Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1645943

EP1645943 - FORGERY PREVENTING LABEL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
06.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-Chome, Shinjuku-Ku
Tokyo 162-8001 / JP
[2006/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Azakami, Minoru, @c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-8001 / JP
02 / Ookawa, Hirotada, @c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-8001 / JP
03 / Ueda, Kenji, @c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-8001 / JP
 [2013/37]
Former [2006/15]01 / Azakami, Minoru, c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-8001 / JP
02 / Ookawa, Hirotada, c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-8001 / JP
03 / Ueda, Kenji, c/o Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-8001 / JP
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/37]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Former [2006/15]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date04747491.114.07.2004
[2006/15]
WO2004JP10025
Priority number, dateJP2003019621314.07.2003         Original published format: JP 2003196213
[2006/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005006166
Date:20.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1645943
Date:12.04.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005
[2006/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1645943
Date:11.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP20.01.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:G03H1/18, G09F3/02, B31D1/02
[2007/05]
Former International [2006/15]G06F3/02, G03H1/18, B31D1/02
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2006/42]
Former [2006/15]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:FÄLSCHUNGSVERHINDERUNGSETIKETT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[2006/15]
English:FORGERY PREVENTING LABEL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2006/15]
French:ETIQUETTE ANTI-CONTREFAçON ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2013/11]
Former [2006/15]ETIQUETTE ANTI-CONTREFA ON ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION
Entry into regional phase15.03.2005Translation filed 
17.03.2005National basic fee paid 
17.03.2005Search fee paid 
17.03.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.03.2005Examination requested  [2006/15]
16.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2013Fee for grant paid
19.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.04.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.02.2014   
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/13]
Opponent(s)01  18.02.2014   
Bundesdruckerei GmbH
Oranienstr. 91
10969 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
18.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.01.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.02.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition14.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0633/16
10.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
10.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
30.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]JPH1049052  ;
 [Y]JP2002072835  ;
 [Y]JP2000194265
ExaminationUS5310222