EP1650268 - HYDROPHILIC COLORING MATTER FOR RECORDING IMAGE, AQUEOUS COLORING AGENT FOR RECORDING IMAGE, METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECORDING IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO. LTD. 7-6 Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Michiei DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO. LTD. 7-6, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 1038383 / JP | 02 /
KOISO, Hideyuki, DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO. LTD., 7-6, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 1038383 / JP | 03 /
SAKAI, Naoyuki, DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO. LTD., 7-6, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 1038383 / JP | 04 /
ZAMA, Yoshiyuki, DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO., LTD., 7-6, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 1038383 / JP | 05 /
NOGAMI, Atsushi, DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO. LTD., 7-6, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 1038383 / JP | 06 /
SHIMANAKA, Hiroyuki DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO., LTD., 7-6, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 07 /
SASAKI, Seishichi, DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO., LTD., 7-6, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 08 /
SAIKATSU, Hiroaki, DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO., LTD., 7-6, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04745798.1 | 11.06.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004JP08204 | Priority number, date | JP20030167523 | 12.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003167523 | [2006/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004111135 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1650268 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09B69/00, C09B5/22, C09B47/16, C09B48/00, B41M5/00, C09D11/00 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
C09D11/037 (EP,KR,US);
C09B69/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2006/38] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROPHILES FARBMITTEL FÜR BILDMÄSSIGE AUFZEICHNUNG, WÄSSRIGE FARBMITTELFORMULIERUNG FÜR BILDMÄSSIGE AUFZEICHNUNG, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDMÄSSIGEN AUFZEICHNUNG | [2006/17] | English: | HYDROPHILIC COLORING MATTER FOR RECORDING IMAGE, AQUEOUS COLORING AGENT FOR RECORDING IMAGE, METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RECORDING IMAGE | [2006/17] | French: | MATIERE COLORANTE HYDROPHILE POUR L'IMPRESSION D'UNE IMAGE, AGENT COLORANT AQUEUX POUR L'IMPRESSION D'UNE IMAGE, PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION D'UNE IMAGE | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2005 | Translation filed | 11.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2005 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/38] | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05222328 ; | [X]JP2002275387 ; | [X]JP2002309118 ; | [X]GB1085680 (DU PONT) [X] 1-3 * page 9; claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE1619618 (DU PONT) [X] 1-3 * page 5; compound FORMEL I *; | [X]JPH01217077 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * pages 596-597; compounds 1-42 *; | [X]JPH039961 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 1; compound FORMULA I AND II *; | [X]EP0643110 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-3 * page 4, lines 22-45 * * page 4; compound I *; | [X]US2001008912 (WEBER JOACHIM [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 6; example 2a *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 39, Database accession no. 1993-309335, XP002548995 & JPH05222328 A 19930831 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-10,1-3,6-10,4,5 * abstract * * page 4; compounds I-1 TO I-5 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 19, Database accession no. 2003-187903, XP002548996 & JP2002275387 A 20020925 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-3,6-10 * abstract * * page 12; compound 20 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 19, Database accession no. 2003-188173, XP002548997 & JP2002309118 A 20021023 (FUJI FILM CORP) [X] 1,2,6-10 * abstract * * page 21; table 2; compound 110 * | [X] - BEHNKE M; TIEKE B, "Photoluminescent Amphiphilic 1,4-Diketo-3,6-diphenylpyrrolo-[3,4-c]-pyrrole Derivative and its Complexes with Polyelectrolytes", LANGMUIR, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020101), vol. 18, no. 10, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 3815 - 3821, XP002443446 [X] 1-3 * page 3816; compounds PMHB-1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la011773j | International search | [X]JPH05222328 (RICOH KK); | [X]JP2002275387 (RICOH KK); | [X]JP2002309118 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |