Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1629624

EP1629624 - AN IN-CURCUIT SECURITY SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO AND USE OF SENSITIVE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2014
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Privaris, Inc.
675 Peter Jefferson Parkway
Suite 150
Charlottesville, VA 22911 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/09]For all designated states
Privaris, Inc.
675 Peter Jefferson Parkway, Suite 150
Charlorresville, VA 22911 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNSON, Barry, W.
1413 Teakwood Cove
Charlottesville, VA 22911 / US
02 / TILLACK, Jonathan, A.
115 Wood Duck Place 404
Charlottesville, VA 22902 / US
03 / OLVERA, Kristen, R.
1642 Center Avenue
Charlottesville, VA 22903 / US
04 / RUSSEL, David, R.
P.O. Box 913
Virginia Beach, VA 23451-0913 / US
 [2006/09]
Representative(s)Akers, Noel James , et al
N.J. Akers & Co
63 Lemon Street
Truro, TR1 2PN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/12]Akers, Noel James
N.J. Akers & Co
63 Lemon Street
Truro, TR1 2PN / GB
Former [2006/09]Akers, Noel James
N.J.Akers & Co., Carines Cubert Newquay
Cornwall TR8 5ET / GB
Application number, filing date04753980.401.06.2004
[2006/09]
WO2004US17272
Priority number, dateUS20030474750P30.05.2003         Original published format: US 474750 P
[2006/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004109455
Date:16.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1629624
Date:01.03.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004
[2006/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1629624
Date:20.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.02.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/00, G06K9/00
[2012/35]
Former International [2006/09]H04L9/00, H04L9/32, G06F12/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/09]
TitleGerman:SCHALTUNGSINTERNES SICHERHEITSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN DES ZUGRIFFS AUF SENSIBLE DATEN UND IHRER VERWENDUNG[2006/09]
English:AN IN-CURCUIT SECURITY SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO AND USE OF SENSITIVE DATA[2006/09]
French:SYSTEME DE SECURITE EN-CIRCUIT ET PROCEDES DE COMMANDE D'ACCES A ET D'UTILISATION DE DONNEES SENSIBLES[2006/09]
Entry into regional phase30.11.2005National basic fee paid 
30.11.2005Search fee paid 
30.11.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
30.11.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.12.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.11.2005Examination requested  [2006/09]
14.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2013Fee for grant paid
05.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.05.2009
Opposition(s)02.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
28.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201209   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2012
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.06.2004
AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
TR20.03.2013
LU01.06.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
TR20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
CH30.06.2013
LI30.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2014/08]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
MC20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/52]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CY20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/50]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
PL20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/49]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
CZ20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
SK20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/48]AT20.03.2013
BE20.03.2013
EE20.03.2013
NL20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/47]BE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
PT22.07.2013
Former [2013/44]BE20.03.2013
SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/37]SI20.03.2013
BG20.06.2013
GR21.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/36]BG20.06.2013
ES01.07.2013
Former [2013/34]BG20.06.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]US6484260  (SCOTT JOHN D [AU], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 62 * * column 6, line 41 - column 7, line 34 * * column 8, line 1 - line 3 * * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 28 * * column 11, line 13 - line 28 * * column 11, line 46 - line 68 * * figures 1,7,9a,9b *
International search[X]US6173400  (PERLMAN RADIA J [US], et al)
ExaminationUS5559505
by applicantUS6484260
 US6173400