Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1646477

EP1646477 - SUPERFINISHING LARGE PLANETARY GEAR SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, SE
published on 29.03.2017  [2017/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
REM Technologies, Inc.
325 West Queen Street
Southington, CT 06489 / US
For all designated states
Osro GmbH
Saalestrasse 16
47800 Krefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/18]For all designated states
REM Technologies, Inc.
325 West Queen Street Southington
Connecticut 06489 / US
For all designated states
Osro GmbH
Saalestrasse 16
47800 Krefeld / DE
Former [2006/16]For all designated states
REM Technologies, Inc.
325 West Queen Street Southington
Connecticut 06489 / US
For all designated states
Orso GmbH
Saalestrasse 16
47800 Krefeld / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MICHAUD, Mark
707 Cutlass
Austin, TX 78734 / US
02 / SUMMERS, Edd
Michelsheide 12
47906 Kempen / DE
 [2006/16]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2013/28]
Former [2011/09]Clarkson, Paul Magnus , et al
N.V. Nederlands Octrooibureau P.O.Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2008/38]Clarkson, Paul Magnus , et al
Howrey LLP P.O. Box 94361
1090 GJ Amsterdam / NL
Former [2007/44]Clarkson, Paul Magnus , et al
Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 PO Box 94361
1090 GJ Amsterdam / NL
Former [2006/16]Copsey, Timothy Graham , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date04753821.028.05.2004
[2006/16]
WO2004US17079
Priority number, dateUS20030474836P30.05.2003         Original published format: US 474836 P
US20030475210P02.06.2003         Original published format: US 475210 P
[2006/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004108356
Date:16.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1646477
Date:19.04.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004
[2006/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1646477
Date:29.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:B24B31/00, B23F19/00, F16H55/06
[2006/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FEINSTBEARBEITUNG VON GROSSEN PLANETENGETRIEBESYSTEMEN[2006/16]
English:SUPERFINISHING LARGE PLANETARY GEAR SYSTEMS[2006/16]
French:SUPERFINITION D'ENGRENAGES PLAN TAIRES DE GRANDE TAILLE[2006/16]
Entry into regional phase23.12.2005National basic fee paid 
23.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/16]
13.02.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2008Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2008Fee for grant paid
19.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
14.01.2010Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP09155489.9  / EP2106881
EP09155491.5  / EP2110203
EP10184217.7  / EP2311605
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.12.2009  23.12.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Metal Improvement Company, LLC
Global Headquarters 80 Route 4 East, Suite 310
Paramus NJ 07652 / US
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 02  27.01.2010  04.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
PIV Drives GmbH
Justus-von-Liebig-Straße 3
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Petersen, Frank, et al
Patentanwalt
Mannheimer Strasse 46
76131 Karlsruhe / DE
 03  29.01.2010  18.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Eickhoff Antriebstechnik GmbH
Hunscheidtstrasse 176
44789 Bochum / DE
Opponent's representative
Behrendt, Arne, et al
Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB
Rechts- und Patentanwälte
Huestrasse 23
(Kortumkarree)
44787 Bochum / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/14]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2009  23.12.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Metal Improvement Company, LLC
Global Headquarters 80 Route 4 East, Suite 310
Paramus NJ 07652 / US
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser, et al
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  27.01.2010  04.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
PIV Drives GmbH
Justus-von-Liebig-Straße 3
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Petersen, Frank, et al
Patentanwalt
Mannheimer Strasse 46
76131 Karlsruhe / DE
 03  29.01.2010  18.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Eickhoff Antriebstechnik GmbH
Hunscheidtstrasse 176
44789 Bochum / DE
Opponent's representative
Behrendt, Arne, et al
Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Westfalenbankgebäude)
44787 Bochum / DE
Former [2014/45]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2009  23.12.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Metal Improvement Company, LLC
Global Headquarters 80 Route 4 East, Suite 310
Paramus NJ 07652 / US
Opponent's representative
Pfau, Anton Konrad, et al
Grünecker Kinkeldey
Stockmair & Schwannhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  27.01.2010  04.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
PIV Drives GmbH
Justus-von-Liebig-Straße 3
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Petersen, Frank, et al
Patentanwalt
Mannheimer Strasse 46
76131 Karlsruhe / DE
 03  29.01.2010  18.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Eickhoff Antriebstechnik GmbH
Hunscheidtstrasse 176
44789 Bochum / DE
Opponent's representative
Behrendt, Arne, et al
Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Westfalenbankgebäude)
44787 Bochum / DE
Former [2012/23]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2009  23.12.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Metal Improvement Company, LLC
Global Headquarters 80 Route 4 East, Suite 310
Paramus NJ 07652 / US
Opponent's representative
Pfau, Anton Konrad, et al
Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwannhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  27.01.2010  04.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
PIV Drives GmbH
Justus-von-Liebig-Straße 3
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Jany und Petersen, et al
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Karlstraße 87
76137 Karlsruhe / DE
 03  29.01.2010  18.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Eickhoff Antriebstechnik GmbH
Hunscheidtstrasse 176
44789 Bochum / DE
Opponent's representative
Behrendt, Arne, et al
Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Westfalenbankgebäude)
44787 Bochum / DE
Former [2012/21]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2009  23.12.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Metal Improvement Company, LLC
Global Headquarters 80 Route 4 East, Suite 310
Paramus NJ 07652 / US
Opponent's representative
Pfau, Anton Konrad, et al
Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwannhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  27.01.2010  04.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
PIV Drives GmbH
Justus-von-Liebig-Straße 3
