EP1667762 - A CONNECTING DEVICE AND A METHOD OF CONNECTING MEDICAL SUBSYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/24] | A CONNECTING DEVICE, A MEDICAL SYSTEM, AND A METHOD OF CONNECTING MEDICAL SUBSYSTEMS | ||
[2008/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB Magistratsvägen 16 Box 10101 220 10 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB Magistratsvägen 16, Box 10101 220 10 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIESLANDER, Anders Väpplingvägen 17A S-227 38 Lund / SE | 02 /
LINDQVIST, Sten-Börje Plommongatan 3 S-240 14 Veberöd / SE | 03 /
BROMS, Ellinor Ekedalsgatan 49 C S-414 68 Göteborg / SE | 04 /
NILSSON, Eddie Munkatorp 1440 S-280 10 Sösdala / SE | 05 /
KJELLSTRAND, Per Ekvägen 25 S-247 36 Södra Sandby / SE | 06 /
JÖNSSON, Lennart Ägovägen 7 S-244 66 Furulund / SE | 07 /
CARLSSON, Ola Skyttelinjen 259 S-226 49 Lund / SE | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Berglund, Stefan Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB P.O. Box 5366 102 49 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Berglund, Stefan Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58 114 50 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 04749205.3 | 16.08.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004SE01199 | Priority number, date | SE20030002225 | 15.08.2003 Original published format: SE 0302225 | US20040536175P | 12.01.2004 Original published format: US 536175 P | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005016443 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667762 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1667762 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/18, A61J1/00, A61M1/28 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
A61M39/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61M39/10 (KR);
A61M39/16 (KR);
A61M1/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG VON MEDIZINISCHEN UNTERSYSTEMEN | [2008/29] | English: | A CONNECTING DEVICE AND A METHOD OF CONNECTING MEDICAL SUBSYSTEMS | [2008/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT ET PROCEDE DE RACCORDEMENT DE SOUS-SYSTEMES MEDICAUX | [2008/29] |
Former [2006/24] | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG, MEDIZINISCHES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG VON MEDIZINISCHEN UNTERSYSTEMEN | ||
Former [2006/24] | A CONNECTING DEVICE, A MEDICAL SYSTEM, AND A METHOD OF CONNECTING MEDICAL SUBSYSTEMS | ||
Former [2006/24] | DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT, SYSTEME MEDICAL ET PROCEDE DE RACCORDEMENT DE SOUS-SYSTEMES MEDICAUX | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 20.10.2008 | [2008/48] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.02.2009 | BE | 18.02.2009 | CY | 18.02.2009 | CZ | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | EE | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | NL | 18.02.2009 | PL | 18.02.2009 | RO | 18.02.2009 | SI | 18.02.2009 | SK | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | BG | 18.05.2009 | SE | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | PT | 18.07.2009 | IE | 16.08.2009 | LU | 16.08.2009 | HU | 19.08.2009 | CH | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | [2012/41] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CY | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
TR | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IE | 16.08.2009 | ||
LU | 16.08.2009 | ||
HU | 19.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IE | 16.08.2009 | ||
LU | 16.08.2009 | ||
HU | 19.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IE | 16.08.2009 | ||
LU | 16.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IE | 16.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
IE | 16.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 18.02.2009 | |
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 18.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001037874 ; | [Y]JP2001238945 ; | [A]US4655753 (BELLOTTI MARC C [US], et al); | [A]US4882496 (BELLOTTI MARC [US], et al); | [X]US6293921 (SHINMOTO KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, & JP2001037874 A 20010213 (JAPAN SERVO CO LTD;JMS CO LTD) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020701), vol. 2000, no. 26, & JP2001238945 A 20010904 (NIIMOTO KAZUHIRO) |