Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1641822
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2747871Global Dossier 10.04.2018C
CA2747871 02.06.2005A1
Priority number Date
US52084203 17.11.2003
CA2546285 16.11.2004
US53242603 24.12.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2546285Global Dossier 29.12.2015C
CA2546285 02.06.2005A1
Priority number Date
US52084203 17.11.2003
US53242603 24.12.2003
WO2004US38262 16.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2328496Global Dossier 05.01.2016C
CA2328496 25.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
US8557998 15.05.1998
US9910733 14.05.1999
US11362198 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1641822Global Dossier 05.04.2006A2
Priority number Date
US48559903 08.07.2003
WO2004US17581 02.06.2004
US48645703 11.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR064032 04.03.2009A1
Priority number Date
US60619206 29.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR071829 21.07.2010A1
Priority number Date
US2381108 31.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT268819T 15.06.2004T
Priority number Date
US6933497 11.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT270675T 15.07.2004T
Priority number Date
US6741197 03.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT275581T 15.09.2004T
Priority number Date
US7764198 11.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT282047T 15.11.2004T
Priority number Date
US6354297 28.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT286508T 15.01.2005T
Priority number Date
US7965698 26.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT290018T 15.03.2005T
Priority number Date
US5918497 17.09.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT291085T 15.04.2005T
Priority number Date
US5926397 18.09.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT295963T 15.06.2005T
Priority number Date
US0001441 19.01.2000
US23473099 21.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT300553T 15.08.2005T
Priority number Date
US11953799 10.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT304049T 15.09.2005T
Priority number Date
US8033498 01.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT310810T 15.12.2005T
Priority number Date
US6312897 24.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT314471T 15.01.2006T
Priority number Date
US8332298 28.04.1998
US9821141 07.10.1998
US10541398 26.06.1998
US9086398 26.06.1998
US6531197 13.11.1997
US6225097 17.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT314473T 15.01.2006T
Priority number Date
US9614698 11.08.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT318303T 15.03.2006T
Priority number Date
US11996599 12.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT318905T 15.03.2006T
Priority number Date
US93449497 19.09.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT320489T 15.04.2006T
Priority number Date
US7912498 23.03.1998
US8156998 13.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT321136T 15.04.2006T
Priority number Date
US11285198 16.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT325815T 15.06.2006T
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT325869T 15.06.2006T
Priority number Date
US8355498 29.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT326532T 15.06.2006T
Priority number Date
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930999 20.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT327329T 15.06.2006T
Priority number Date
US96050797 29.10.1997
US93382197 19.09.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT328605T 15.06.2006T
Priority number Date
US19210300 24.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT329023T 15.06.2006T
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT329028T 15.06.2006T
Priority number Date
US93449497 19.09.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT329610T 15.07.2006T
Priority number Date
US18293800 16.02.2000
US22698600 22.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT332308T 15.07.2006T
Priority number Date
US11555899 12.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT332311T 15.07.2006T
Priority number Date
US6636497 21.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT332970T 15.08.2006T
Priority number Date
US10408098 13.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT335005T 15.08.2006T
Priority number Date
US8195598 15.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT339503T 15.10.2006T
Priority number Date
US23360994 25.04.1994
US28630494 05.08.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT348108T 15.01.2007T
Priority number Date
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT353339T 15.02.2007T
Priority number Date
US13144599 28.04.1999
US13023299 21.04.1999
US11329698 22.12.1998
US9921547 15.09.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT355300T 15.03.2006T
Priority number Date
US87669897 16.06.1997
US74369896 06.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT357518T 15.04.2007T
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US0006884 15.03.2000
US14065099 22.06.1999
US0000376 06.01.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT363489T 15.06.2007T
Priority number Date
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT363536T 15.06.2007T
Priority number Date
US10408098 13.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT363537T 15.06.2007T
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT364049T 15.06.2007T
Priority number Date
US9819437 17.09.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US6636497 21.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT364628T 15.07.2007T
Priority number Date
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT365800T 15.07.2007T
Priority number Date
US8557998 15.05.1998
US11362198 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT368110T 15.08.2007T
Priority number Date
US14475899 20.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT374819T 15.10.2007T
Priority number Date
US94199201 28.08.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT377025T 15.11.2007T
Priority number Date
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT380195T 15.12.2007T
Priority number Date
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT380864T 15.12.2007T
Priority number Date
US8279698 23.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT381574T 15.01.2008T
Priority number Date
US8332298 28.04.1998
US10541398 26.06.1998
US9086398 26.06.1998
US6531197 13.11.1997
US6225097 17.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT393786T 15.05.2008T
Priority number Date
US9819437 17.09.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US6636497 21.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT393825T 15.05.2008T
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928409 30.11.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT396201T 15.06.2008T
Priority number Date
US12577899 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT397063T 15.06.2008T
Priority number Date
US15834298 21.09.1998
US6684097 25.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT402954T 15.08.2008T
Priority number Date
US7893698 20.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT404576T 15.08.2008T
Priority number Date
US7745098 10.03.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US9905028 08.03.1999
US7764198 11.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT404585T 15.08.2008T
Priority number Date
US8339298 29.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT405590T 15.09.2008T
Priority number Date
US7891098 20.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT405651T 15.09.2008T
Priority number Date
US4022098 17.03.1998
US18421698 02.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT406441T 15.09.2008T
Priority number Date
US6370497 29.10.1997
US8169598 14.04.1998
US7361298 04.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT408419T 15.10.2008T
Priority number Date
US2807201 19.12.2001
US11948002 09.04.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT409225T 15.10.2008T
Priority number Date
US6370497 29.10.1997
US7361298 04.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT409228T 15.10.2008T
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT410512T 15.10.2008T
Priority number Date
US9819437 17.09.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US6636497 21.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT412009T 15.11.2008T
Priority number Date
US0023328 24.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT415422T 15.12.2008T
Priority number Date
US8280498 22.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT417063T 15.12.2008T
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT419348T 15.01.2009T
Priority number Date
US0014941 30.05.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US9920111 01.09.1999
US15173399 31.08.1999
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT422536T 15.02.2009T
Priority number Date
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT424457T 15.03.2009T
Priority number Date
US22891400 29.08.2000
US19708900 14.04.2000
US17584900 13.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT424458T 15.03.2009T
Priority number Date
US23097800 07.09.2000
US21363700 23.06.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT427319T 15.04.2009T
Priority number Date
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT432987T 15.06.2009T
Priority number Date
US13144599 28.04.1999
US13023299 21.04.1999
US11329698 22.12.1998
US9921547 15.09.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT435912T 15.07.2009T
Priority number Date
US93449497 19.09.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT439431T 15.08.2009T
Priority number Date
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT440109T 15.09.2009T
Priority number Date
US15011499 20.08.1999
US14932099 17.08.1999
US14932799 17.08.1999
US15173499 31.08.1999
US14479099 20.07.1999
US15170099 31.08.1999
US14684399 03.08.1999
US14818899 10.08.1999
US13838599 09.06.1999
US14939699 17.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT440139T 15.09.2009T
Priority number Date
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0034756 19.12.2000
US25366500 28.11.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT443761T 15.10.2009T
Priority number Date
US9814552 14.07.1998
US91887497 26.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT444361T 15.10.2009T
Priority number Date
US0007532 21.03.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US19100700 21.03.2000
US21380700 22.06.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US24283700 24.10.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US17548100 11.01.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US17209699 23.12.1999
US0032678 01.12.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT444971T 15.10.2009T
Priority number Date
US15011499 20.08.1999
US14932099 17.08.1999
US14932799 17.08.1999
US15173499 31.08.1999
US14479099 20.07.1999
US15170099 31.08.1999
US14684399 03.08.1999
US14818899 10.08.1999
US13838599 09.06.1999
US14939699 17.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT447026T 15.11.2009T
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT447583T 15.11.2009T
Priority number Date
US5918497 17.09.1997
US6645397 24.11.1997
US6569397 18.11.1997
US6343597 29.10.1997
US6312897 24.10.1997
US6387097 31.10.1997
US5912197 17.09.1997
US6312097 24.10.1997
US6355097 28.10.1997
US6651197 24.11.1997
US6370497 29.10.1997
US6410397 31.10.1997
US6348697 21.10.1997
US6212597 15.10.1997
US6354297 28.10.1997
US6354497 28.10.1997
US6373597 29.10.1997
US6304597 24.10.1997
US5926697 18.09.1997
US6518697 12.11.1997
US6480997 07.11.1997
US6312797 24.10.1997
US6584697 17.11.1997
US6421597 29.10.1997
US5912297 17.09.1997
US6312197 24.10.1997
US6636497 21.11.1997
US6612097 21.11.1997
US6332997 27.10.1997
US6332797 27.10.1997
US6646697 24.11.1997
US6677097 24.11.1997
US5911597 17.09.1997
US5911397 17.09.1997
US6281497 24.10.1997
US6424897 03.11.1997
US6281697 24.10.1997
US6684097 25.11.1997
US6228797 17.10.1997
US6356497 28.10.1997
US6373497 29.10.1997
US6228597 17.10.1997
US5911997 17.09.1997
US6373897 29.10.1997
US6354197 28.10.1997
US5911797 17.09.1997
US6677297 24.11.1997
US6354997 28.10.1997
US5926397 18.09.1997
US6373297 29.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT447614T 15.11.2009T
Priority number Date
US0005746 02.03.2000
US12309099 05.03.1999
US13573699 25.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT448246T 15.11.2009T
Priority number Date
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US14507099 20.07.1999
US16949599 07.12.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US13969599 15.06.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US14939699 17.08.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US0013358 15.05.2000
US9921547 15.09.1999
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT449108T 15.12.2009T
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT449109T 15.12.2009T
Priority number Date
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US14507099 20.07.1999
US16949599 07.12.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US13969599 15.06.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US14939699 17.08.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US0013358 15.05.2000
US9921547 15.09.1999
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT453405T 15.01.2010T
Priority number Date
US52084203 17.11.2003
US53242603 24.12.2003
WO2004US38262 16.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT453718T 15.01.2010T
Priority number Date
US75905601 11.01.2001
US22891400 29.08.2000
US90181201 10.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT458050T 15.03.2010T
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US12395799 12.03.1999
US9825108 01.12.1998
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US9923089 05.10.1999
US13144599 28.04.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US11285098 16.12.1998
US9921547 15.09.1999
US9920944 13.09.1999
US11555499 12.01.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT459645T 15.03.2010T
Priority number Date
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US19100700 21.03.2000
US16949599 07.12.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0014042 22.05.2000
US9920111 01.09.1999
US19939700 25.04.2000
US17548100 11.01.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT463502T 15.04.2010T
Priority number Date
US8332298 28.04.1998
US10541398 26.06.1998
US9086398 26.06.1998
US6531197 13.11.1997
US6225097 17.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT464323T 15.04.2010T
Priority number Date
WO2005US31798 07.09.2005
US93662604 08.09.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT478145T 15.09.2010T
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US15866399 08.10.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US14939699 17.08.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9921547 15.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14304899 07.07.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT486092T 15.11.2010T
Priority number Date
US33190601 20.11.2001
US0228859 11.09.2002
US36972402 03.04.2002
US40480902 19.08.2002
US33922701 19.10.2001
US34544402 02.01.2002
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT511857T 15.06.2011T
Priority number Date
US18293800 16.02.2000
US22698600 22.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT516042T 15.07.2011T
Priority number Date
US33190601 20.11.2001
US36972402 03.04.2002
US40480902 19.08.2002
US33922701 19.10.2001
US34544402 02.01.2002
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT519847T 15.08.2011T
Priority number Date
US0007532 21.03.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US19100700 21.03.2000
US21380700 22.06.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US24283700 24.10.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US17548100 11.01.2000
US17209699 23.12.1999
US0032678 01.12.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT522623T 15.09.2011T
Priority number Date
US30188001 29.06.2001
US36686902 20.03.2002
US30481301 11.07.2001
US33922701 19.10.2001
US29950001 20.06.2001
US31231201 13.08.2001
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
US37888502 08.05.2002
US30088001 25.06.2001
US31428001 22.08.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT525480T 15.10.2011T
Priority number Date
US63300803 31.07.2003
US26554202 03.10.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT537258T 15.12.2011T
Priority number Date
US0007532 21.03.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US19100700 21.03.2000
US21380700 22.06.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US24283700 24.10.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US17548100 11.01.2000
US17209699 23.12.1999
US0032678 01.12.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT541930T 15.02.2012T
Priority number Date
US0007532 21.03.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US19100700 21.03.2000
US21380700 22.06.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US24283700 24.10.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US17548100 11.01.2000
US17209699 23.12.1999
US0032678 01.12.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT541931T 15.02.2012T
Priority number Date
US0007532 21.03.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US19100700 21.03.2000
US21380700 22.06.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US24283700 24.10.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US17548100 11.01.2000
US17209699 23.12.1999
US0032678 01.12.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU697165B 01.10.1998B2
AU2635395 16.11.1995A
Priority number Date
US23360994 25.04.1994
US9504467 06.04.1995
US28630494 05.08.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU733222B 10.05.2001B2
AU1703399 15.06.1999A
Priority number Date
US9825190 25.11.1998
US15834298 21.09.1998
