Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1646477 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2487
19.12.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
07.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.12.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.12.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 43
01.12.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.12.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.12.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.12.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.11.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.11.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 6
10.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.10.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
30.09.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
30.09.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
30.09.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
29.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
23.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
23.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
23.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 26
23.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
23.09.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
23.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.09.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
21.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.09.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
01.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.09.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.08.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.07.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
21.07.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
21.07.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
21.07.2016 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
19.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.07.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
14.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.07.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
14.07.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 2
06.07.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.07.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
01.07.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
01.07.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
18.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.06.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
13.06.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
13.06.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
13.06.2016 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
08.06.2016 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
08.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.06.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
02.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.06.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
01.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.06.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
01.06.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
01.06.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
01.06.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
01.06.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 24
27.05.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.11.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
09.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
03.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
03.03.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
03.03.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 20
03.03.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
03.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.03.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 48
25.02.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
16.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.01.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.01.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
01.10.2014 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
01.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.09.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 2
18.09.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.06.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.06.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.06.2014 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.06.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
05.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.11.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.10.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.10.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 32
28.10.2013 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.10.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
13.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.08.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.08.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
15.07.2013 Communication of amended entries Appeal 1
11.06.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
29.05.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
16.05.2013 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 1
02.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
15.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 64
15.04.2013 Non-scannable object Appeal 10
15.04.2013 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
15.04.2013 Non-scannable object Appeal 6
15.04.2013 Non-scannable object Appeal 10
15.04.2013 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
15.04.2013 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
15.04.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 16
12.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 64
12.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
12.04.2013 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
12.04.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 1
12.04.2013 Reply to appeal Appeal 16
04.12.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
22.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
22.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 16
22.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.11.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
16.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.11.2012 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
16.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 15
16.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 5
16.11.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.11.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 33
16.11.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
15.11.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
09.11.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
27.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
20.09.2012 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 4
19.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
13.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
13.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
13.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
13.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
11.09.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
06.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.09.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
04.09.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
31.08.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
30.08.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
27.08.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
06.07.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
06.07.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
06.07.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
06.07.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
06.07.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 34
24.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 10
24.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 10
24.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 34
24.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 34
24.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 10
18.05.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 7
18.05.2012 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.05.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 23
15.05.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
04.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
04.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
04.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
04.05.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
04.05.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
04.05.2012 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
04.05.2012 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
04.05.2012 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
28.04.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
23.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
23.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
23.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.04.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
17.04.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
16.04.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.04.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
03.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 11
17.01.2012 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.01.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.01.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.08.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
20.06.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
26.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
26.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
26.01.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
26.01.2011 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 2
26.01.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
06.12.2010 Invitation to file an authorisation Opposition 1
22.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.11.2010 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
19.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.11.2010 Claims Opposition 5
15.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.11.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.11.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 16
13.09.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.09.2010 Claims Opposition 5
07.09.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.09.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
12.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
12.07.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.07.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.07.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.07.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.03.2010 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
12.03.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.03.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
08.03.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 24
08.03.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 36
08.03.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 36
04.02.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 46
30.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.01.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
30.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
29.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
29.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
29.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
29.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
29.01.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
29.01.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
29.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
27.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
27.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.01.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
27.01.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
27.01.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
21.01.2010 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 73
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 18
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 32
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 16
14.01.2010 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Opposition 19
14.01.2010 Observations by third parties Opposition 2
16.12.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
16.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 66
16.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 23
16.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
16.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
04.06.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.04.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
17.03.2009 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
13.03.2009 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 3
04.03.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
04.03.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
04.03.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
04.03.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.03.2009 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
24.02.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.02.2009 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
24.02.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.01.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 2
19.11.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.11.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
22.07.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.07.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
22.07.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.07.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 29
15.07.2008 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
15.07.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
15.07.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.07.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.07.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
15.07.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Annex Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Annex Search / examination 7
03.06.2008 Annex Search / examination 12
03.06.2008 Annex Search / examination 14
03.06.2008 Annex Search / examination 4
03.06.2008 Claims Search / examination 5
03.06.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
03.06.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Claims Search / examination 5
03.06.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 4
29.02.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.02.2008 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
18.02.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
18.02.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.02.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
05.12.2007 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.12.2007 Claims Search / examination 8
05.12.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 65
05.12.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 101
05.12.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
11.10.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.10.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
05.10.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.10.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.10.2007 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
01.10.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.09.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
14.09.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
13.06.2007 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
08.06.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
05.06.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
05.06.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.04.2007 Annex Search / examination 5
06.04.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
06.04.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.04.2007 Annex Search / examination 5
05.04.2007 Annex Search / examination 5
05.04.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
05.04.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
05.04.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.04.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.01.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.01.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.01.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.09.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.09.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.04.2006 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
16.03.2006 Request for change of address Search / examination 2
15.03.2006 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
08.03.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.02.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.02.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
15.02.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
15.02.2006 Annex Search / examination 8
13.02.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
13.02.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
13.02.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 4
13.02.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.01.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
12.01.2006 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
11.01.2006 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.12.2005 Annex Search / examination 1
27.12.2005 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.12.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
23.12.2005 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
22.12.2005 Annex Search / examination 1
22.12.2005 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
21.10.2005 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
24.05.2005 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
11.05.2005 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
03.01.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 12
03.01.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
16.12.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
16.12.2004 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 33
05.10.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.07.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.07.2004 Claims International Searching Authority 8
19.07.2004 Description International Searching Authority 16
19.07.2004 Drawings International Searching Authority 7