Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1641822


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2019 Intervention of assumed infringer published on  01.01.2020 [2020/01]
04.06.2019 Change: Date of oral proceedings
04.06.2019 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.12.2018 Change - representative
06.04.2018 Intervention of assumed infringer published on  09.05.2018  [2018/19]
10.04.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
06.02.2017 Change: Appeal number
01.02.2017 New entry: Appeal number
01.02.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
23.11.2016 Change: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
24.06.2016 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  27.07.2016  [2016/30]
04.01.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2015 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2015 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
07.03.2015 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.12.2014 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
18.10.2014 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
17.06.2014 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
21.02.2014 Opposition filed published on  26.03.2014  [2014/13]
09.07.2013 Deletion: Renewal fee paid
12.04.2013 (Expected) grant published on  15.05.2013  [2013/20]
10.04.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.04.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.04.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.12.2012 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.11.2012 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
09.11.2012 Change - classification published on  12.12.2012  [2012/50]
09.11.2012 Change - classification published on  12.12.2012  [2012/50]
15.06.2012 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
01.06.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.12.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.07.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.07.2011 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
18.07.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.07.2011 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
18.07.2011 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
17.06.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.04.2011 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
20.01.2011 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.10.2010 Change - divisional application(s) published on  03.11.2010  [2010/44]
13.09.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.06.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.06.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.06.2010 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
02.06.2010 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
11.03.2010 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
04.12.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.07.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.06.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.09.2006 Change - extension states published on  18.10.2006  [2006/42]
29.08.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.05.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.02.2006 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
17.02.2006 Request for examination filed published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
15.02.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
07.02.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
28.01.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
19.08.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
09.02.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
05.02.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.2004 PCT data prior to European publication