US6684097 25.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU735081B 28.06.2001B2
AU1532499 15.06.1999A
Priority number Date
US9819437 17.09.1998
US9824855 20.11.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US6636497 21.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU735200B 05.07.2001B2
AU2598697 22.10.1997A
Priority number Date
US9705230 31.03.1997
US71080296 23.09.1996
US62532896 01.04.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU736506B 26.07.2001B2
AU1602999 16.06.1999A
Priority number Date
US7409298 09.02.1998
US9825108 01.12.1998
US6942597 12.12.1997
US7594598 25.02.1998
US6933497 11.12.1997
US6987097 17.12.1997
US6741197 03.12.1997
US6987397 17.12.1997
US6933597 11.12.1997
US6801797 18.12.1997
US6969697 16.12.1997
US6970297 16.12.1997
US6969497 16.12.1997
US7044098 05.01.1998
US6927897 11.12.1997
US7408698 09.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU740227B 01.11.2001B2
AU8144798 04.01.1999A
Priority number Date
US87816897 18.06.1997
US9812456 12.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU740405B 01.11.2001B2
AU3993799 06.12.1999A
Priority number Date
US8557998 15.05.1998
US9910733 14.05.1999
US11362198 23.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU741060C 19.09.2002C
AU741060B 22.11.2001B2
AU9317898 05.04.1999A
Priority number Date
US5918497 17.09.1997
US6645397 24.11.1997
US6569397 18.11.1997
US6343597 29.10.1997
US6312897 24.10.1997
US6387097 31.10.1997
US5912197 17.09.1997
US6312097 24.10.1997
US6355097 28.10.1997
US6651197 24.11.1997
US6370497 29.10.1997
US6410397 31.10.1997
US6348697 21.10.1997
US6212597 15.10.1997
US6354297 28.10.1997
US6354497 28.10.1997
US6373597 29.10.1997
US6304597 24.10.1997
US5926697 18.09.1997
US6518697 12.11.1997
US6480997 07.11.1997
US6312797 24.10.1997
US6584697 17.11.1997
US6421597 29.10.1997
US5912297 17.09.1997
US6312197 24.10.1997
US6636497 21.11.1997
US6612097 21.11.1997
US6332997 27.10.1997
US6332797 27.10.1997
US6646697 24.11.1997
US6677097 24.11.1997
US9819330 16.09.1998
US5911597 17.09.1997
US5911397 17.09.1997
US6281497 24.10.1997
US6424897 03.11.1997
US6281697 24.10.1997
US6684097 25.11.1997
US6228797 17.10.1997
US6356497 28.10.1997
US6373497 29.10.1997
US6228597 17.10.1997
US5911997 17.09.1997
US6373897 29.10.1997
US6354197 28.10.1997
US5911797 17.09.1997
US6677297 24.11.1997
US6354997 28.10.1997
US5926397 18.09.1997
US6373297 29.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU741133B 22.11.2001B2
AU3757099 08.11.1999A
Priority number Date
US11329698 22.12.1998
US9908847 23.04.1999
US8276798 23.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU744285B 21.02.2002B2
AU9388198 12.04.1999A
Priority number Date
US9819094 14.09.1998
US93449497 19.09.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU745101B 14.03.2002B2
AU5428798 29.05.1998A
Priority number Date
US87669897 16.06.1997
US9720069 05.11.1997
US74369896 06.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU756400B 09.01.2003B2
AU2879400 31.07.2001A
Priority number Date
AU2003200731 25.02.2003
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US2879400 11.02.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU756449B 16.01.2003B2
AU9388098 12.04.1999A
Priority number Date
US9819093 14.09.1998
US96050797 29.10.1997
US93382197 19.09.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU758353B 20.03.2003B2
AU3075099 11.10.1999A
AU758353C 11.10.1999C
Priority number Date
US4022098 17.03.1998
US9905190 10.03.1999
US18421698 02.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU758462B 20.03.2003B2
AU1200500 01.05.2000A
Priority number Date
US9923089 05.10.1999
US10408098 13.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU759150B 03.04.2003B2
AU5590899 21.03.2000A
Priority number Date
US9959898 09.09.1998
US9959698 09.09.1998
US9953698 09.09.1998
US9884398 02.09.1998
US10038898 15.09.1998
US9976398 10.09.1998
US9974198 10.09.1998
US10039098 15.09.1998
US9871698 01.09.1998
US9980898 10.09.1998
US10058498 16.09.1998
US9875098 01.09.1998
US10066198 16.09.1998
US10068498 17.09.1998
US10066298 16.09.1998
US10068398 17.09.1998
US10066498 16.09.1998
US10062798 16.09.1998
US9975498 10.09.1998
US9874998 01.09.1998
US10071098 17.09.1998
US9981698 10.09.1998
US9920111 01.09.1999
US9981298 10.09.1998
US9964298 09.09.1998
US9981598 10.09.1998
US10038598 15.09.1998
US9882198 02.09.1998
US9979298 10.09.1998
US9880398 02.09.1998
US9960298 09.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU761340B 05.06.2003B2
AU4328699 20.12.1999A
Priority number Date
US8874298 10.06.1998
US8872298 10.06.1998
US8874198 10.06.1998
US8874098 10.06.1998
US8782798 03.06.1998
US8820298 05.06.1998
US8775998 02.06.1998
US8865598 09.06.1998
US8803398 04.06.1998
US8832698 04.06.1998
US8803098 04.06.1998
US8882698 10.06.1998
US8882598 10.06.1998
US8882498 10.06.1998
US8802998 04.06.1998
US9912252 02.06.1999
US9044598 24.06.1998
US8873498 10.06.1998
US8802898 04.06.1998
US8802598 04.06.1998
US8760798 02.06.1998
US8760998 02.06.1998
US8873098 10.06.1998
US8821798 05.06.1998
US8873898 10.06.1998
US8821298 05.06.1998
US8881098 10.06.1998
US8881198 10.06.1998
US8816798 05.06.1998
US8802198 04.06.1998
US8885898 11.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU762055B 19.06.2003B2
AU3072199 27.09.1999A
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US9905028 08.03.1999
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU764092B 07.08.2003B2
AU3864800 09.10.2000A
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
US0005601 01.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU765070B 11.09.2003B2
AU3194499 18.10.1999A
Priority number Date
US9906098 19.03.1999
US7912498 23.03.1998
US8156998 13.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU768230B 04.12.2003B2
AU1749900 12.07.2000A
Priority number Date
US13144599 28.04.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US13023299 21.04.1999
US11329698 22.12.1998
US9921547 15.09.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU768694B 08.01.2004B2
AU3381600 28.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US12395799 12.03.1999
US0004342 18.02.2000
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US9928409 30.11.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU769166B 15.01.2004B2
AU3654799 16.11.1999A
Priority number Date
US10026398 14.09.1998
US9908615 20.04.1999
US8299998 24.04.1998
US8514998 12.05.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU771751C 06.04.2006C
AU771751B 01.04.2004B2
AU1748200 19.06.2000A
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US12395799 12.03.1999
US9825108 01.12.1998
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US9923089 05.10.1999
US13144599 28.04.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US11285098 16.12.1998
US9921547 15.09.1999
US9920944 13.09.1999
US11555499 12.01.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU773055C 02.12.2004C
AU773055B 13.05.2004B2
AU3107700 28.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US9928551 02.12.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU776063C 19.05.2005C
AU776063B 26.08.2004B2
AU2512400 07.08.2000A
Priority number Date
US0001441 19.01.2000
US23473099 21.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU777006B 30.09.2004B2
AU1932000 03.07.2000A
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US11555899 12.01.1999
US11285198 16.12.1998
US11573399 12.01.1999
US11996599 12.02.1999
US11351198 22.12.1998
US11953799 10.02.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US11314598 16.12.1998
US11556599 12.01.1999
US11934199 09.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU778759B 16.12.2004B2
AU2593500 31.07.2000A
Priority number Date
US11684399 22.01.1999
US11343098 23.12.1998
US12912299 13.04.1999
US9930720 22.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU779258B 13.01.2005B2
AU3867000 21.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US0005746 02.03.2000
US12309099 05.03.1999
US13573699 25.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU779402B 20.01.2005B2
AU4341200 14.11.2000A
Priority number Date
US0009699 12.04.2000
US12884999 12.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU783117B 29.09.2005B2
AU3878400 10.04.2001A
Priority number Date
US9920594 08.09.1999
US0006471 09.03.2000
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930999 20.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU785055B 07.09.2006B2
AU3276801 24.07.2001A
Priority number Date
US22891400 29.08.2000
US0100847 11.01.2001
US19708900 14.04.2000
US17584900 13.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU1070399 10.05.1999A
Priority number Date
US8332298 28.04.1998
US9821141 07.10.1998
US10541398 26.06.1998
US9086398 26.06.1998
US6531197 13.11.1997
US6225097 17.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU1126099 17.05.1999A
Priority number Date
US6370497 29.10.1997
US9822992 29.10.1998
US7361298 04.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU1288399 17.05.1999A
Priority number Date
US9822991 29.10.1998
US6370497 29.10.1997
US8169598 14.04.1998
US7361298 04.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU1661002 02.04.2002A
Priority number Date
US26187801 12.01.2001
US22989600 01.09.2000
US0121735 09.07.2001
US28212901 04.04.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US26193901 16.01.2001
US26215001 16.01.2001
US23062100 05.09.2000
US28098201 03.04.2001
US23514700 22.09.2000
US0119692 20.06.2001
US27439901 09.03.2001
US26762301 09.02.2001
US26439501 25.01.2001
US0121066 29.06.2001
US28219901 04.04.2001
US26191001 16.01.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0127099 29.08.2001
US26642101 02.02.2001
US0117800 01.06.2001
US29058901 09.05.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU1747100 17.04.2001A
Priority number Date
US9928214 29.11.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9920944 13.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU1749800 04.10.2000A
Priority number Date
US9923089 05.10.1999
US9928564 02.12.1999
US13144599 28.04.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US12395799 12.03.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU1916701 16.07.2001A
Priority number Date
US0000376 06.01.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2048501 27.08.2001A
Priority number Date
US0032378 28.11.2000
US18293800 16.02.2000
US22698600 22.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2055401 12.06.2001A
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2192800 12.07.2000A
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US11329698 22.12.1998
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US9928409 30.11.1999
US9930095 16.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2212299 26.07.1999A
Priority number Date
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8874298 10.06.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US10778398 10.11.1998
US9900106 05.01.1999
US10930498 20.11.1998
US7044098 05.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2215300 28.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9921547 15.09.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US14304899 07.07.1999
US9930911 20.12.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2224800 28.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US9923089 05.10.1999
US9928564 02.12.1999
US13144599 28.04.1999
US0000277 06.01.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US12395799 12.03.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US13023299 21.04.1999
US12677399 29.03.1999
US9928551 02.12.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2390700 05.02.2001A
Priority number Date
US9923089 05.10.1999
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9928214 29.11.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9920944 13.09.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2399300 28.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US12677399 29.03.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2474700 19.06.2000A
Priority number Date
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9825108 01.12.1998
US11285098 16.12.1998
US11329698 22.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2495200 28.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US0000376 06.01.2000
US9928313 30.11.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US14304899 07.07.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US9930911 20.12.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2590901 03.07.2001A
Priority number Date
US0007532 21.03.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US19100700 21.03.2000
US21380700 22.06.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US24283700 24.10.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US17548100 11.01.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US17209699 23.12.1999
US0032678 01.12.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2596700 28.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US9923089 05.10.1999
US9928564 02.12.1999
US13144599 28.04.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9931274 30.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US13023299 21.04.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US9928409 30.11.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US13102299 26.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2600800 28.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US12395799 12.03.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US9921547 15.09.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2883600 28.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US0004341 18.02.2000
US12395799 12.03.1999
US13023299 21.04.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US13144599 28.04.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US12677399 29.03.1999
US9928551 02.12.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2883700 09.01.2001A
Priority number Date
US0000376 06.01.2000
US9928313 30.11.1999
US0004342 18.02.2000
US9920111 01.09.1999
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US16250699 29.10.1999
US9930095 16.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2883900 30.01.2001A
Priority number Date
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US9923089 05.10.1999
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9928214 29.11.1999
US9921547 15.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14304899 07.07.1999
US9920944 13.09.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3075701 20.08.2001A
Priority number Date
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0034756 19.12.2000
US25366500 28.11.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3107000 19.06.2000A
Priority number Date
US9825108 01.12.1998
US11285098 16.12.1998
US11329698 22.12.1998
US9928409 30.11.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3246100 28.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US0000219 05.01.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3434601 12.06.2001A
Priority number Date
US0030873 10.11.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US9928313 30.11.1999
US0004342 18.02.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US17548100 11.01.2000
US17205999 23.12.1999
US0023328 24.08.2000
US17711800 20.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3514400 28.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US12395799 12.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US9928214 29.11.1999
US12884999 12.04.1999
US9928551 02.12.1999
US9920944 13.09.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US9912252 02.06.1999
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US9908615 20.04.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US9928409 30.11.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US9923089 05.10.1999
US9928564 02.12.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13144599 28.04.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US9921547 15.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US12577599 23.03.1999
US12361899 10.03.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3632600 05.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US0007532 21.03.2000
US13428799 14.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3737500 28.09.2000A
Priority number Date
US12395799 12.03.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3774300 18.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US15866399 08.10.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US14304899 07.07.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US9912252 02.06.1999
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US14103799 23.06.1999
US14939699 17.08.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9921547 15.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU3902600 17.04.2001A
Priority number Date
US0007377 20.03.2000
US9921547 15.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU4011300 05.02.2001A
Priority number Date
US0006884 15.03.2000
US14475899 20.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU4454000 14.11.2000A
Priority number Date
US12884999 12.04.1999
US0009554 10.04.2000
US48078200 10.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU4851900 28.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US15011499 20.08.1999
US14932099 17.08.1999
US0013358 15.05.2000
US14932799 17.08.1999
US15173499 31.08.1999
US14479099 20.07.1999
US15170099 31.08.1999
US14684399 03.08.1999
US14818899 10.08.1999
US13838599 09.06.1999
US14939699 17.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU4935701 08.10.2001A
Priority number Date
US0109230 22.03.2001
US19210300 24.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5152700 02.01.2001A
Priority number Date
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US14507099 20.07.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US13969599 15.06.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US14939699 17.08.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US0013358 15.05.2000
