Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1650235

EP1650235 - VINYL MONOMER, POLYMER DERIVED FROM SUCH MONOMER, AND A LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE USING SUCH POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co., Ltd.
398 Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/17]For all designated states
SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO., LTD.
398 Hase
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 243-0036 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKASU, Takako, SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB. CO. LTD.
398, Hase Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa 2430036 / JP
02 / NOMURA, Ryoji, SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB. CO., LTD.
398, Hase Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa 2430036 / JP
03 / SEO, Satoshi, SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB. CO., LTD.
398 Hase Atsugi-shi
Kanagawa 2430036 / JP
 [2006/17]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/17]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date04747310.309.07.2004
[2006/17]
WO2004JP09842
Priority number, dateJP2003028068928.07.2003         Original published format: JP 2003280689
[2006/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005010063
Date:03.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1650235
Date:26.04.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005
[2006/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1650235
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.02.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2007
ClassificationInternational:C08F24/00, C08F28/06, C08F26/06, H05B33/22
[2006/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   NL [2006/44]
Former [2006/17]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VINYLMONOMER, DAVON ABGELEITETES POLYMER UND LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG MIT DERARTIGEM POLYMER[2006/17]
English:VINYL MONOMER, POLYMER DERIVED FROM SUCH MONOMER, AND A LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE USING SUCH POLYMER[2006/17]
French:MONOMERE VINYLIQUE, POLYMERE DERIVE DE CE MONOMERE ET DISPOSITIF ELECTROLUMINESCENT UTILISANT CE POLYMERE[2006/17]
Entry into regional phase03.02.2006Translation filed 
03.02.2006National basic fee paid 
03.02.2006Search fee paid 
03.02.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/17]
14.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.12.2008Fee for grant paid
22.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9011303  (BECKER WILHELM AB [SE]) [A] 1-35 * claim 1 *;
 [A]DE1593912  (IBM) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE1570808  (IBM) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *
International search[A]JPH0820614  (CHISSO CORP);
 [A]JP2000087027  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD)
 [X]  - BREDAS J.L. ET AL, "Electronic and nonlinear optical properties of polyarylene vinylenes and related conjougated systems", SPIE-THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (1988), vol. 971, pages 42 - 50, XP002981801
 [A]  - ANDERSON P.S. ET AL, "Synthesis of 9,10-Dihydroanthracen-9,10-imines", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 44, no. 9, pages 1519 - 15, XP002981802

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01323a032