Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1647014

EP1647014 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGING A OVERWRITE RECORDING ON A WRITE-ONCE OPTICAL DISC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/16]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGING A OVERWRITE RECORDING ON OPTICAL DISC WRITE ONCE
[2011/40]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.07.2013
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-dong
Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2012/19]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20 Yoido-dong
Yongdung-po-gu
Seoul
150-721 / KR
Former [2006/16]For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-ku
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Yong Cheol
215-204, Jugong APT.
Wonmun-dong
Gwachon-si Gyeonggi-do 427-740 / KR
 [2012/36]
Former [2006/16]01 / PARK, Yong Cheol
215-204, Jugong APT. Wonmun-dong
Gwachon-si Gyeonggi-do 427-740 / KR
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2006/16]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date04748387.005.07.2004
[2006/16]
WO2004KR01653
Priority number, dateKR2003004531604.07.2003         Original published format: KR 2003045316
[2006/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005004123
Date:13.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1647014
Date:19.04.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2005
[2006/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1647014
Date:05.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR13.01.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/007, G11B20/10, G11B20/18, G11B20/12, G11B27/036, G11B27/32, G11B7/006
[2011/40]
Former International [2006/16]G11B7/007
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER ÜBERSCHREIBENDEN AUFZEICHNUNG AUF EINEM NUR EINMAL BESCHREIBBAREN OPTISCHEN DATENTRÄGER[2011/40]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGING A OVERWRITE RECORDING ON A WRITE-ONCE OPTICAL DISC[2011/40]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'UN ENREGISTREMENT AVEC ECRASEMENT SUR UN DISQUE OPTIQUE MONOSESSION[2006/16]
Former [2006/16]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG EINER ÜBERSCHREIBENDEN AUFZEICHNUNG AUF EINEM OPTISCHEN DATENTRÄGER, EINMALSCHREIBEN
Former [2006/16]METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGING A OVERWRITE RECORDING ON OPTICAL DISC WRITE ONCE
Entry into regional phase01.02.2006National basic fee paid 
01.02.2006Search fee paid 
01.02.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/16]
19.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2012Fee for grant paid
28.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.05.2009
Opposition(s)06.06.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
22.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.07.2004
AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
IT05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
TR05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
PT07.01.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
IT05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
TR05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
PT07.01.2013
Former [2014/14]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
IT05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
IT05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/28]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/23]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
Former [2013/22]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
Former [2013/20]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/11]AT05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/10]AT05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
Former [2013/09]AT05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT05.09.2012
Documents cited:Search[PXA]WO2004053874  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [PX] 1-4,9-11,14-16 * page 1, line 1 - page 18, line 10 * * figures 1-13 * [PA] 5-8,12,13,17;
 [PXA]WO2004053872  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [PX] 1,3,4,10,11,14,15 * page 1, line 1 - page 11, line 19 * * figures 1-16 * [PA] 2,5-9,12,13,16,17;
 [PXA]WO2004029968  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]; HAMELINCK DIRK [BE]; IJTSMA POPE) [PX] 1,3,9,10,14-17 * page 1, line 1 - page 10, line 11 * * figures 1-5 * [PA] 2-8,11-13;
 [XA]US5448728  (TAKANO SAKUHARU [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,14-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 13, line 50 * * figures 1-21 * [A] 3-13,17;
 [A]EP0428208  (LASER MAGNETIC STORAGE INT [US] PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 8 * * column 10, line 9 - column 17, line 47 * * figures 1-14 *
 [XA]  - TAKASHI YOKOZEKI ET AL, "A VIRTUAL OPTICAL DISK METHOD TO REALIZE REWRITABILITY AND REVISION CONTROL ON A WRITE-ONCE OPTICAL DISK", SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN, WILEY, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (19900101), vol. 21, no. 8, ISSN 0882-1666, pages 34 - 43, XP000177819 [X] 1,2,9,14,15 * column 1, line 1 - column 12, line 12 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 3-8,10-13,16,17
International search[A]US6160778  (ITO MOTOSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US6292445  (ITO MOTOSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US2001026511  (UEDA HIROSHI [JP], et al);
 [AP]US2004174785  (UEDA HIROSHI [JP], et al)
by applicantWO2004053874
 WO2004053872
 WO2004029968
 US5448728