US9921547 15.09.1999
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5441200 18.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US0013705 17.05.2000
US14622299 28.07.1999
US9928409 30.11.1999
US9930095 16.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5460100 18.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14473299 20.07.1999
US9921547 15.09.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5516801 17.09.2001A
Priority number Date
US19101500 21.03.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0106666 01.03.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5591100 18.12.2000A
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US0014941 30.05.2000
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US9928551 02.12.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5816799 03.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9818824 10.09.1998
US9980398 10.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5920099 03.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US10026298 14.09.1998
US9819177 14.09.1998
US9920944 13.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU5922999 03.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US9819330 16.09.1998
US9921090 15.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6041399 10.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US10127998 22.09.1998
US9921194 15.09.1999
US12967499 16.04.1999
US11422398 30.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6391000 19.02.2001A
Priority number Date
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9928214 29.11.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US0013705 17.05.2000
US9920944 13.09.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6498499 03.04.2000A
Priority number Date
US9819437 17.09.1998
US9921547 15.09.1999
US10085898 17.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6501901 11.12.2001A
Priority number Date
US0014941 30.05.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US0015264 02.06.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6531101 17.12.2001A
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6802801 24.09.2001A
Priority number Date
US18932000 14.03.2000
US19600000 11.04.2000
US19812100 18.04.2000
US19965400 25.04.2000
US19858500 18.04.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US19265500 28.03.2000
US0106520 28.02.2001
US19464700 04.04.2000
US19682000 11.04.2000
US19082800 21.03.2000
US19303200 29.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US19305300 29.03.2000
US20151600 03.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US19104800 21.03.2000
US19100700 21.03.2000
US19955000 25.04.2000
US18696800 06.03.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US19131400 21.03.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US19618700 11.04.2000
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19669000 11.04.2000
US18932800 14.03.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US19444900 04.04.2000
US19597500 11.04.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6810801 04.03.2002A
Priority number Date
US0117443 30.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6871401 08.01.2002A
Priority number Date
US0120116 22.06.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US21363700 23.06.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6901800 12.06.2001A
Priority number Date
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US9928313 30.11.1999
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0000219 05.01.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
US9928409 30.11.1999
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7011801 04.03.2002A
Priority number Date
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US0120118 22.06.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US23545100 26.09.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7079300 26.03.2001A
Priority number Date
US0014941 30.05.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US9920111 01.09.1999
US15173399 31.08.1999
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7193801 13.03.2002A
Priority number Date
US75905601 11.01.2001
US22891400 29.08.2000
US0121635 10.07.2001
US90181201 10.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7197301 05.02.2002A
Priority number Date
US64365700 17.08.2000
US80270601 09.03.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US0119692 20.06.2001
US76760901 22.01.2001
US66535000 18.09.2000
US86602801 25.05.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US82836601 05.04.2001
US87057401 30.05.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US24292200 24.10.2000
US79649801 28.02.2001
US70923800 08.11.2000
US66461000 18.09.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0117443 30.05.2001
US22269500 02.08.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0121735 09.07.2001
US85428001 10.05.2001
US80868901 14.03.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US86603401 25.05.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7315001 30.01.2002A
Priority number Date
US0117092 25.05.2001
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0121066 29.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7573000 26.03.2001A
Priority number Date
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US19100700 21.03.2000
US16949599 07.12.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US9920111 01.09.1999
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US17548100 11.01.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7885201 08.01.2002A
Priority number Date
US64365700 17.08.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0117443 30.05.2001
US22269500 02.08.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US23097800 07.09.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0119692 20.06.2001
US86603401 25.05.2001
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US87057401 30.05.2001
US0117800 01.06.2001
US21363700 23.06.2000
US22062400 25.07.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU8485098 16.03.1999A
Priority number Date
US9814552 14.07.1998
US91887497 26.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU8490601 04.03.2002A
Priority number Date
US0125464 14.08.2001
US88825701 22.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0120118 22.06.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU8678501 04.03.2002A
Priority number Date
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0121735 09.07.2001
US0126626 23.08.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US0119692 20.06.2001
US0121066 29.06.2001
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU9037898 12.04.1999A
Priority number Date
US5983697 24.09.1997
US9817888 28.08.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU9312198 05.04.1999A
Priority number Date
US6228797 17.10.1997
US6228597 17.10.1997
US6212597 15.10.1997
US9818824 10.09.1998
US6370497 29.10.1997
US5911797 17.09.1997
US5911497 17.09.1997
US6281697 24.10.1997
US5926397 18.09.1997
US6684097 25.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU9395998 05.04.1999A
Priority number Date
US9819437 17.09.1998
US6355097 28.10.1997
US5911997 17.09.1997
US8802698 04.06.1998
US6677097 24.11.1997
US6518697 12.11.1997
US6636497 21.11.1997
US5926397 18.09.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU9481401 08.04.2002A
Priority number Date
US0130290 26.09.2001
US23545100 26.09.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU9484398 05.04.1999A
Priority number Date
US5911797 17.09.1997
US6332997 27.10.1997
US6677297 24.11.1997
US9819177 14.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2001265311 17.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2001268028 24.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US18932000 14.03.2000
US19600000 11.04.2000
US19812100 18.04.2000
US19965400 25.04.2000
US19858500 18.04.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US19265500 28.03.2000
US0106520 28.02.2001
US19464700 04.04.2000
US19682000 11.04.2000
US19082800 21.03.2000
US19303200 29.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US19305300 29.03.2000
US20151600 03.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US19104800 21.03.2000
US19100700 21.03.2000
US19955000 25.04.2000
US18696800 06.03.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US19131400 21.03.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US19618700 11.04.2000
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19669000 11.04.2000
US18932800 14.03.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US19444900 04.04.2000
US19597500 11.04.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2001268714B 21.09.2006B2
Priority number Date
US0120116 22.06.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US21363700 23.06.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2001271973 05.02.2002A1
Priority number Date
US64365700 17.08.2000
US80270601 09.03.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US0119692 20.06.2001
US76760901 22.01.2001
US66535000 18.09.2000
US86602801 25.05.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US82836601 05.04.2001
US87057401 30.05.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US24292200 24.10.2000
US79649801 28.02.2001
US70923800 08.11.2000
US66461000 18.09.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0117443 30.05.2001
US22269500 02.08.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0121735 09.07.2001
US85428001 10.05.2001
US80868901 14.03.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US86603401 25.05.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2001273150 05.02.2002A1
Priority number Date
US0117092 25.05.2001
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0121066 29.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2001278852 08.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US64365700 17.08.2000
US80270601 09.03.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US0119692 20.06.2001
US76760901 22.01.2001
US66535000 18.09.2000
US86602801 25.05.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US82836601 05.04.2001
US87057401 30.05.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US24292200 24.10.2000
US79649801 28.02.2001
US70923800 08.11.2000
US66461000 18.09.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0117443 30.05.2001
US22269500 02.08.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US80868901 14.03.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US86603401 25.05.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US21363700 23.06.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2001286785B 17.08.2006B2
Priority number Date
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0121735 09.07.2001
US0126626 23.08.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US0119692 20.06.2001
US0121066 29.06.2001
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002216610 02.04.2002A1
Priority number Date
US26187801 12.01.2001
US22989600 01.09.2000
US0121735 09.07.2001
US28212901 04.04.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US26193901 16.01.2001
US26215001 16.01.2001
US23062100 05.09.2000
US28098201 03.04.2001
US23514700 22.09.2000
US0119692 20.06.2001
US27439901 09.03.2001
US26762301 09.02.2001
US26439501 25.01.2001
US0121066 29.06.2001
US28219901 04.04.2001
US26191001 16.01.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0127099 29.08.2001
US26642101 02.02.2001
US0117800 01.06.2001
US29058901 09.05.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002229091 08.01.2003A1
Priority number Date
US0121735 09.07.2001
US0148938 13.12.2001
US0119692 20.06.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002236618B 09.08.2007B2
Priority number Date
US94199201 28.08.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0148060 07.12.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002254651 03.11.2003A1
Priority number Date
US0212206 17.04.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002301608C 11.08.2005C1
AU2002301608B 18.11.2004B2
Priority number Date
AU2002301608 23.10.2002
AU3072199 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002301722B 16.09.2004B2
AU2002301722C 06.03.2003C1
Priority number Date
AU2002301722 28.10.2002
AU3072199 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002301723C 05.01.2006C9
AU2002301723C 11.08.2005C1
AU2002301723B 18.11.2004B2
AU2002301723 13.03.2003A1
Priority number Date
AU3072199 08.03.1999
AU2002301723 28.10.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002301730B 14.10.2004B2
AU2002301730C 06.03.2003C1
Priority number Date
AU3072199 08.03.1999
AU2002301730 25.10.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002301731C 09.02.2006C1
AU2002301731B 26.05.2005B2
Priority number Date
AU3072199 08.03.1999
AU2002301731 25.10.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002301732C 09.02.2006C1
AU2002301732B 14.04.2005B2
Priority number Date
AU3072199 08.03.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002303231B 06.03.2008B2
Priority number Date
US88045701 12.06.2001
US0210513 03.04.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002313838B 26.05.2005B2
AU2002313838C 27.03.2003C1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US9905028 08.03.1999
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002317529C 23.02.2006C1
AU2002317529B 26.05.2005B2
Priority number Date
AU3072199 08.03.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002318371B 15.06.2006B2
Priority number Date
US30188001 29.06.2001
US0219592 19.06.2002
US36686902 20.03.2002
US30481301 11.07.2001
US33922701 19.10.2001
US29950001 20.06.2001
US31231201 13.08.2001
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
US37888502 08.05.2002
US30088001 25.06.2001
US31428001 22.08.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002318894C 09.02.2006C1
AU2002318894B 12.05.2005B2
Priority number Date
AU3072199 08.03.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002323928B 11.08.2005B2
Priority number Date
AU2002323928 20.12.2002
AU3072199 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002330015B 07.02.2008B2
Priority number Date
US33190601 20.11.2001
US0228859 11.09.2002
US36972402 03.04.2002
US40480902 19.08.2002
US33922701 19.10.2001
US34544402 02.01.2002
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002330288C 09.02.2006C1
AU2002330288B 05.05.2005B2
Priority number Date
AU3072199 08.03.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002335054 09.07.2003A1
Priority number Date
US0233050 16.10.2002
US2807201 19.12.2001
US11948002 09.04.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002363307C 09.02.2006C1
AU2002363307B 26.05.2005B2
Priority number Date
AU3072199 08.03.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002365246 15.07.2003A1
Priority number Date
US0224252 30.07.2002
US0127099 29.08.2001
US13657402 29.04.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2002367318B 12.07.2007B2
AU2002367318 24.07.2003A1
Priority number Date
US36200402 05.03.2002
US40564502 21.08.2002
US36686902 20.03.2002
US35188502 25.01.2002
US36867902 28.03.2002
US40480902 19.08.2002
US0241798 30.12.2002
US36006602 25.02.2002
US34544402 02.01.2002
US36628402 21.03.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003200204C 04.05.2006C9
AU2003200204C 13.04.2006C1
AU2003200204B 12.05.2005B2
Priority number Date
AU3072199 08.03.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003200585B 13.07.2006B2
Priority number Date
AU1126099 29.10.1998
AU2003200585 13.02.2003
US9822992 29.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003200721C 17.07.2008C1
AU2003200721B 08.12.2005B2
Priority number Date
AU2879400 11.02.2000
AU2003200721 25.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003200722B 02.02.2006B2
AU2003200722C 01.05.2003C1
Priority number Date
US15168999 31.08.1999
AU2879400 11.02.2000
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003200731C 17.07.2008C1
AU2003200731B 13.04.2006B2
Priority number Date
AU2003200731 25.02.2003
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
AU2879400 11.02.2000
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003200740C 17.07.2008C1
AU2003200740B 15.12.2005B2
Priority number Date
AU2003200731 25.02.2003
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
AU2003200740 26.02.2003
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
AU2879400 11.02.2000
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003201315B 08.04.2010B8
AU2003201315 08.04.2010A8
AU2003201315C 08.03.2007C1
AU2003201315B 23.03.2006B2
AU2003201315 12.06.2003A1
Priority number Date
AU2003201315 24.02.2003
AU1288399 29.10.1998
US9822991 29.10.1998
US6370497 29.10.1997
US8169598 14.04.1998
US7361298 04.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003204018C 12.10.2006C1
AU2003204018B 28.04.2005B2
Priority number Date
AU3072199 08.03.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003204815B 04.08.2005B2
Priority number Date
US9923089 05.10.1999
AU2003204815 17.06.2003
AU1200500 05.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003213166B 03.07.2008B2
AU2003213166 22.09.2003A1
Priority number Date
US36199502 05.03.2002
US0305169 18.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003230874 03.11.2003A1
Priority number Date
US37316002 16.04.2002
US40480902 19.08.2002
US0311148 10.04.2003
US37888502 08.05.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003248191C 09.02.2006C1
AU2003248191B 28.04.2005B2
AU2003248191 06.11.2003A1
Priority number Date
AU3072199 08.03.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003259913 03.03.2004A1
Priority number Date
US40564502 21.08.2002
US40480902 19.08.2002
US41319202 23.09.2002
US42684702 15.11.2002
US48495903 02.07.2003
US41900802 15.10.2002
US0325892 19.08.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003261483B 06.07.2006B2
AU2003261483 04.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
US0005601 01.03.2000
AU3864800 01.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003261484B 15.06.2006B2
