Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1617767

EP1617767 - SYSTEMS FOR SURGICAL SLING DELIVERY AND PLACEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/04]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SLING DELIVERY AND PLACEMENT
[2012/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2013
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.09.2013  [2013/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
The Corporate Center, Bush Hill Bay Street
St. Michael / BB
[2006/04]
Inventor(s)01 / CHU, Michael, S., H.
121 Browne Street
Brookline, MS 02446 / US
02 / MCGRATH, Michael, G.
19 Ostego Drive
Hudson, MA 01749 / US
03 / MACLEAN, Brian, Charles
117 Central Street
Apartment 11E
Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US
04 / DAIGNAULT, Kenneth, J.
50 Winfield Road
Holden, MA 01520 / US
 [2012/39]
Former [2006/18]01 / CHU, Michael, S., H.
121 Browne Street
Brookline, MS 02446 / US
02 / MCGRATH, Michael, G.
19 Ostego Drive
Hudson, MA 01749 / US
03 / MACLEAN, Brian, Charles
117 Central Street Apartment 11E
Acton, Massachusetts 01720 / US
04 / DAIGNAULT, Kenneth, J.
50 Winfield Road
Holden, MA 01520 / US
Former [2006/04]01 / CHU, Michael, S., H.
121 Browne Street
Brookline, MS 02446 / US
02 / MCGRATH, Michael, G.
19 Ostego Drive
Hudson, MA 01749 / US
03 / MACLEAN, Brian, Charles
7 Charlotte Road
Waltham, MA 02453 / US
04 / DAIGNAULT, Kenneth, J.
50 Winfield Road
Holden, MA 01520 / US
Representative(s)Peterreins, Frank , et al
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8
80807 München / DE
[2012/39]
Former [2008/33]Peterreins, Frank , et al
Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8
80807 München / DE
Former [2006/04]Wilson, Alan Stuart
Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date04750687.826.04.2004
[2006/04]
WO2004US12857
Priority number, dateUS20030465722P25.04.2003         Original published format: US 465722 P
[2006/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004096088
Date:11.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1617767
Date:25.01.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2004
[2006/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1617767
Date:26.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/00, A61B17/06
[2012/14]
Former International [2006/04]A61B17/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   NL [2006/31]
Former [2006/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEME FÜR DIE CHIRURGISCHE SCHLINGENABGABE UND PLATZIERUNG[2012/14]
English:SYSTEMS FOR SURGICAL SLING DELIVERY AND PLACEMENT[2012/14]
French:SYSTEMES D'INTRODUCTION ET DE MISE EN PLACE DE FRONDE CHIRURGICALE[2012/14]
Former [2006/04]SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE SCHLINGENABGABE UND PLATZIERUNG
Former [2006/04]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SLING DELIVERY AND PLACEMENT
Former [2006/04]SYSTEMES ET METHODES D'INTRODUCTION ET DE MISE EN PLACE DE FRONDE
Entry into regional phase16.11.2005National basic fee paid 
16.11.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/04]
08.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2012Fee for grant paid
16.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12162604.8  / EP2471468
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.06.2010
Opposition(s)27.06.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL26.09.2012
[2013/22]
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1093758  (KALADELFOS GEORGE [AU]) [Y] 1-11,14-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0005]; figures 3,5,8 *;
 [YX]US2003009181  (GELLMAN BARRY N [US], et al) [Y] 1-11,14-18 * paragraphs [0006] , [0160] , [0198]; figures 1A,6,8A,17 * [X] 25,28-35;
 [Y]US2003045774  (STASKIN DAVID R [US], et al) [Y] 1-11,14-18 * paragraph [0127]; figures 1,4,5,10e,11 *;
 [A]WO9835616  (BOSTON SCIENT IRELAND LTD [BB], et al) [A] 12,13 * pages 31,47; figures 2,15; claims 81,82 *;
 [AY]US6110101  (TIHON CLAUDE [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 3,13 * [Y] 25,26,28-35;
 [Y]WO9207517  (MOSS GERALD [US]) [Y] 25,26,28-35 * page 10; figures 3,6-8 *;
 [Y]US5439467  (BENDEREV THEODORE V [US], et al) [Y] 25,26,28-30,32,33,35 * column 4, lines 28-48 - column 6, lines 31-36; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9747246  (INFLUENCE MED TECH LTD [IL], et al) [A] 25,27,29 * page 12, line 27; figures 3B,4A,4B *;
 [A]US2002091373  (BERGER YITZHAK [US]) [A] 26,27 * figure 7 *;
 [A]US5362294  (SEITZINGER MICHAEL R [US]) [A] 26,27 * figures 1,3 *
by applicantEP1093758
 US2003009181