Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1701011

EP1701011 - EXHAUST EMISSION CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2016New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hino Motors, Ltd.
1-1, Hino-dai 3-chome Hino-shi
Tokyo 191-8660 / JP
[2006/37]
Inventor(s)01 / OHYA, Toshiki, c/o Hino Motors, Ltd.
1-1, Hinodai 3-chome
Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8660 / JP
02 / ENDOU, Hiroshi
427-11, Kamifujisawa
Iruma-shi, Saitama-ken 358-0013 / JP
 [2013/19]
Former [2006/37]01 / OHYA, Toshiki, c/o Hino Motors, Ltd.
1-1, Hinodai 3-chome
Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8660 / JP
02 / ENDOU, Hiroshi
427-11, Kamifujisawa
Iruma-shi, Saitama-ken 358-0013 / JP
Representative(s)Köhler, Walter
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]Köhler, Walter
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2006/37]Köhler, Walter
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date04747403.612.07.2004
[2006/37]
WO2004JP09937
Priority number, dateJP2003039726627.11.2003         Original published format: JP 2003397266
[2006/37]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005052328
Date:09.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1701011
Date:13.09.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2005
[2006/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1701011
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP09.06.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:F01N3/02, F01N3/021
[2010/27]
Former International [2006/37]F01N3/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/10]
Former [2006/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ABGASREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2012/51]
English:EXHAUST EMISSION CONTROL DEVICE[2006/37]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT[2012/51]
Former [2006/37]ABGASENTGIFTUNGSVORRICHTUNG
Former [2006/37]DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'EMISSION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT
Entry into regional phase27.05.2006Translation filed 
27.05.2006National basic fee paid 
27.05.2006Search fee paid 
27.05.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2006Examination requested  [2006/37]
22.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2013Fee for grant paid
26.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.01.2014   
Tenneco GmbH
Luitpoldstrasse 83
67480 Edenkoben / DE
Opponent's representative
Thews, Gustav
STT Sozietät Thews & Thews Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 32
68165 Mannheim / DE
 [2014/11]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
18.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.05.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition11.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1622/16
14.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
15.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
06.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
18.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2003172119  (HINO MOTORS LTD; UNICAT INC) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027]; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO02077425  (LAGE PAULO T [GB]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1298289  (EBERSPAECHER J GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2003097248  (HINO MOTORS LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
International search[X]JP2003172121  ;
 [X]JP2003172119  ;
 [X]JP2003097248