AU2003261484 04.12.2003A1
Priority number Date
US0005601 01.03.2000
AU3864800 01.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003277226B 13.05.2010B2
AU2003277226 07.07.2005A2
AU2003277226 23.04.2004A1
Priority number Date
US0331207 01.10.2003
US63300803 31.07.2003
US26554202 03.10.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2003290848 15.06.2004A1
Priority number Date
US43125002 06.12.2002
US42684702 15.11.2002
US0336298 13.11.2003
US43734402 31.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004201759B 19.07.2007B2
AU2004201759 20.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US9928551 02.12.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004201760B 19.07.2007B2
AU2004201760 20.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US9928551 02.12.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004201769B 19.07.2007B2
AU2004201769 27.05.2004A1
Priority number Date
US9928551 02.12.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004237842B 20.09.2007B2
AU2004237842 13.01.2005A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US11555899 12.01.1999
US11285198 16.12.1998
AU1932000 01.12.1999
US11573399 12.01.1999
US11996599 12.02.1999
US11351198 22.12.1998
US11953799 10.02.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US11314598 16.12.1998
US11556599 12.01.1999
US11934199 09.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004237919B 06.09.2007B2
AU2004237919 13.01.2005A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US11555899 12.01.1999
AU1932000 01.12.1999
US11573399 12.01.1999
US11996599 12.02.1999
US11351198 22.12.1998
US11953799 10.02.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US11285198 16.12.1998
AU2004237919 14.12.2004
US11314598 16.12.1998
US11556599 12.01.1999
US11934199 09.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004237920B 23.08.2007B2
AU2004237920 13.01.2005A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US11555899 12.01.1999
US11285198 16.12.1998
AU1932000 01.12.1999
US11573399 12.01.1999
US11996599 12.02.1999
US11351198 22.12.1998
US11953799 10.02.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US11314598 16.12.1998
US11556599 12.01.1999
US11934199 09.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004237921B 23.08.2007B2
AU2004237921 13.01.2005A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US11555899 12.01.1999
AU1932000 01.12.1999
US11573399 12.01.1999
US11996599 12.02.1999
US11351198 22.12.1998
US11953799 10.02.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
AU2004237921 14.12.2004
US11285198 16.12.1998
US11314598 16.12.1998
US11556599 12.01.1999
US11934199 09.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004237922B 06.09.2007B2
AU2004237922 13.01.2005A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US11555899 12.01.1999
AU1932000 01.12.1999
US11573399 12.01.1999
US11996599 12.02.1999
US11351198 22.12.1998
US11953799 10.02.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US11285198 16.12.1998
AU2004237922 14.12.2004
US11314598 16.12.1998
US11556599 12.01.1999
US11934199 09.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004237923B 06.09.2007B2
AU2004237923 13.01.2005A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US11555899 12.01.1999
AU1932000 01.12.1999
US11573399 12.01.1999
US11996599 12.02.1999
US11351198 22.12.1998
US11953799 10.02.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US11285198 16.12.1998
AU2004237923 14.12.2004
US11314598 16.12.1998
US11556599 12.01.1999
US11934199 09.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004253953 13.01.2005A1
Priority number Date
WO2004US21353 02.07.2004
US48495903 02.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004259638C 20.12.2018C1
AU2004259638B 03.07.2008B2
AU2004259638 03.02.2005A1
Priority number Date
US48559903 08.07.2003
WO2004US17581 02.06.2004
US48645703 11.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004291141B 11.06.2009B2
AU2004291141 02.06.2005A1
Priority number Date
US52084203 17.11.2003
US53242603 24.12.2003
WO2004US38262 16.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004293787 09.06.2005A1
Priority number Date
WO2004US38689 17.11.2004
US52385603 20.11.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004308972C 26.11.2009C1
AU2004308972B 28.05.2009B2
AU2004308972 14.07.2005A1
Priority number Date
WO2004US43514 21.12.2004
US98982604 16.11.2004
US53242603 24.12.2003
WO2004US38262 16.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004324192 27.04.2006A2
AU2004324192 27.04.2006A1
Priority number Date
WO2004US34878 13.10.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2005249490B 29.07.2010B2
AU2005249490 15.12.2005A1
Priority number Date
WO2005US18829 31.05.2005
US61609804 05.10.2004
US57651704 01.06.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2005269967 09.02.2006A2
AU2005269967 09.02.2006A1
Priority number Date
US88604004 08.07.2004
WO2005US24019 07.07.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2005282496 16.03.2006A1
Priority number Date
WO2005US31798 07.09.2005
US93662604 08.09.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2005295131B 16.06.2011B2
AU2005295131 20.04.2006A1
Priority number Date
US96426304 12.10.2004
US15991905 22.06.2005
WO2005US37114 12.10.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2006203137B 15.01.2009B2
AU2006203137 10.08.2006A1
Priority number Date
US32326801 18.09.2001
US37888502 08.05.2002
US31428001 22.08.2001
US30188001 29.06.2001
US0219592 19.06.2002
US36686902 20.03.2002
US30481301 11.07.2001
US33922701 19.10.2001
AU2002318371 19.06.2002
US29950001 20.06.2001
US31231201 13.08.2001
US33682701 07.11.2001
US30088001 25.06.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2006230703 09.11.2006A1
Priority number Date
US0126626 23.08.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2006235436 19.10.2006A2
AU2006235436 19.10.2006A1
Priority number Date
US10250105 08.04.2005
WO2006US13501 05.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2006241374B 22.10.2009B2
AU2006241374 14.12.2006A1
Priority number Date
US22891400 29.08.2000
US0100847 11.01.2001
US19708900 14.04.2000
US17584900 13.01.2000
AU3276801 01.01.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2006252241B 04.03.2010B2
AU2006252241 25.01.2007A1
Priority number Date
US0120116 22.06.2001
AU2006252241 20.12.2006
US23097800 07.09.2000
US21363700 23.06.2000
AU2001268714 22.06.2001
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2007325316C 20.11.2014C1
AU2007325316B 09.05.2013B2
AU2007325316 05.06.2008A1
Priority number Date
WO2007US85269 20.11.2007
US60619206 29.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2008229758B 26.07.2012B2
AU2008229758 06.11.2008A1
Priority number Date
AU2004259638 02.06.2004
US48559903 08.07.2003
WO2004US17581 02.06.2004
US48645703 11.07.2003
AU2008229758 02.10.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2009200399B 24.05.2012B2
AU2009200399 26.02.2009A1
Priority number Date
AU2009200399 03.02.2009
US32326801 18.09.2001
US37888502 08.05.2002
US31428001 22.08.2001
US30188001 29.06.2001
US36686902 20.03.2002
AU2006203137 21.07.2006
US30481301 11.07.2001
US33922701 19.10.2001
US29950001 20.06.2001
US31231201 13.08.2001
US33682701 07.11.2001
US30088001 25.06.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2009200401 26.02.2009A1
Priority number Date
US30188001 29.06.2001
AU2006203137 21.07.2006
US36686902 20.03.2002
US30481301 11.07.2001
US33922701 19.10.2001
US29950001 20.06.2001
US31231201 13.08.2001
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
US37888502 08.05.2002
US30088001 25.06.2001
US31428001 22.08.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2009200614 05.03.2009A1
Priority number Date
AU2002365246 30.07.2002
US0127099 29.08.2001
US13657402 29.04.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2009202783C 15.11.2012C1
AU2009202783B 03.05.2012B2
AU2009202783 30.07.2009A1
Priority number Date
AU2004308972 21.12.2004
WO2004US43514 21.12.2004
AU2009202783 09.07.2009
US98982604 16.11.2004
US53242603 24.12.2003
WO2004US38262 16.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2009210627 13.08.2009A1
Priority number Date
WO2009US30851 13.01.2009
US2381108 31.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2009213070B 15.12.2011B9
AU2009213070B 01.12.2011B2
AU2009213070 08.10.2009A1
Priority number Date
US52084203 17.11.2003
AU2004291141 16.11.2004
US53242603 24.12.2003
AU2009213070 11.09.2009
WO2004US38262 16.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2010209998 02.09.2010A1
Priority number Date
US0331207 01.10.2003
US63300803 31.07.2003
US26554202 03.10.2002
AU2003277226 01.10.2003
AU2010209998 06.08.2010
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2011203347B 05.09.2013B2
AU2011203347 28.07.2011A1
Priority number Date
AU2009213070 11.09.2009
AU2011203347 07.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2012211366 23.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
AU2009202783 09.07.2009
AU2012211366 02.08.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0510883 26.12.2007A
Priority number Date
WO2005US18829 31.05.2005
US61609804 05.10.2004
US57651704 01.06.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0515616 15.07.2008A
Priority number Date
WO2005US31798 07.09.2005
US93662604 08.09.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0609729 20.04.2010A2
Priority number Date
US10250105 08.04.2005
WO2006US13501 05.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0719288 15.04.2014A2
Priority number Date
WO2007US85269 20.11.2007
US60619206 29.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0908854 24.09.2019A2
Priority number Date
WO2009US30851 13.01.2009
US2381108 31.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2188017 28.09.2010C
CA2188017 02.11.1995A1
Priority number Date
US23360994 25.04.1994
US9504467 06.04.1995
US28630494 05.08.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2249206 09.10.1997A1
Priority number Date
US71080296 23.09.1996
US62532896 01.04.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2270869 14.05.1998A1
Priority number Date
US87669897 16.06.1997
US9720069 05.11.1997
US74369896 06.11.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2293740 23.12.1998A1
Priority number Date
US87816897 18.06.1997
US9812456 12.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2301847 04.03.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9814552 14.07.1998
US91887497 26.08.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2303834 25.03.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5918497 17.09.1997
US6645397 24.11.1997
US6569397 18.11.1997
US6343597 29.10.1997
US6312897 24.10.1997
US6387097 31.10.1997
US5912197 17.09.1997
US6312097 24.10.1997
US6355097 28.10.1997
US6651197 24.11.1997
US6370497 29.10.1997
US6410397 31.10.1997
US6348697 21.10.1997
US6212597 15.10.1997
US6354297 28.10.1997
US6354497 28.10.1997
US6373597 29.10.1997
US6304597 24.10.1997
US5926697 18.09.1997
US6518697 12.11.1997
US6480997 07.11.1997
US6312797 24.10.1997
US6584697 17.11.1997
US6421597 29.10.1997
US5912297 17.09.1997
US6312197 24.10.1997
US6636497 21.11.1997
US6612097 21.11.1997
US6332997 27.10.1997
US6332797 27.10.1997
US6646697 24.11.1997
US6677097 24.11.1997
US9819330 16.09.1998
US5911597 17.09.1997
US5911397 17.09.1997
US6281497 24.10.1997
US6424897 03.11.1997
US6281697 24.10.1997
US6684097 25.11.1997
US6228797 17.10.1997
US6356497 28.10.1997
US6373497 29.10.1997
US6228597 17.10.1997
US5911997 17.09.1997
US6373897 29.10.1997
US6354197 28.10.1997
US5911797 17.09.1997
US6677297 24.11.1997
US6354997 28.10.1997
US5926397 18.09.1997
US6373297 29.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2304102 01.04.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5983697 24.09.1997
US9817888 28.08.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2304129 01.04.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9819093 14.09.1998
US96050797 29.10.1997
US93382197 19.09.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2304810 10.05.2011C
CA2304810 01.04.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9819094 14.09.1998
US93449497 19.09.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2305385 21.05.2013C
CA2305385 29.04.1999A1
Priority number Date
US8332298 28.04.1998
US9821141 07.10.1998
US10541398 26.06.1998
US9086398 26.06.1998
US6531197 13.11.1997
US6225097 17.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2306183 06.05.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9822991 29.10.1998
US6370497 29.10.1997
US8169598 14.04.1998
US7361298 04.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2306450 10.07.2012C
CA2306450 06.05.1999A1
Priority number Date
US6370497 29.10.1997
US9822992 29.10.1998
US7361298 04.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2309358 03.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9819437 17.09.1998
US9824855 20.11.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US6636497 21.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2309783 28.06.2011C
CA2309783 03.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9825190 25.11.1998
US15834298 21.09.1998
US6684097 25.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2311640 10.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7409298 09.02.1998
US9825108 01.12.1998
US6942597 12.12.1997
US7594598 25.02.1998
US6933497 11.12.1997
US6987097 17.12.1997
US6741197 03.12.1997
US6987397 17.12.1997
US6933597 11.12.1997
US6801797 18.12.1997
US6969697 16.12.1997
US6970297 16.12.1997
US6969497 16.12.1997
US7044098 05.01.1998
US6927897 11.12.1997
US7408698 09.02.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2321677 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7745098 10.03.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US9905028 08.03.1999
US7764198 11.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2322792 14.09.2010C
CA2322792 23.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US4022098 17.03.1998
US9905190 10.03.1999
US18421698 02.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2323072 24.05.2011C
CA2323072 30.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9906098 19.03.1999
US7912498 23.03.1998
US8156998 13.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2324297 28.10.1999A1
Priority number Date
US11329698 22.12.1998
US9908847 23.04.1999
US8276798 23.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2326001 04.11.1999A1
Priority number Date
US10026398 14.09.1998
US9908615 20.04.1999
US8299998 24.04.1998
US8514998 12.05.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2328895 09.12.1999A1
Priority number Date
US9024698 22.06.1998
US9047298 24.06.1998
US8775998 02.06.1998
US9069198 25.06.1998
US9069598 25.06.1998
US8882698 10.06.1998
US9067698 25.06.1998
US8802898 04.06.1998
US8760798 02.06.1998
US8953298 17.06.1998
US9054098 24.06.1998
US9046198 24.06.1998
US9218298 09.07.1998
US8881098 10.06.1998
US9035598 23.06.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US8990898 18.06.1998
US9528298 04.08.1998
US9068898 25.06.1998
US8965398 17.06.1998
US9154498 01.07.1998
US8874298 10.06.1998
US8782798 03.06.1998
US9053598 24.06.1998
US8886398 11.06.1998
US9164698 02.07.1998
US9069098 25.06.1998
US9069498 25.06.1998
US8832698 04.06.1998
US8803098 04.06.1998
US8882598 10.06.1998
US9528598 04.08.1998
US9044598 24.06.1998
US8873498 10.06.1998
US8873098 10.06.1998
US8944098 16.06.1998
US8951298 16.06.1998
US9025298 22.06.1998
US9162898 02.07.1998
US8873898 10.06.1998
US8821298 05.06.1998
US9333998 20.07.1998
US9167398 02.07.1998
US8816798 05.06.1998
US8994798 19.06.1998
US8872298 10.06.1998
US8874198 10.06.1998
US9055798 24.06.1998
US8820298 05.06.1998
US9147898 02.07.1998
US8865598 09.06.1998
US8995298 19.06.1998
US9151998 02.07.1998
US9086298 26.06.1998
US8803398 04.06.1998
US9531898 04.08.1998
US9042998 24.06.1998
US8882498 10.06.1998
US9067898 25.06.1998
US9136098 01.07.1998
US8953898 17.06.1998
US9044498 24.06.1998
US8760998 02.06.1998
US8959998 17.06.1998
US8821798 05.06.1998
US9532198 04.08.1998
US8994898 19.06.1998
US9198298 07.07.1998
US8909098 12.06.1998
US9532598 04.08.1998
US8885898 11.06.1998
US9530298 04.08.1998
US9043598 24.06.1998
US8910598 12.06.1998
US9043198 24.06.1998
US8874098 10.06.1998
US9135898 01.07.1998
US8886198 11.06.1998
US9086398 26.06.1998
US8960098 17.06.1998
US9069698 25.06.1998
US8802998 04.06.1998
US9025498 22.06.1998
US9197898 07.07.1998
US8802598 04.06.1998
US8980198 18.06.1998
US9247298 10.07.1998
US8959898 17.06.1998
US8951498 16.06.1998
US9034998 23.06.1998
US9162698 02.07.1998
US9530198 04.08.1998
US9148698 02.07.1998
US8881198 10.06.1998
US9163398 02.07.1998
US9053898 24.06.1998
US8887698 11.06.1998
US8802198 04.06.1998
US8990798 18.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2339043 09.03.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9959898 09.09.1998
US10602398 28.10.1998
US10340198 07.10.1998
US10101498 18.09.1998
US10646498 30.10.1998
US10038898 15.09.1998
US9976398 10.09.1998
US10268498 01.10.1998
US9980898 10.09.1998
US10580798 27.10.1998
US10257198 30.09.1998
US10127998 22.09.1998
US10685698 03.11.1998
US10248498 30.09.1998
US10331598 07.10.1998
US10569498 26.10.1998
US10850098 29.10.1998
US9874998 01.09.1998
US9981698 10.09.1998
US10071098 17.09.1998
US9964298 09.09.1998
US9981298 10.09.1998
US10233098 29.09.1998
US10367898 08.10.1998
US9953698 09.09.1998
US10147998 23.09.1998
US10224098 29.09.1998
US10084898 18.09.1998
US10039098 15.09.1998
US10093098 17.09.1998
US10091998 17.09.1998
US10066198 16.09.1998
US10257098 30.09.1998
US10066298 16.09.1998
US10603098 28.10.1998
US1548001 11.12.2001
US10331498 07.10.1998
US10248798 30.09.1998
US10071198 17.09.1998
US10617898 28.10.1998
US10371198 08.10.1998
US10500298 20.10.1998
US10220798 29.09.1998
US9981598 10.09.1998
US9882198 02.09.1998
US10147498 23.09.1998
US10325898 06.10.1998
US10174398 24.09.1998
US10233198 29.09.1998
US10510498 21.10.1998
US10516998 22.10.1998
US9959698 09.09.1998
US10367998 08.10.1998
