Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1633013

EP1633013 - LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2012
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.09.2012  [2012/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP
[2006/10]
Inventor(s)01 / JITO, Daizo
6-1-29-508, Shimosawadori
Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6520047 / JP
02 / TAMURA, Noriyuki
3-5-21-202, Goinoike-cho
Nagata-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6530851 / JP
03 / SAKITANI, Nobuhiro
2-4-2-206, Zenkaiminamimachi
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP
04 / MINAMI, Hiroshi
5-3-4-407, Kashinodai, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-2275 / JP
05 / YAGI, Hiromasa
11-36-303, Hirota-cho
Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 6620837 / JP
06 / KAMINO, Maruo
2-12-15-608, Zenkaiminami-machi, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2109 / JP
07 / SAYAMA, Katsunobu
2-12-15-605, Zenkaiminamimachi
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP
08 / KATO, Yoshio
2-12-15-501, Zenkaiminamimachi
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP
09 / MATSUTA, Shigeki
1-18-14, Kashinodai
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512275 / JP
 [2011/40]
Former [2011/24]01 / ITO, Daizo
6-1-29-508, Shimosawadori
Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6520047 / JP
02 / TAMURA, Noriyuki
3-5-21-202, Goinoike-cho
Nagata-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6530851 / JP
03 / SAKITANI, Nobuhiro
2-4-2-206, Zenkaiminamimachi
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP
04 / MINAMI, Hiroshi
5-3-4-407, Kashinodai, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-2275 / JP
05 / YAGI, Hiromasa
11-36-303, Hirota-cho
Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 6620837 / JP
06 / KAMINO, Maruo
2-12-15-608, Zenkaiminami-machi, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2109 / JP
07 / SAYAMA, Katsunobu
2-12-15-605, Zenkaiminamimachi
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP
08 / KATO, Yoshio
2-12-15-501, Zenkaiminamimachi
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP
09 / MATSUTA, Shigeki
1-18-14, Kashinodai
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512275 / JP
Former [2008/01]01 / JITO, Daizo
6-1-29-508, Shimosawadori
Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6520047 / JP
02 / TAMURA, Noriyuki
3-5-21-202, Goinoike-cho
Nagata-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6530851 / JP
03 / SAKITANI, Nobuhiro
2-4-2-206, Zenkaiminamimachi
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP
04 / MINAMI, Hiroshi
5-3-4-407, Kashinodai, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-2275 / JP
05 / YAGI, Hiromasa
11-36-303, Hirota-cho
Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 6620837 / JP
06 / KAMINO, Maruo
2-12-15-608, Zenkaiminami-machi, Nishi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2109 / JP
07 / SAYAMA, Katsunobu
2-12-15-605, Zenkaiminamimachi
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP
08 / KATO, Yoshio
2-12-15-501, Zenkaiminamimachi
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP
09 / MATSUTA, Shigeki
1-18-14, Kashinodai
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512275 / JP
Former [2006/10]01 / JITO, Daizo
6-1-29-508, Shimosawadori
Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6520047 / JP
02 / TAMURA, Noriyuki
3-5-21-202, Goinoike-cho
Nagata-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6530851 / JP
03 / SAKITANI, Nobuhiro
2-4-2-206, Zenkaiminamimachi
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP
04 / MINAMI, Hiroshi
31-1-4003, Azayamashimo, Sasakino,Matsushige-cho
Itano-gun, Tokushima 7710200 / JP
05 / YAGI, Hiromasa
11-36-303, Hirota-cho
Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 6620837 / JP
06 / KAMINO, Maruo
31-1-3005, Azayamashimo, Sasakino, Matsushige-cho
Itano-gun, Tokushima 7710200 / JP
07 / SAYAMA, Katsunobu
2-12-15-605, Zenkaiminamimachi
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP
08 / KATO, Yoshio
2-12-15-501, Zenkaiminamimachi
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP
09 / MATSUTA, Shigeki
1-18-14, Kashinodai
Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512275 / JP
Representative(s)Merkle, Gebhard
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/41]Merkle, Gebhard
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Former [2006/10]Merkle, Gebhard
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date04745547.203.06.2004
[2006/10]
WO2004JP07691
Priority number, dateJP2003016369209.06.2003         Original published format: JP 2003163692
JP2003043247726.12.2003         Original published format: JP 2003432477
JP2004008091919.03.2004         Original published format: JP 2004080919
JP2004013274128.04.2004         Original published format: JP 2004132741
[2006/10]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004109839
Date:16.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1633013
Date:08.03.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004
[2006/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1633013
Date:12.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.12.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/052, H01M10/056, H01M4/02, H01M4/04, H01M4/38, H01M4/64, H01M4/66, H01M10/42
[2011/41]
Former International [2006/10]H01M10/40, H01M4/02, H01M4/04, H01M4/38, H01M4/64, H01M4/66
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/37]
Former [2006/10]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2006/10]
English:LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME[2006/10]
French:ACCUMULATEUR AU LITHIUM ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[2006/10]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2005Translation filed 
09.05.2005National basic fee paid 
09.05.2005Search fee paid 
09.05.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2005Examination requested  [2006/10]
27.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2011Fee for grant paid
23.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.04.2009
Opposition(s)13.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
18.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
19.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6235427  (IDOTA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8-15,18,23-25 * column 1, line 47 - line 25 * * column 3, line 16 - line 34 * * column 11, line 46 - column 15, line 65 * * column 25, line 14 - line 47 * [Y] 5-7,16,17,19-22,26-28;
 [Y]WO02058182  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [Y] 5-7,16,17,19-22,26-28 * the whole document *;
 [L]US2005100790  (OTA TAEKO [JP], et al) [L] 5-7,16,17,19-22,26-28 * used as translation for WO02/058182 A; paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0085] *;
 [DA]WO0129913  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [DA] 5-15,22,23,26-28 * the whole document *;
 [L]US6887511  (SHIMA MASAKI [JP], et al) [L] 5-15,22,23,26-28 * used as translation for WO 01/29913 A; column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 11 * * column 2, line 54 - line 63 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 35 * * column 5, line 5 - line 30 * * column 6, line 1 - line 62 * * column 7, line 28 - column 10, line 6 * * column 11, line 12 - line 26 *;
 [A]JP2003007305  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 6,7 * EPODOC Abstract *;
 [L]WO2004114453  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [L] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [T]EP1905739  (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [T] 2 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0117] * * examples 5,6 * * table 2 *
International search[A]JP2002289177  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]JP2003017040  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]JP2002319431  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]JPH0864246  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]JPH07249431  (TOSHIBA CORP);
 [A]JPH07176323  (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD);
 [A]JPH06124700  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]JPH06150975  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE);
 [A]JPH1040958  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD)
by applicantWO0129913
 WO02071512
 US4853304
 JPH06150975
 JPH06124700
 JPH07176323
 JPH07249431
 JPH0864246
 US6235427
 WO02058182
 JPH0963649
 JPH1040958
 JP2001307771
 JP2002329502
 JP2003086243