Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1624810

EP1624810 - FIXATION DEVICES AND SYSTEMS FOR ENGAGING TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/07]FIXATION DEVICES, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ENGAGING TISSUE
[2017/01]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evalve, Inc.
4045 Campbell Avenue
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2009/30]
Former [2006/07]For all designated states
Evalve, Inc.
2761A Fair Oaks Avenue
Redwood City, California 94063 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOLDFARB, Eric, A.
140 Jersey Street
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
02 / RASCHDORF, Alfred, H. Jr.
3421A 16th Street
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
03 / SARABIA, Jaime, E.
5128 Stoneywood Circle
Mableton, GA 30126 / US
04 / FAN, Sylvia Wen Chin
157 Ruby Avenue
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
05 / DELL, Kent, D.
1131 Grand Street
Redwood City, California 94061 / US
06 / KOMTEBEDDE, Jan
23360 Deerfield Road
Los Gatos, California 95033 / US
07 / POWELL, Ferolyn, T.
55 Caselli Avenue
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
 [2007/22]
Former [2007/13]01 / GOLDFARB, Eric, A.
140 Jersey Street
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
02 / RASCHDORF, Alfred, H. Jr.
3421A 16th Street
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
03 / SARABIA, Jaime, E.
5128 Stoneywood Circle
Mableton, GA 30126 / US
04 / FAN, Sylvia Wen Chin
3868 21st Street 2
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
05 / DELL, Kent, D.
1131 Grand Street
Redwood City, California 94061 / US
06 / KOMTEBEDDE, Jan
23360 Deerfield Road
Los Gatos, California 95033 / US
07 / POWELL, Ferolyn, T.
55 Caselli Avenue
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
Former [2006/07]01 / GOLDFARB, Eric, A.
140 Jersey Street
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
02 / RASCHDORF, Alfred, H. Jr.
3421A 16th Street
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
03 / SARABIA, Jaime, E.
467 S. 3rd Street 1
San Jose, California 95112 / US
04 / FAN, Sylvia Wen Chin
3868 21st Street 2
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
05 / DELL, Kent, D.
1131 Grand Street
Redwood City, California 94061 / US
06 / KOMTEBEDDE, Jan
23360 Deerfield Road
Los Gatos, California 95033 / US
07 / POWELL, Ferolyn, T.
55 Caselli Avenue
San Francisco, California 94114 / US
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/27]Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2006/07]Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date04752603.318.05.2004
[2006/07]
WO2004US15609
Priority number, dateUS2003044153119.05.2003         Original published format: US 441531
US2003044168719.05.2003         Original published format: US 441687
US2003044150819.05.2003         Original published format: US 441508
[2006/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004103162
Date:02.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/49]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1624810
Date:15.02.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004
[2006/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1624810
Date:05.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.08.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04
[2006/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/27]
Former [2006/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:FIXIERUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN UND SYSTEME ZUM EINGRIFF IN GEWEBE[2017/01]
English:FIXATION DEVICES AND SYSTEMS FOR ENGAGING TISSUE[2017/01]
French:DISPOSITIFS DE FIXATION ET SYSTEMES PERMETTANT DE PENETRER DANS UN TISSU[2017/01]
Former [2006/07]FIXIERUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINGRIFF IN GEWEBE
Former [2006/07]FIXATION DEVICES, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ENGAGING TISSUE
Former [2006/07]DISPOSITIFS DE FIXATION, SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE PENETRER DANS UN TISSU
Entry into regional phase30.11.2005National basic fee paid 
30.11.2005Search fee paid 
30.11.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/07]
12.05.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2017Fee for grant paid
23.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17175101.9  / EP3248550
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.03.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.04.2018  12.04.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Opponent's representative
Somerville, Andrew Edward
Somerville Associates
Dunston Innovation Centre
Dunston Road
Chesterfield S41 8NG / GB
 02  27.03.2019  28.03.2019  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Lifesciences Services GmbH
Edisonstrasse 6
Unterschleissheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Thum, Bernhard
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
 [2019/18]
Former [2019/13]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.2018  12.04.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Opponent's representative
Somerville, Andrew Edward
Somerville Associates
Dunston Innovation Centre
Dunston Road
Chesterfield S41 8NG / GB
Former [2018/20]
Opponent(s)01  05.04.2018  12.04.2018  ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Opponent's representative
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
17.04.2018Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.08.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
31.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
05.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
LU18.05.2018
[2019/38]
Former [2019/24]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
LU18.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
Former [2019/21]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
LU18.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
LU18.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
Former [2018/40]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
Former [2018/24]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
Former [2018/23]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
SK05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT05.07.2017
CZ05.07.2017
DK05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
Former [2018/12]AT05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
PL05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT05.07.2017
FI05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
Former [2018/09]FI05.07.2017
SE05.07.2017
Former [2018/08]FI05.07.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0060995  (EVALVE INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * figures 86,87 *
International search[A]US6086600  (KORTENBACH JUERGEN ANDREW [US]);
 [A]US5487746  (YU GEORGE W [US], et al)
by applicantUS5855614
 US5829447
 US5823956
 US5797960
 US5769812
 US5718725
 WO0060995
 US2004087975
 US2004092962
 US2003001741
 US2003016707
 US2004044350
OppositionUS6165183
 US2002013571
 US2002183787