US10363398 08.10.1998
US10147698 23.09.1998
US10602998 28.10.1998
US10332898 07.10.1998
US10296598 02.10.1998
US10191698 24.09.1998
US10084998 18.09.1998
US10339698 07.10.1998
US9871698 01.09.1998
US9875098 01.09.1998
US10603398 28.10.1998
US10588198 27.10.1998
US10062798 16.09.1998
US9975498 10.09.1998
US10268798 01.10.1998
US10038598 15.09.1998
US9979298 10.09.1998
US10147598 23.09.1998
US9880398 02.09.1998
US10147198 23.09.1998
US9960298 09.09.1998
US10606298 27.10.1998
US10147798 23.09.1998
US10191598 24.09.1998
US9884398 02.09.1998
US10107198 18.09.1998
US10526698 22.10.1998
US9974198 10.09.1998
US10339598 07.10.1998
US10058498 16.09.1998
US10173898 24.09.1998
US10425798 14.10.1998
US94637401 04.09.2001
US10068498 17.09.1998
US10106898 18.09.1998
US10588298 27.10.1998
US10068398 17.09.1998
US10498798 20.10.1998
US10066498 16.09.1998
US10624898 29.10.1998
US10230798 29.09.1998
US10569398 26.10.1998
US10603298 28.10.1998
US10500098 20.10.1998
US10638498 29.10.1998
US10147298 23.09.1998
US10344998 06.10.1998
US10174198 24.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2341304 23.03.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9818824 10.09.1998
US9980398 10.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2341767 23.03.2000A1
Priority number Date
US10026298 14.09.1998
US9819177 14.09.1998
US9920944 13.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2343006 23.03.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9819437 17.09.1998
US9921547 15.09.1999
US10085898 17.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2343577 23.03.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9819330 16.09.1998
US9921090 15.09.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2344465 20.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9923089 05.10.1999
US10408098 13.10.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2344467 25.01.2011C
CA2344467 30.03.2000A1
Priority number Date
US10127998 22.09.1998
US9921194 15.09.1999
US12967499 16.04.1999
US11422398 30.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2347677 08.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9825108 01.12.1998
US11285098 16.12.1998
US11329698 22.12.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2347835 08.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US12395799 12.03.1999
US9825108 01.12.1998
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US9923089 05.10.1999
US13144599 28.04.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US11285098 16.12.1998
US9921547 15.09.1999
US9920944 13.09.1999
US11555499 12.01.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2348157 08.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9825108 01.12.1998
US11285098 16.12.1998
US11329698 22.12.1998
US9928409 30.11.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2348757 22.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US11555899 12.01.1999
US11285198 16.12.1998
US11573399 12.01.1999
US11996599 12.02.1999
US11351198 22.12.1998
US11953799 10.02.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US11314598 16.12.1998
US11556599 12.01.1999
US11934199 09.02.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2353775 29.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US11329698 22.12.1998
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US9928409 30.11.1999
US9930095 16.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2353799 29.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US13144599 28.04.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US13023299 21.04.1999
US11329698 22.12.1998
US9921547 15.09.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2354027 06.07.2000A1
Priority number Date
US11684399 22.01.1999
US11343098 23.12.1998
US12912299 13.04.1999
US9930720 22.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2354375 27.07.2000A1
Priority number Date
US0001441 19.01.2000
US23473099 21.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2361221 28.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
US0005601 01.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2361840 14.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0000376 06.01.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US12395799 12.03.1999
US13023299 21.04.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US13144599 28.04.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US12677399 29.03.1999
US9928551 02.12.1999
US9930095 16.12.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2361849 14.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US12395799 12.03.1999
US0004342 18.02.2000
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US9928409 30.11.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2362427 14.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US12395799 12.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9928214 29.11.1999
US12884999 12.04.1999
US9928551 02.12.1999
US9920944 13.09.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US9912252 02.06.1999
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US9908615 20.04.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US9928409 30.11.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US9923089 05.10.1999
US9928564 02.12.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13144599 28.04.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US9921547 15.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US12577599 23.03.1999
US12361899 10.03.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2362963 06.05.2014C
CA2362963 08.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US0005746 02.03.2000
US12309099 05.03.1999
US13573699 25.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2364572 19.10.2000A1
Priority number Date
US12884999 12.04.1999
US0009554 10.04.2000
US48078200 10.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2365610 26.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2365913 03.03.2015C
CA2365913 19.10.2000A1
Priority number Date
US0009699 12.04.2000
US12884999 12.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2367334 14.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US9928551 02.12.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2371434 14.12.2000A1
Priority number Date
US15011499 20.08.1999
US14932099 17.08.1999
US0013358 15.05.2000
US14932799 17.08.1999
US15173499 31.08.1999
US14479099 20.07.1999
US15170099 31.08.1999
US14684399 03.08.1999
US14818899 10.08.1999
US13838599 09.06.1999
US14939699 17.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2372511 22.11.2011C
CA2372511 21.12.2000A1
Priority number Date
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US14507099 20.07.1999
US16949599 07.12.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US13969599 15.06.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US14939699 17.08.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US0013358 15.05.2000
US9921547 15.09.1999
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2373915 07.12.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US0006884 15.03.2000
US14065099 22.06.1999
US0000376 06.01.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2375458 25.01.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0006884 15.03.2000
US14475899 20.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2376116 07.12.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928409 30.11.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2380355 08.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US19100700 21.03.2000
US16949599 07.12.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US9920111 01.09.1999
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US17548100 11.01.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2382302 14.07.2009C
CA2382302 25.03.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5918497 17.09.1997
US6645397 24.11.1997
US6569397 18.11.1997
US6343597 29.10.1997
US6312897 24.10.1997
US6387097 31.10.1997
US5912197 17.09.1997
US6312097 24.10.1997
US6355097 28.10.1997
US6651197 24.11.1997
US6370497 29.10.1997
US6410397 31.10.1997
US6348697 21.10.1997
US6212597 15.10.1997
US6354297 28.10.1997
US6354497 28.10.1997
US6373597 29.10.1997
US6304597 24.10.1997
US5926697 18.09.1997
US6518697 12.11.1997
US6480997 07.11.1997
US6312797 24.10.1997
US6584697 17.11.1997
US6421597 29.10.1997
US5912297 17.09.1997
US6312197 24.10.1997
US6636497 21.11.1997
US6612097 21.11.1997
US6332997 27.10.1997
US6332797 27.10.1997
US6646697 24.11.1997
US6677097 24.11.1997
US5911597 17.09.1997
US5911397 17.09.1997
US6281497 24.10.1997
US6424897 03.11.1997
US6281697 24.10.1997
US6684097 25.11.1997
US6228797 17.10.1997
CA2303834 16.09.1998
US6356497 28.10.1997
US6373497 29.10.1997
US6228597 17.10.1997
US5911997 17.09.1997
US6373897 29.10.1997
US6354197 28.10.1997
US5911797 17.09.1997
US6677297 24.11.1997
US6354997 28.10.1997
US5926397 18.09.1997
US6373297 29.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2382376 25.03.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5918497 17.09.1997
US6645397 24.11.1997
US6569397 18.11.1997
US6343597 29.10.1997
US6312897 24.10.1997
US6387097 31.10.1997
US5912197 17.09.1997
US6312097 24.10.1997
US6355097 28.10.1997
US6651197 24.11.1997
US6370497 29.10.1997
US6410397 31.10.1997
US6348697 21.10.1997
US6212597 15.10.1997
US6354297 28.10.1997
US6354497 28.10.1997
US6373597 29.10.1997
US6304597 24.10.1997
US5926697 18.09.1997
US6518697 12.11.1997
US6480997 07.11.1997
US6312797 24.10.1997
US6584697 17.11.1997
US6421597 29.10.1997
US5912297 17.09.1997
US6312197 24.10.1997
US6636497 21.11.1997
US6612097 21.11.1997
US6332997 27.10.1997
US6332797 27.10.1997
US6646697 24.11.1997
US6677097 24.11.1997
US5911597 17.09.1997
US5911397 17.09.1997
US6281497 24.10.1997
US6424897 03.11.1997
US6281697 24.10.1997
US6684097 25.11.1997
US6228797 17.10.1997
CA2303834 16.09.1998
US6356497 28.10.1997
US6373497 29.10.1997
US6228597 17.10.1997
US5911997 17.09.1997
US6373897 29.10.1997
US6354197 28.10.1997
US5911797 17.09.1997
US6677297 24.11.1997
US6354997 28.10.1997
US5926397 18.09.1997
US6373297 29.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2382409 25.03.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5918497 17.09.1997
US6645397 24.11.1997
US6569397 18.11.1997
US6343597 29.10.1997
US6312897 24.10.1997
US6387097 31.10.1997
US5912197 17.09.1997
US6312097 24.10.1997
US6355097 28.10.1997
US6651197 24.11.1997
US6370497 29.10.1997
US6410397 31.10.1997
US6348697 21.10.1997
US6212597 15.10.1997
US6354297 28.10.1997
US6354497 28.10.1997
US6373597 29.10.1997
US6304597 24.10.1997
US5926697 18.09.1997
US6518697 12.11.1997
US6480997 07.11.1997
US6312797 24.10.1997
US6584697 17.11.1997
US6421597 29.10.1997
US5912297 17.09.1997
US6312197 24.10.1997
US6636497 21.11.1997
US6612097 21.11.1997
US6332997 27.10.1997
US6332797 27.10.1997
US6646697 24.11.1997
US6677097 24.11.1997
US5911597 17.09.1997
US5911397 17.09.1997
US6281497 24.10.1997
US6424897 03.11.1997
US6281697 24.10.1997
US6684097 25.11.1997
US6228797 17.10.1997
CA2303834 16.09.1998
US6356497 28.10.1997
US6373497 29.10.1997
US6228597 17.10.1997
US5911997 17.09.1997
US6373897 29.10.1997
US6354197 28.10.1997
US5911797 17.09.1997
US6677297 24.11.1997
US6354997 28.10.1997
US5926397 18.09.1997
US6373297 29.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2382495 25.03.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5918497 17.09.1997
US6645397 24.11.1997
US6569397 18.11.1997
US6343597 29.10.1997
US6312897 24.10.1997
US6387097 31.10.1997
US5912197 17.09.1997
US6312097 24.10.1997
US6355097 28.10.1997
US6651197 24.11.1997
US6370497 29.10.1997
US6410397 31.10.1997
US6348697 21.10.1997
US6212597 15.10.1997
US6354297 28.10.1997
US6354497 28.10.1997
US6373597 29.10.1997
US6304597 24.10.1997
US5926697 18.09.1997
US6518697 12.11.1997
US6480997 07.11.1997
US6312797 24.10.1997
US6584697 17.11.1997
US6421597 29.10.1997
US5912297 17.09.1997
US6312197 24.10.1997
US6636497 21.11.1997
US6612097 21.11.1997
US6332997 27.10.1997
US6332797 27.10.1997
US6646697 24.11.1997
US6677097 24.11.1997
US5911597 17.09.1997
US5911397 17.09.1997
US6281497 24.10.1997
US6424897 03.11.1997
US6281697 24.10.1997
US6684097 25.11.1997
US6228797 17.10.1997
CA2303834 16.09.1998
US6356497 28.10.1997
US6373497 29.10.1997
US6228597 17.10.1997
US5911997 17.09.1997
US6373897 29.10.1997
US6354197 28.10.1997
US5911797 17.09.1997
US6677297 24.11.1997
US6354997 28.10.1997
US5926397 18.09.1997
US6373297 29.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2382506 25.03.1999A1
Priority number Date
US5918497 17.09.1997
US6645397 24.11.1997
US6569397 18.11.1997
US6343597 29.10.1997
US6312897 24.10.1997
US6387097 31.10.1997
US5912197 17.09.1997
US6312097 24.10.1997
US6355097 28.10.1997
US6651197 24.11.1997
US6370497 29.10.1997
US6410397 31.10.1997
US6348697 21.10.1997
US6212597 15.10.1997
US6354297 28.10.1997
US6354497 28.10.1997
US6373597 29.10.1997
US6304597 24.10.1997
US5926697 18.09.1997
US6518697 12.11.1997
US6480997 07.11.1997
US6312797 24.10.1997
US6584697 17.11.1997
US6421597 29.10.1997
US5912297 17.09.1997
US6312197 24.10.1997
US6636497 21.11.1997
US6612097 21.11.1997
US6332997 27.10.1997
US6332797 27.10.1997
US6646697 24.11.1997
US6677097 24.11.1997
US5911597 17.09.1997
US5911397 17.09.1997
US6281497 24.10.1997
US6424897 03.11.1997
US6281697 24.10.1997
US6684097 25.11.1997
US6228797 17.10.1997
CA2303834 16.09.1998
US6356497 28.10.1997
US6373497 29.10.1997
US6228597 17.10.1997
US5911997 17.09.1997
US6373897 29.10.1997
US6354197 28.10.1997
US5911797 17.09.1997
US6677297 24.11.1997
US6354997 28.10.1997
US5926397 18.09.1997
US6373297 29.10.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2383254 07.12.2000A1
Priority number Date
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US15866399 08.10.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US14304899 07.07.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US9912252 02.06.1999
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US14103799 23.06.1999
US14939699 17.08.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9921547 15.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2384055 08.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0014941 30.05.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US9920111 01.09.1999
US15173399 31.08.1999
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2384089 15.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9920594 08.09.1999
US0006471 09.03.2000
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930999 20.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2390685 22.04.2008C
CA2390685 12.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0000376 06.01.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2390786 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0030873 10.11.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US9928313 30.11.1999
US0004342 18.02.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US17548100 11.01.2000
US17205999 23.12.1999
US0023328 24.08.2000
US17711800 20.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2391374 28.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0007532 21.03.2000
US0004341 18.02.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US19100700 21.03.2000
US21380700 22.06.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US24283700 24.10.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US17548100 11.01.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US17209699 23.12.1999
US0032678 01.12.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2391455 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2396793 23.08.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0032378 28.11.2000
US18293800 16.02.2000
US22698600 22.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2397207 03.12.2013C
CA2397207 19.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
US22891400 29.08.2000
US0100847 11.01.2001
US19708900 14.04.2000
US17584900 13.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2398775 16.08.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0034756 19.12.2000
US25366500 28.11.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2401448 20.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US18932000 14.03.2000
US19600000 11.04.2000
US19812100 18.04.2000
US19965400 25.04.2000
US19858500 18.04.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US19265500 28.03.2000
US0106520 28.02.2001
US19464700 04.04.2000
US19682000 11.04.2000
US19082800 21.03.2000
US19303200 29.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US19305300 29.03.2000
US20151600 03.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US19104800 21.03.2000
US19100700 21.03.2000
US19955000 25.04.2000
US18696800 06.03.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US19131400 21.03.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US19618700 11.04.2000
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19669000 11.04.2000
US18932800 14.03.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US19444900 04.04.2000
US19597500 11.04.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2402191 13.03.2012C
CA2402191 04.10.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0109230 22.03.2001
US19210300 24.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2404248 18.09.2007C
CA2404248 10.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
US6741197 03.12.1997
US6933597 11.12.1997
CA2311640 01.12.1998
US6933497 11.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2405791 22.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US11953799 10.02.1999
CA2348757 01.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2405945 22.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US11285198 16.12.1998
CA2348757 01.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2406256 22.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US11555899 12.01.1999
CA2348757 01.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2407803 22.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US11996599 12.02.1999
