For all designated states
Rand Afrikaans University
Cnr. Kingsway and University Road, Auckland Park
Johannesburg 2006 / ZA
Inventor(s)01 / ALBERTS, Vivian, @Dept. of Physics
Rand Afrikaans Univ
Cnr Kingsway & Univ. Roads
Auckland Park, Johannesburg 2006 / ZA
 [2018/06]
Former [2011/20]01 / ALBERTS, Vivian, Dept. of Physics
Rand Afrikaans Univ, Cnr Kingsway & Univ. Roads
Auckland Park, Johannesburg 2006 / ZA
Former [2006/19]01 / ALBERTS, Vivian, Dept. of Physics
Rand AfrikaansU niv, Cnr Kingsway & Univ. Roads
Auckland Park, Johannesburg 2006 / ZA
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/06]Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Former [2006/19]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date04744786.713.08.2004
[2006/19]
WO2004IB51458
Priority number, dateZA2003000631614.08.2003         Original published format: ZA 200306316
ZA2004000249730.03.2004         Original published format: ZA 200402497
[2006/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005017978
Date:24.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1654769
Date:10.05.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005
[2006/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1654769
Date:18.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/20]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1654769
Date:07.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.10.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/032
[2006/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/06]
Former [2006/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL13.02.2006
HR13.02.2006
LT13.02.2006
LV13.02.2006
MK13.02.2006
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LEGIERUNGS-HALBLEITERFILMEN DER GRUPPE IB-IIIA-VIA-QUATERNÄR ODER HÖHER[2006/19]
English:METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF GROUP IB-IIIA-VIA QUATERNARY OR HIGHER ALLOY SEMICONDUCTOR FILMS[2006/19]
French:METHODE DE PREPARATION DE FILMS SEMICONDUCTEURS EN ALLIAGES QUATERNAIRES OU SUPERIEURS DES GROUPES IB-IIIA-VIA[2006/19]
Entry into regional phase13.02.2006National basic fee paid 
13.02.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.08.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/19]
25.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2010
18.11.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
18.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2011Fee for grant paid
04.04.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10014635.6  / EP2284905
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.02.2012  28.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
 [2017/36]
Former [2012/13]
Opponent(s)01  20.02.2012   
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Opponent's representative
Metten, Karl-Heinz
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
22.03.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.09.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.12.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.07.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.09.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
20.12.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition22.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0425/16
29.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
28.07.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
IE13.08.2011
BG18.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
PT19.09.2011
EE31.08.2016
[2017/31]
Former [2013/45]HU18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
IE13.08.2011
BG18.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2013/29]PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
IE13.08.2011
BG18.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2012/11]PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2012/10]RO18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2011/52]SI18.05.2011
PT19.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/47]PT19.09.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]US5436204  (ALBIN ET AL) [A] 1-71 * column 3, line 60 - column 7, line 48 *
 [X]  - KUSHIYA K ET AL, "The role of Cu(InGa)(SeS)2 surface layer on a graded band-gap Cu(InGa)Se2 thin-film solar cell prepared by two-stage method", 25TH IEEE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, (19960513), pages 989 - 992, XP010208318 [X] 1-71 * the whole document *
 [DX]  - NAGOYA Y ET AL, "Role of incorporated sulfur into the surface of Cu(InGa)Se2 thin-film absorber", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200103), vol. 67, no. 1-4, ISSN 0927-0248, pages 247 - 253, XP004224767 [DX] 1-71 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-0248(00)00288-9
 [A]  - KUSHIYA K ET AL, "Formation Chemistry of polycrystalline Cu(InGa)Se2 thin-film absorber perpared by selenization of Cu-Ga/In stacked precursor layers with H2Se gas", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS, MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY, PITTSBURG, PA, US, (19960408), vol. 426, ISSN 0272-9172, pages 177 - 182, XP002092402 [A] 1-71 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KUSHIYA K ET AL COMMISSION OF THE EUROPEAN COMMUNITIES, "DEVELOPMENT OF Cu(InGa)Se2 THIN-FILM SOLAR CELLS WITH Zn-COMPOUND BUFFER", 13TH. E.C. PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE. NICE, FRANCE, OCT. 23, (19951023), VOL. 2 OF 2. CONF. 13, ISBN 0-9521452-7-8, pages 2016 - 2019, XP001140334 [A] 1-71 * the whole document *