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Petersen, Frank, et al
Jany und Petersen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Karlstrasse 87
76137 Karlsruhe / DE
 03  29.01.2010  18.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Eickhoff Antriebstechnik GmbH
Hunscheidtstrasse 176
44789 Bochum / DE
Opponent's representative
Behrendt, Arne, et al
Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Westfalenbankgebäude)
44787 Bochum / DE
Former [2010/10]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2009  23.12.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Metal Improvement Company, LLC
Global Headquarters 80 Route 4 East, Suite 310
Paramus NJ 07652 / US
Opponent's representative
Pfau, Anton Konrad, et al
Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwannhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 02  27.01.2010  04.02.2010  ADMISSIBLE
PIV Drives GmbH
Justus-von-Liebig-Straße 3
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Petersen, Frank, et al
Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
 03  29.01.2010   
Eickhoff Antriebstechnik GmbH
Hunscheidtstrasse 176
44789 Bochum / DE
Opponent's representative
Behrendt, Arne, et al
Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Westfalenbankgebäude)
44787 Bochum / DE
Former [2010/04]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2009  23.12.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Metal Improvement Company, LLC
Global Headquarters 80 Route 4 East, Suite 310
Paramus NJ 07652 / US
Opponent's representative
Pfau, Anton Konrad, et al
Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwannhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
08.03.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.11.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.06.2012Date of oral proceedings
06.07.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.07.2012Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
26.10.2016Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/02]
01.12.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition11.09.2012Appeal received No.  T1921/12
16.11.2012Statement of grounds filed
26.10.2016Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
04.09.2012Appeal received No.  T1921/12
16.11.2012Statement of grounds filed
26.10.2016Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
27.08.2012Appeal received No.  T1921/12
09.11.2012Statement of grounds filed
26.10.2016Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
26.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
04.03.2009Request for further processing filed
04.03.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH29.04.2009
LI29.04.2009
CY28.05.2013
CZ28.05.2013
LU28.05.2013
RO28.05.2013
SK28.05.2013
HU29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
AT31.05.2013
BG31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
FR31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
PT28.11.2013
NL01.12.2014
GR03.12.2014
IT28.05.2016
SE29.05.2016
[2017/11]
Former [2017/07]CH29.04.2009
LI29.04.2009
CY28.05.2013
CZ28.05.2013
LU28.05.2013
RO28.05.2013
SK28.05.2013
HU29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
AT31.05.2013
BG31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
FR31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
PT28.11.2013
NL01.12.2014
GR03.12.2014
Former [2015/34]CY28.05.2013
CZ28.05.2013
LU28.05.2013
RO28.05.2013
SK28.05.2013
HU29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
AT31.05.2013
BG31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
FR31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
PT28.11.2013
NL01.12.2014
GR03.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY28.05.2013
CZ28.05.2013
RO28.05.2013
SK28.05.2013
HU29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
AT31.05.2013
BG31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
FR31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
PT28.11.2013
NL01.12.2014
GR03.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY28.05.2013
CZ28.05.2013
RO28.05.2013
SK28.05.2013
HU29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
AT31.05.2013
BG31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
FR31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
PT28.11.2013
GR03.12.2014
Former [2014/44]CY28.05.2013
CZ28.05.2013
RO28.05.2013
SK28.05.2013
HU29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
AT31.05.2013
BG31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
FR31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
PT28.11.2013
Former [2014/37]CY28.05.2013
CZ28.05.2013
RO28.05.2013
SK28.05.2013
HU29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
AT31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
FR31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
PT28.11.2013
BG30.06.2014
Former [2014/24]CY28.05.2013
CZ28.05.2013
RO28.05.2013
SK28.05.2013
HU29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
AT31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
FR31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
PT28.11.2013
Former [2014/18]CY28.05.2013
CZ28.05.2013
RO28.05.2013
SK28.05.2013
HU29.05.2013
AT31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
PT28.11.2013
Former [2014/12]CZ28.05.2013
RO28.05.2013
SK28.05.2013
HU29.05.2013
AT31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
CY10.07.2013
PT28.11.2013
Former [2014/11]CZ28.05.2013
RO28.05.2013
SK28.05.2013
AT31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
CY10.07.2013
PT28.11.2013
Former [2014/10]CZ28.05.2013
SK28.05.2013
AT31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
CY10.07.2013
PT28.11.2013
Former [2014/09]AT31.05.2013
EE31.05.2013
MC31.05.2013
PT28.11.2013
Former [2014/08]MC31.05.2013
PT28.11.2013
Former [2014/03]MC31.05.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1167825  (EATON CORP) [X] 1-66 * paragraphs [0016] - [0023] *;
 [PX]EP1350601  (WINERGY AG) [PX] 1-66 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0414441  (REM CHEMICALS INC) [A] 1-66 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4818333  (MICHAUD MARK D) [DA] 1-66 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US4491500  (TIRENDI FRANK ET AL) [DA] 1-66 * the whole document *
other   - ARVIN J. ET AL, "The Effect of chemically accelerated vibratory finishing on gear metrology", AMERICAN GEAR MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION, (200210), pages 1 - 16, XP003025915
    - KRANTZ T.L. ET AL, "Surface fatigue lives of cases-carburized gears with an impro ved surface finish", NASA, (200004), pages 1 - 11, XP003025916
    - SNIDLE R.W. ET AL, "The Effect of superfinishing on gear tooth profile", UNIVERSITY OF WALES - SCHOOL OF ENGINEERING, (199706), pages 1 - 73, XP003025917
    - NISKANEN P. ET AL, "Reducing wear with superfinish technology", AMPTIAC, (2003), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 3 - 30, XP003025918