CA2348757 01.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2408167 10.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
US6741197 03.12.1997
US6933597 11.12.1997
CA2311640 01.12.1998
US6933497 11.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2410162 13.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2412211 03.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US64365700 17.08.2000
US80270601 09.03.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US0119692 20.06.2001
US76760901 22.01.2001
US66535000 18.09.2000
US86602801 25.05.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US82836601 05.04.2001
US87057401 30.05.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US24292200 24.10.2000
US79649801 28.02.2001
US70923800 08.11.2000
US66461000 18.09.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0117443 30.05.2001
US22269500 02.08.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US80868901 14.03.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US86603401 25.05.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US21363700 23.06.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2412612 30.04.2013C
CA2412612 03.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US0120116 22.06.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US21363700 23.06.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2416456 31.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US0117092 25.05.2001
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0121066 29.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2416538 31.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US64365700 17.08.2000
US80270601 09.03.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US0119692 20.06.2001
US76760901 22.01.2001
US66535000 18.09.2000
US86602801 25.05.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US82836601 05.04.2001
US87057401 30.05.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US24292200 24.10.2000
US79649801 28.02.2001
US70923800 08.11.2000
US66461000 18.09.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0117443 30.05.2001
US22269500 02.08.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0121735 09.07.2001
US85428001 10.05.2001
US80868901 14.03.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US86603401 25.05.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2419541 10.01.2012C
CA2419541 28.02.2002A1
Priority number Date
US0117443 30.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2420140 28.02.2002A1
Priority number Date
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US0120118 22.06.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US23545100 26.09.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2420176 28.02.2002A1
Priority number Date
US0125464 14.08.2001
US88825701 22.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0120118 22.06.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2420193 28.02.2002A1
Priority number Date
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0121735 09.07.2001
US0126626 23.08.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US0119692 20.06.2001
US0121066 29.06.2001
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2420867 05.02.2013C
CA2420867 07.03.2002A1
Priority number Date
US75905601 11.01.2001
US22891400 29.08.2000
US0121635 10.07.2001
US90181201 10.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421056 28.03.2002A1
Priority number Date
US26187801 12.01.2001
US22989600 01.09.2000
US0121735 09.07.2001
US28212901 04.04.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US26193901 16.01.2001
US26215001 16.01.2001
US23062100 05.09.2000
US28098201 03.04.2001
US23514700 22.09.2000
US0119692 20.06.2001
US27439901 09.03.2001
US26762301 09.02.2001
US26439501 25.01.2001
US0121066 29.06.2001
US28219901 04.04.2001
US26191001 16.01.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0127099 29.08.2001
US26642101 02.02.2001
US0117800 01.06.2001
US29058901 09.05.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421272 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7893698 20.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421278 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US7764198 11.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421286 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US8355498 29.04.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421315 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US8354598 29.04.1998
US8444198 06.05.1998
US8570498 15.05.1998
US8463998 07.05.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US8436698 05.05.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8463798 07.05.1998
US8570098 15.05.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US8333698 27.04.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8349598 29.04.1998
US8104998 08.04.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US8557998 15.05.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8183898 15.04.1998
US8181798 15.04.1998
US8349998 29.04.1998
US8557398 15.05.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US8639298 22.05.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US8558098 15.05.1998
US8332298 28.04.1998
US8374298 30.04.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US8355998 29.04.1998
US8441498 06.05.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8710698 28.05.1998
US8720898 28.05.1998
US8464398 07.05.1998
US8533898 13.05.1998
US8256998 21.04.1998
US8602398 18.05.1998
US8122998 09.04.1998
US8279698 23.04.1998
US8459898 07.05.1998
US8195598 15.04.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8558298 15.05.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US8339298 29.04.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8568998 15.05.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8119598 09.04.1998
US8276798 23.04.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8270098 22.04.1998
US8349698 29.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US8532398 13.05.1998
US8643098 22.05.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US8355498 29.04.1998
US8464098 07.05.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US8280498 22.04.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US8355898 29.04.1998
US8709898 28.05.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8462798 07.05.1998
US8569798 15.05.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US8460098 07.05.1998
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8533998 13.05.1998
US8256898 21.04.1998
US8270498 22.04.1998
US8120398 09.04.1998
US8195298 15.04.1998
US8648698 22.05.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421319 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US8354598 29.04.1998
US8444198 06.05.1998
US8570498 15.05.1998
US8463998 07.05.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US8436698 05.05.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8463798 07.05.1998
US8570098 15.05.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US8333698 27.04.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8349598 29.04.1998
US8104998 08.04.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US8557998 15.05.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8183898 15.04.1998
US8181798 15.04.1998
US8349998 29.04.1998
US8557398 15.05.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US8639298 22.05.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US8558098 15.05.1998
US8332298 28.04.1998
US8374298 30.04.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US8355998 29.04.1998
US8441498 06.05.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8710698 28.05.1998
US8720898 28.05.1998
US8464398 07.05.1998
US8533898 13.05.1998
US8256998 21.04.1998
US8602398 18.05.1998
US8122998 09.04.1998
US8279698 23.04.1998
US8459898 07.05.1998
US8195598 15.04.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8558298 15.05.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US8339298 29.04.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8568998 15.05.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8119598 09.04.1998
US8276798 23.04.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8270098 22.04.1998
US8349698 29.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US8532398 13.05.1998
US8643098 22.05.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US8355498 29.04.1998
US8464098 07.05.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US8280498 22.04.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US8355898 29.04.1998
US8709898 28.05.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8462798 07.05.1998
US8569798 15.05.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US8460098 07.05.1998
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8533998 13.05.1998
US8256898 21.04.1998
US8270498 22.04.1998
US8120398 09.04.1998
US8195298 15.04.1998
US8648698 22.05.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421322 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US8354598 29.04.1998
US8444198 06.05.1998
US8570498 15.05.1998
US8463998 07.05.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US8436698 05.05.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8463798 07.05.1998
US8570098 15.05.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US8333698 27.04.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8349598 29.04.1998
US8104998 08.04.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US8557998 15.05.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8183898 15.04.1998
US8181798 15.04.1998
US8349998 29.04.1998
US8557398 15.05.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US8639298 22.05.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US8558098 15.05.1998
US8332298 28.04.1998
US8374298 30.04.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US8355998 29.04.1998
US8441498 06.05.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8710698 28.05.1998
US8720898 28.05.1998
US8464398 07.05.1998
US8533898 13.05.1998
US8256998 21.04.1998
US8602398 18.05.1998
US8122998 09.04.1998
US8279698 23.04.1998
US8459898 07.05.1998
US8195598 15.04.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8558298 15.05.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US8339298 29.04.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8568998 15.05.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8119598 09.04.1998
US8276798 23.04.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8270098 22.04.1998
US8349698 29.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US8532398 13.05.1998
US8643098 22.05.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US8355498 29.04.1998
US8464098 07.05.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US8280498 22.04.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US8355898 29.04.1998
US8709898 28.05.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8462798 07.05.1998
US8569798 15.05.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US8460098 07.05.1998
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8533998 13.05.1998
US8256898 21.04.1998
US8270498 22.04.1998
US8120398 09.04.1998
US8195298 15.04.1998
US8648698 22.05.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421329 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US8354598 29.04.1998
US8444198 06.05.1998
US8570498 15.05.1998
US8463998 07.05.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US8436698 05.05.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8463798 07.05.1998
US8570098 15.05.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US8333698 27.04.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8349598 29.04.1998
US8104998 08.04.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US8557998 15.05.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8183898 15.04.1998
US8181798 15.04.1998
US8349998 29.04.1998
US8557398 15.05.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US8639298 22.05.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US8558098 15.05.1998
US8332298 28.04.1998
US8374298 30.04.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US8355998 29.04.1998
US8441498 06.05.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8710698 28.05.1998
US8720898 28.05.1998
US8464398 07.05.1998
US8533898 13.05.1998
US8256998 21.04.1998
US8602398 18.05.1998
US8122998 09.04.1998
US8279698 23.04.1998
US8459898 07.05.1998
US8195598 15.04.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8558298 15.05.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US8339298 29.04.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8568998 15.05.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8119598 09.04.1998
US8276798 23.04.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8270098 22.04.1998
US8349698 29.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US8532398 13.05.1998
US8643098 22.05.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US8355498 29.04.1998
US8464098 07.05.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US8280498 22.04.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US8355898 29.04.1998
US8709898 28.05.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8462798 07.05.1998
US8569798 15.05.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US8460098 07.05.1998
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8533998 13.05.1998
US8256898 21.04.1998
US8270498 22.04.1998
US8120398 09.04.1998
US8195298 15.04.1998
US8648698 22.05.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421333 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US8354598 29.04.1998
US8444198 06.05.1998
US8570498 15.05.1998
US8463998 07.05.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US8436698 05.05.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8463798 07.05.1998
US8570098 15.05.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US8333698 27.04.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8349598 29.04.1998
US8104998 08.04.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US8557998 15.05.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8183898 15.04.1998
US8181798 15.04.1998
US8349998 29.04.1998
US8557398 15.05.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US8639298 22.05.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US8558098 15.05.1998
US8332298 28.04.1998
US8374298 30.04.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US8355998 29.04.1998
US8441498 06.05.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8710698 28.05.1998
US8720898 28.05.1998
US8464398 07.05.1998
US8533898 13.05.1998
US8256998 21.04.1998
US8602398 18.05.1998
US8122998 09.04.1998
US8279698 23.04.1998
US8459898 07.05.1998
US8195598 15.04.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8558298 15.05.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US8339298 29.04.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8568998 15.05.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8119598 09.04.1998
US8276798 23.04.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8270098 22.04.1998
US8349698 29.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US8532398 13.05.1998
US8643098 22.05.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US8355498 29.04.1998
US8464098 07.05.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US8280498 22.04.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US8355898 29.04.1998
US8709898 28.05.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8462798 07.05.1998
US8569798 15.05.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US8460098 07.05.1998
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8533998 13.05.1998
US8256898 21.04.1998
US8270498 22.04.1998
US8120398 09.04.1998
US8195298 15.04.1998
US8648698 22.05.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421339 20.07.2010C
CA2421339 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US8354598 29.04.1998
US8444198 06.05.1998
US8570498 15.05.1998
US8463998 07.05.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US8436698 05.05.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8463798 07.05.1998
US8570098 15.05.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US8333698 27.04.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8349598 29.04.1998
US8104998 08.04.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US8557998 15.05.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8183898 15.04.1998
US8181798 15.04.1998
US8349998 29.04.1998
US8557398 15.05.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US8639298 22.05.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US8558098 15.05.1998
US8332298 28.04.1998
US8374298 30.04.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US8355998 29.04.1998
US8441498 06.05.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8710698 28.05.1998
US8720898 28.05.1998
US8464398 07.05.1998
US8533898 13.05.1998
US8256998 21.04.1998
US8602398 18.05.1998
US8122998 09.04.1998
US8279698 23.04.1998
US8459898 07.05.1998
US8195598 15.04.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8558298 15.05.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US8339298 29.04.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8568998 15.05.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8119598 09.04.1998
US8276798 23.04.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8270098 22.04.1998
US8349698 29.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US8532398 13.05.1998
US8643098 22.05.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US8355498 29.04.1998
US8464098 07.05.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US8280498 22.04.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US8355898 29.04.1998
US8709898 28.05.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8462798 07.05.1998
US8569798 15.05.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US8460098 07.05.1998
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8533998 13.05.1998
US8256898 21.04.1998
