blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1640511

EP1640511 - METHOD FOR FABRICATING A WORKING ARM OF A CONSTRUCTION MACHINE. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/13]WORKING ARM FOR CONSTRUCTION MACHINE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME
[2010/28]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2012
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 06.06.2012  [2012/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd.
5-1, Koraku 2-chome Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 112-0004 / JP
[2011/09]
Former [2006/13]For all designated states
HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD.
5-1, Koraku 2-chome Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 112-0004 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAJIMA, Toru
1740, Kandatsumachi
Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Takeshi
73-1-602,Hitachinonishi,Ushiku-shi
Ibaraki 300-1206 / JP
 [2007/16]
Former [2006/13]01 / NAKAJIMA, Toru
1740, Kandatsumachi
Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Takeshi
A-201, Sun Garden Miyamoto, 2-21-2, Koyadai
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0074 / JP
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstraße 54
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Beetz & Partner
Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10
80538 München / DE
Former [2006/13]Beetz & Partner
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date04746548.922.06.2004
[2006/13]
WO2004JP09079
Priority number, dateJP2003018770130.06.2003         Original published format: JP 2003187701
[2006/13]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2005001211
Date:06.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1640511
Date:29.03.2006
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2006/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1640511
Date:02.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.01.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2009
ClassificationIPC:E02F3/38
[2006/13]
CPC:
E02F3/38 (EP,KR,US); Y10T29/49622 (EP,US); Y10T29/49634 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20305 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2006/40]
Former [2006/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG EINES ARBEITSARMS EINER BAUMASCHINE.[2010/28]
English:METHOD FOR FABRICATING A WORKING ARM OF A CONSTRUCTION MACHINE.[2010/28]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN BRAS DE TRAVAIL D'UNE MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION.[2010/28]
Former [2006/13]ARBEITSARM FÜR BAUMASCHINE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR
Former [2006/13]WORKING ARM FOR CONSTRUCTION MACHINE AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME
Former [2006/13]BRAS DE TRAVAIL POUR MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION
Entry into regional phase19.12.2005Translation filed 
19.12.2005National basic fee paid 
19.12.2005Search fee paid 
19.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/13]
01.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2011Fee for grant paid
12.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL02.03.2011
FR30.06.2011
[2012/23]
Former [2011/42]NL02.03.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2317595  (KASPAR KLAUS) [A] 1,8 * figures 2,3,8,10 *;
 [A]US4216895  (HOLMES TERRY M [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * claims 1,7 *;
 [A]US4257201  (LANDOLT CHRISTOPH A, et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * column 4, line 28 - line 66 *;
 [A]EP1302435  (EFFER S P A [IT]) [A] 1,8 * figures 4-10 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0063] *;
 [A]DE20218877U  (TEREX GERMANY GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,8* figures 4-8 *
International search[A]JPH1121939  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD);
 [A]JPH11158908  (KUBOTA KK);
 [A]JP2001020311  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY);
 [XP]JP2004124357  (KOBELCO CONSTR MACHINERY LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.