US8270498 22.04.1998
US8120398 09.04.1998
US8195298 15.04.1998
US8648698 22.05.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421345 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US8354598 29.04.1998
US8444198 06.05.1998
US8570498 15.05.1998
US8463998 07.05.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US8436698 05.05.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8463798 07.05.1998
US8570098 15.05.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US8333698 27.04.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8349598 29.04.1998
US8104998 08.04.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US8557998 15.05.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8183898 15.04.1998
US8181798 15.04.1998
US8349998 29.04.1998
US8557398 15.05.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US8639298 22.05.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US8558098 15.05.1998
US8332298 28.04.1998
US8374298 30.04.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US8355998 29.04.1998
US8441498 06.05.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8710698 28.05.1998
US8720898 28.05.1998
US8464398 07.05.1998
US8533898 13.05.1998
US8256998 21.04.1998
US8602398 18.05.1998
US8122998 09.04.1998
US8279698 23.04.1998
US8459898 07.05.1998
US8195598 15.04.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8558298 15.05.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US8339298 29.04.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8568998 15.05.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8119598 09.04.1998
US8276798 23.04.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8270098 22.04.1998
US8349698 29.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US8532398 13.05.1998
US8643098 22.05.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US8355498 29.04.1998
US8464098 07.05.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US8280498 22.04.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US8355898 29.04.1998
US8709898 28.05.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8462798 07.05.1998
US8569798 15.05.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US8460098 07.05.1998
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8533998 13.05.1998
US8256898 21.04.1998
US8270498 22.04.1998
US8120398 09.04.1998
US8195298 15.04.1998
US8648698 22.05.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421364 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US8354598 29.04.1998
US8444198 06.05.1998
US8570498 15.05.1998
US8463998 07.05.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US8436698 05.05.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8463798 07.05.1998
US8570098 15.05.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US8333698 27.04.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8349598 29.04.1998
US8104998 08.04.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US8557998 15.05.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8183898 15.04.1998
US8181798 15.04.1998
US8349998 29.04.1998
US8557398 15.05.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US8639298 22.05.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US8558098 15.05.1998
US8332298 28.04.1998
US8374298 30.04.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US8355998 29.04.1998
US8441498 06.05.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8710698 28.05.1998
US8720898 28.05.1998
US8464398 07.05.1998
US8533898 13.05.1998
US8256998 21.04.1998
US8602398 18.05.1998
US8122998 09.04.1998
US8279698 23.04.1998
US8459898 07.05.1998
US8195598 15.04.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8558298 15.05.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US8339298 29.04.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8568998 15.05.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8119598 09.04.1998
US8276798 23.04.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8270098 22.04.1998
US8349698 29.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US8532398 13.05.1998
US8643098 22.05.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US8355498 29.04.1998
US8464098 07.05.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US8280498 22.04.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US8355898 29.04.1998
US8709898 28.05.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8462798 07.05.1998
US8569798 15.05.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US8460098 07.05.1998
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8533998 13.05.1998
US8256898 21.04.1998
US8270498 22.04.1998
US8120398 09.04.1998
US8195298 15.04.1998
US8648698 22.05.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421372 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US8354598 29.04.1998
US8444198 06.05.1998
US8570498 15.05.1998
US8463998 07.05.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US8436698 05.05.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8463798 07.05.1998
US8570098 15.05.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US8333698 27.04.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8349598 29.04.1998
US8104998 08.04.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US8557998 15.05.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8183898 15.04.1998
US8181798 15.04.1998
US8349998 29.04.1998
US8557398 15.05.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US8639298 22.05.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US8558098 15.05.1998
US8332298 28.04.1998
US8374298 30.04.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US8355998 29.04.1998
US8441498 06.05.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8710698 28.05.1998
US8720898 28.05.1998
US8464398 07.05.1998
US8533898 13.05.1998
US8256998 21.04.1998
US8602398 18.05.1998
US8122998 09.04.1998
US8279698 23.04.1998
US8459898 07.05.1998
US8195598 15.04.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8558298 15.05.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US8339298 29.04.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8568998 15.05.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8119598 09.04.1998
US8276798 23.04.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8270098 22.04.1998
US8349698 29.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US8532398 13.05.1998
US8643098 22.05.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US8355498 29.04.1998
US8464098 07.05.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US8280498 22.04.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US8355898 29.04.1998
US8709898 28.05.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8462798 07.05.1998
US8569798 15.05.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US8460098 07.05.1998
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8533998 13.05.1998
US8256898 21.04.1998
US8270498 22.04.1998
US8120398 09.04.1998
US8195298 15.04.1998
US8648698 22.05.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421375 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US8354598 29.04.1998
US8444198 06.05.1998
US8570498 15.05.1998
US8463998 07.05.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US8436698 05.05.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8463798 07.05.1998
US8570098 15.05.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US8333698 27.04.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8349598 29.04.1998
US8104998 08.04.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US8557998 15.05.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8183898 15.04.1998
US8181798 15.04.1998
US8349998 29.04.1998
US8557398 15.05.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US8639298 22.05.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US8558098 15.05.1998
US8332298 28.04.1998
US8374298 30.04.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US8355998 29.04.1998
US8441498 06.05.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8710698 28.05.1998
US8720898 28.05.1998
US8464398 07.05.1998
US8533898 13.05.1998
US8256998 21.04.1998
US8602398 18.05.1998
US8122998 09.04.1998
US8279698 23.04.1998
US8459898 07.05.1998
US8195598 15.04.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8558298 15.05.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US8339298 29.04.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8568998 15.05.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8119598 09.04.1998
US8276798 23.04.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8270098 22.04.1998
US8349698 29.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US8532398 13.05.1998
US8643098 22.05.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US8355498 29.04.1998
US8464098 07.05.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US8280498 22.04.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US8355898 29.04.1998
US8709898 28.05.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8462798 07.05.1998
US8569798 15.05.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US8460098 07.05.1998
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8533998 13.05.1998
US8256898 21.04.1998
US8270498 22.04.1998
US8120398 09.04.1998
US8195298 15.04.1998
US8648698 22.05.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421388 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US8354598 29.04.1998
US8444198 06.05.1998
US8570498 15.05.1998
US8463998 07.05.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US8436698 05.05.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8463798 07.05.1998
US8570098 15.05.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US8333698 27.04.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8349598 29.04.1998
US8104998 08.04.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US8557998 15.05.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8183898 15.04.1998
US8181798 15.04.1998
US8349998 29.04.1998
US8557398 15.05.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US8639298 22.05.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US8558098 15.05.1998
US8332298 28.04.1998
US8374298 30.04.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US8355998 29.04.1998
US8441498 06.05.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8710698 28.05.1998
US8720898 28.05.1998
US8464398 07.05.1998
US8533898 13.05.1998
US8256998 21.04.1998
US8602398 18.05.1998
US8122998 09.04.1998
US8279698 23.04.1998
US8459898 07.05.1998
US8195598 15.04.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8558298 15.05.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US8339298 29.04.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8568998 15.05.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8119598 09.04.1998
US8276798 23.04.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8270098 22.04.1998
US8349698 29.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US8532398 13.05.1998
US8643098 22.05.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US8355498 29.04.1998
US8464098 07.05.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US8280498 22.04.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US8355898 29.04.1998
US8709898 28.05.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8462798 07.05.1998
US8569798 15.05.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US8460098 07.05.1998
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8533998 13.05.1998
US8256898 21.04.1998
US8270498 22.04.1998
US8120398 09.04.1998
US8195298 15.04.1998
US8648698 22.05.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2421394 16.09.1999A1
Priority number Date
US7929498 25.03.1998
US8354598 29.04.1998
US8444198 06.05.1998
US8570498 15.05.1998
US8463998 07.05.1998
US8033398 01.04.1998
US8436698 05.05.1998
US4022098 17.03.1998
US8463798 07.05.1998
US8570098 15.05.1998
US8010598 31.03.1998
US8333698 27.04.1998
US8010798 31.03.1998
US8641498 22.05.1998
US8349598 29.04.1998
US8104998 08.04.1998
US8032898 01.04.1998
US8557998 15.05.1998
US7745098 10.03.1998
US8183898 15.04.1998
US8181798 15.04.1998
US8349998 29.04.1998
US8557398 15.05.1998
US7992098 30.03.1998
US8639298 22.05.1998
US7966498 27.03.1998
US7893998 20.03.1998
US8558098 15.05.1998
US8332298 28.04.1998
US8374298 30.04.1998
US7968998 27.03.1998
US8355998 29.04.1998
US8441498 06.05.1998
US7891098 20.03.1998
US8107098 08.04.1998
US8710698 28.05.1998
US8720898 28.05.1998
US8464398 07.05.1998
US8533898 13.05.1998
US8256998 21.04.1998
US8602398 18.05.1998
US8122998 09.04.1998
US8279698 23.04.1998
US8459898 07.05.1998
US8195598 15.04.1998
US9465198 30.07.1998
US7972898 27.03.1998
US8558298 15.05.1998
US8019498 31.03.1998
US7888698 20.03.1998
US8350098 29.04.1998
US8339298 29.04.1998
US7764998 11.03.1998
US7965698 26.03.1998
US8568998 15.05.1998
US8033498 01.04.1998
US8119598 09.04.1998
US8276798 23.04.1998
US7800498 13.03.1998
US7764198 11.03.1998
US8270098 22.04.1998
US8349698 29.04.1998
US10003898 11.09.1998
US8016598 31.03.1998
US8532398 13.05.1998
US8643098 22.05.1998
US7992398 30.03.1998
CA2321677 08.03.1999
US8355498 29.04.1998
US8464098 07.05.1998
US7779198 12.03.1998
US7966398 27.03.1998
US8280498 22.04.1998
US7893698 20.03.1998
US8355898 29.04.1998
US8709898 28.05.1998
US7763298 11.03.1998
US8462798 07.05.1998
US8569798 15.05.1998
US8032798 01.04.1998
US8460098 07.05.1998
US7978698 27.03.1998
US8533998 13.05.1998
US8256898 21.04.1998
US8270498 22.04.1998
US8120398 09.04.1998
US8195298 15.04.1998
US8648698 22.05.1998
US8107198 08.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2423991 04.04.2002A1
Priority number Date
US0130290 26.09.2001
US23545100 26.09.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2439594 12.09.2002A1
Priority number Date
US94199201 28.08.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0148060 07.12.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2441700 03.10.2002A1
Priority number Date
US0109552 22.03.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2449602 19.12.2002A1
Priority number Date
US88045701 12.06.2001
US0210513 03.04.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2450402 29.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US13144599 28.04.1999
US13023299 21.04.1999
CA2353799 02.12.1999
US11329698 22.12.1998
US9921547 15.09.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2451239 03.01.2003A1
Priority number Date
US30188001 29.06.2001
US0219592 19.06.2002
US36686902 20.03.2002
US30481301 11.07.2001
US33922701 19.10.2001
US29950001 20.06.2001
US31231201 13.08.2001
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
US37888502 08.05.2002
US30088001 25.06.2001
US31428001 22.08.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2458751 10.07.2003A1
Priority number Date
US0224252 30.07.2002
US0127099 29.08.2001
US13657402 29.04.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2460120 27.03.2003A1
Priority number Date
US33190601 20.11.2001
US0228859 11.09.2002
US36972402 03.04.2002
US40480902 19.08.2002
US33922701 19.10.2001
US34544402 02.01.2002
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2470900 03.07.2003A1
Priority number Date
US0233050 16.10.2002
US2807201 19.12.2001
US11948002 09.04.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2471431 17.07.2003A1
Priority number Date
US36200402 05.03.2002
US40564502 21.08.2002
US36686902 20.03.2002
US35188502 25.01.2002
US36867902 28.03.2002
US40480902 19.08.2002
US0241798 30.12.2002
US36006602 25.02.2002
US34544402 02.01.2002
US36628402 21.03.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2478369 18.09.2003A1
Priority number Date
US36199502 05.03.2002
US0305169 18.02.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2478728 14.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US16250699 29.10.1999
CA2367334 02.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2478730 14.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US16250699 29.10.1999
CA2367334 02.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2478736 14.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US16250699 29.10.1999
CA2367334 02.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2479476 10.11.2009C
CA2479476 26.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
CA2365610 11.02.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2479494 02.02.2010C
CA2479494 26.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
CA2365610 11.02.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2479498 26.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
CA2365610 11.02.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2479511 26.07.2001A1
Priority number Date
US15168999 31.08.1999
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US14939599 17.08.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
CA2365610 11.02.2000
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2481085 30.10.2003A1
Priority number Date
US0212206 17.04.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2481507 30.10.2003A1
Priority number Date
US37316002 16.04.2002
US40480902 19.08.2002
US0311148 10.04.2003
US37888502 08.05.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2481685 08.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9920111 01.09.1999
CA2380355 24.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2481691 08.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9920111 01.09.1999
CA2380355 24.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2481731 09.08.2011C
CA2481731 08.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9920111 01.09.1999
CA2380355 24.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2481756 08.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9920111 01.09.1999
CA2380355 24.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2481788 08.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9920111 01.09.1999
CA2380355 24.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2490853 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
CA2391455 01.12.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2490909 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
CA2391455 01.12.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2491258 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
CA2391455 01.12.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2491433 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
CA2391455 01.12.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2491610 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
CA2391455 01.12.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2492049 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
CA2391455 01.12.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2492070 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
CA2391455 01.12.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2494705 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
CA2391455 01.12.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2495389 26.02.2004A1
Priority number Date
US40564502 21.08.2002
US40480902 19.08.2002
US41319202 23.09.2002
US42684702 15.11.2002
US48495903 02.07.2003
US41900802 15.10.2002
US0325892 19.08.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2496312 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
CA2391455 01.12.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2498631 21.07.2015C
CA2498631 15.04.2004A1
Priority number Date
US0331207 01.10.2003
US63300803 31.07.2003
US26554202 03.10.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2501815 14.12.2000A1
Priority number Date
US15011499 20.08.1999
US14932099 17.08.1999
US14932799 17.08.1999
US15173499 31.08.1999
US14479099 20.07.1999
CA2371434 15.05.2000
US15170099 31.08.1999
US14684399 03.08.1999
US14818899 10.08.1999
US13838599 09.06.1999
US14939699 17.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2503475 08.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US12395799 12.03.1999
US9825108 01.12.1998
US9921090 15.09.1999
US9905028 08.03.1999
US16250699 29.10.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US13428799 14.05.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US9923089 05.10.1999
US13144599 28.04.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US11285098 16.12.1998
US9921547 15.09.1999
US9920944 13.09.1999
CA2347835 30.11.1999
US11555499 12.01.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2504679 14.12.2000A1
Priority number Date
US15011499 20.08.1999
US14932099 17.08.1999
US14932799 17.08.1999
US15173499 31.08.1999
US14479099 20.07.1999
CA2371434 15.05.2000
US15170099 31.08.1999
US14684399 03.08.1999
US14818899 10.08.1999
US13838599 09.06.1999
US14939699 17.08.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2505705 15.05.2012C
CA2505705 03.06.2004A1
Priority number Date
US43125002 06.12.2002
US42684702 15.11.2002
US0336298 13.11.2003
US43734402 31.12.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2510797 08.12.2009C
CA2510797 28.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
CA2361221 01.03.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2510806 28.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
CA2361221 01.03.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2510931 28.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
CA2361221 01.03.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2510982 28.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
CA2361221 01.03.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2512291 28.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
CA2361221 01.03.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2512479 28.09.2000A1
Priority number Date
US14697099 03.08.1999
CA2361221 01.03.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
US13575099 25.05.1999
US13237999 04.05.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13237199 04.05.1999
US13238399 04.05.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US13816699 08.06.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US14479199 20.07.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2530284 03.02.2005A1
Priority number Date
US48559903 08.07.2003
WO2004US17581 02.06.2004
US48645703 11.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2530393 13.01.2005A1
Priority number Date
WO2004US21353 02.07.2004
US48495903 02.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2531917 20.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US18932000 14.03.2000
US19600000 11.04.2000
US19812100 18.04.2000
US19965400 25.04.2000
US19858500 18.04.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US19265500 28.03.2000
US19464700 04.04.2000
US19682000 11.04.2000
US19082800 21.03.2000
US19303200 29.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US19305300 29.03.2000
US20151600 03.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US19104800 21.03.2000
CA2401448 28.02.2001
US19100700 21.03.2000
US19955000 25.04.2000
US18696800 06.03.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US19131400 21.03.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US19618700 11.04.2000
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19669000 11.04.2000
US18932800 14.03.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US19444900 04.04.2000
US19597500 11.04.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2533831 20.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US18932000 14.03.2000
US19600000 11.04.2000
US19812100 18.04.2000
US19965400 25.04.2000
US19858500 18.04.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US19265500 28.03.2000
US19464700 04.04.2000
US19682000 11.04.2000
US19082800 21.03.2000
US19303200 29.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US19305300 29.03.2000
US20151600 03.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US19104800 21.03.2000
CA2401448 28.02.2001
US19100700 21.03.2000
US19955000 25.04.2000
US18696800 06.03.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US19131400 21.03.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US19618700 11.04.2000
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19669000 11.04.2000
US18932800 14.03.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US19444900 04.04.2000
US19597500 11.04.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2533903 20.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US18932000 14.03.2000
US19600000 11.04.2000
US19812100 18.04.2000
US19965400 25.04.2000
US19858500 18.04.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US19265500 28.03.2000
US19464700 04.04.2000
US19682000 11.04.2000
US19082800 21.03.2000
US19303200 29.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US19305300 29.03.2000
US20151600 03.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US19104800 21.03.2000
CA2401448 28.02.2001
US19100700 21.03.2000
US19955000 25.04.2000
US18696800 06.03.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US19131400 21.03.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US19618700 11.04.2000
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19669000 11.04.2000
US18932800 14.03.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US19444900 04.04.2000
US19597500 11.04.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2533991 20.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US18932000 14.03.2000
US19600000 11.04.2000
US19812100 18.04.2000
US19965400 25.04.2000
US19858500 18.04.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US19265500 28.03.2000
US19464700 04.04.2000
US19682000 11.04.2000
US19082800 21.03.2000
US19303200 29.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US19305300 29.03.2000
US20151600 03.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US19104800 21.03.2000
CA2401448 28.02.2001
US19100700 21.03.2000
US19955000 25.04.2000
US18696800 06.03.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US19131400 21.03.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US19618700 11.04.2000
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19669000 11.04.2000
US18932800 14.03.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US19444900 04.04.2000
US19597500 11.04.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2534018 20.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US18932000 14.03.2000
US19600000 11.04.2000
US19812100 18.04.2000
US19965400 25.04.2000
US19858500 18.04.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US19265500 28.03.2000
US19464700 04.04.2000
US19682000 11.04.2000
US19082800 21.03.2000
US19303200 29.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US19305300 29.03.2000
US20151600 03.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US19104800 21.03.2000
CA2401448 28.02.2001
US19100700 21.03.2000
US19955000 25.04.2000
US18696800 06.03.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US19131400 21.03.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US19618700 11.04.2000
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19669000 11.04.2000
US18932800 14.03.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US19444900 04.04.2000
US19597500 11.04.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2534030 20.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US18932000 14.03.2000
US19600000 11.04.2000
US19812100 18.04.2000
US19965400 25.04.2000
US19858500 18.04.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US19265500 28.03.2000
US19464700 04.04.2000
US19682000 11.04.2000
US19082800 21.03.2000
US19303200 29.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US19305300 29.03.2000
US20151600 03.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US19104800 21.03.2000
CA2401448 28.02.2001
US19100700 21.03.2000
US19955000 25.04.2000
US18696800 06.03.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US19131400 21.03.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US19618700 11.04.2000
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19669000 11.04.2000
US18932800 14.03.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US19444900 04.04.2000
US19597500 11.04.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2534186 20.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US18932000 14.03.2000
US19600000 11.04.2000
US19812100 18.04.2000
US19965400 25.04.2000
US19858500 18.04.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US19265500 28.03.2000
US19464700 04.04.2000
US19682000 11.04.2000
US19082800 21.03.2000
US19303200 29.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US19305300 29.03.2000
US20151600 03.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US19104800 21.03.2000
CA2401448 28.02.2001
US19100700 21.03.2000
US19955000 25.04.2000
US18696800 06.03.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US19131400 21.03.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US19618700 11.04.2000
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19669000 11.04.2000
US18932800 14.03.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US19444900 04.04.2000
US19597500 11.04.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2534391 20.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US18932000 14.03.2000
US19600000 11.04.2000
US19812100 18.04.2000
US19965400 25.04.2000
US19858500 18.04.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US19265500 28.03.2000
US19464700 04.04.2000
US19682000 11.04.2000
US19082800 21.03.2000
US19303200 29.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US19305300 29.03.2000
US20151600 03.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US19104800 21.03.2000
CA2401448 28.02.2001
US19100700 21.03.2000
US19955000 25.04.2000
US18696800 06.03.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US19131400 21.03.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US19618700 11.04.2000
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19669000 11.04.2000
US18932800 14.03.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US19444900 04.04.2000
US19597500 11.04.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2539214 20.09.2001A1
Priority number Date
US18932000 14.03.2000
US19600000 11.04.2000
US19812100 18.04.2000
US19965400 25.04.2000
US19858500 18.04.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
US19265500 28.03.2000
US19464700 04.04.2000
US19682000 11.04.2000
US19082800 21.03.2000
US19303200 29.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US19305300 29.03.2000
US20151600 03.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US19104800 21.03.2000
CA2401448 28.02.2001
US19100700 21.03.2000
US19955000 25.04.2000
US18696800 06.03.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US19131400 21.03.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US19618700 11.04.2000
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19669000 11.04.2000
US18932800 14.03.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US19444900 04.04.2000
US19597500 11.04.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2546428 09.06.2005A1
Priority number Date
WO2004US38689 17.11.2004
US52385603 20.11.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2551813 12.08.2014C
CA2551813 14.07.2005A1
Priority number Date
WO2004US43514 21.12.2004
US98982604 16.11.2004
US53242603 24.12.2003
WO2004US38262 16.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2567520 15.12.2005A1
Priority number Date
WO2005US18829 31.05.2005
US61609804 05.10.2004
US57651704 01.06.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2570643 09.02.2006A1
Priority number Date
US88604004 08.07.2004
WO2005US24019 07.07.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2579102 16.03.2006A1
Priority number Date
WO2005US31798 07.09.2005
US93662604 08.09.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2584028 27.04.2006A1
Priority number Date
WO2004US34878 13.10.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2584293 20.04.2006A1
Priority number Date
US96426304 12.10.2004
US15991905 22.06.2005
WO2005US37114 12.10.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2585822 13.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US0060000 15.09.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
CA2410162 01.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2591583 13.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US23288700 15.09.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
CA2410162 01.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2591590 13.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
CA2410162 01.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2591630 13.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
CA2410162 01.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2591656 13.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
CA2410162 01.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2591814 13.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US23288700 15.09.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
CA2410162 01.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2591841 13.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US23288700 15.09.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
CA2410162 01.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2591929 13.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US23288700 15.09.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
CA2410162 01.06.2001
US0166666 01.03.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2591930 13.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US23288700 15.09.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US8542001 10.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
CA2410162 01.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2594659 13.12.2001A1
Priority number Date
US21290100 20.06.2000
US0117092 25.05.2001
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US0015264 02.06.2000
CA2410162 01.06.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US22063800 25.07.2000
US22242500 01.08.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US22713300 22.08.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US22066600 25.07.2000
US22089300 26.07.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US22060700 25.07.2000
US22058500 25.07.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US22060500 25.07.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2604377 19.10.2006A1
Priority number Date
US10250105 08.04.2005
WO2006US13501 05.04.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2632702 28.03.2002A1
Priority number Date
US26187801 12.01.2001
US22989600 01.09.2000
CA2421056 29.08.2001
US0121735 09.07.2001
US28212901 04.04.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US26193901 16.01.2001
US26215001 16.01.2001
US23062100 05.09.2000
US28098201 03.04.2001
US23514700 22.09.2000
US0119692 20.06.2001
US27439901 09.03.2001
US26762301 09.02.2001
US26439501 25.01.2001
US0121066 29.06.2001
US28219901 04.04.2001
US26191001 16.01.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US0106520 28.02.2001
US26642101 02.02.2001
US0117800 01.06.2001
US29058901 09.05.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2633171 20.11.2012C
CA2633171 03.01.2003A1
Priority number Date
US30188001 29.06.2001
CA2451239 19.06.2002
US36686902 20.03.2002
US30481301 11.07.2001
US33922701 19.10.2001
US29950001 20.06.2001
US31231201 13.08.2001
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
US37888502 08.05.2002
US30088001 25.06.2001
US31428001 22.08.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2633413 21.08.2012C
CA2633413 03.01.2003A1
Priority number Date
US30188001 29.06.2001
CA2451239 19.06.2002
US36686902 20.03.2002
US30481301 11.07.2001
US33922701 19.10.2001
US29950001 20.06.2001
US31231201 13.08.2001
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
US37888502 08.05.2002
US30088001 25.06.2001
US31428001 22.08.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2633595 03.01.2003A1
Priority number Date
US30188001 29.06.2001
CA2451239 19.06.2002
US36686902 20.03.2002
US30481301 11.07.2001
US33922701 19.10.2001
US29950001 20.06.2001
US31231201 13.08.2001
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
US37888502 08.05.2002
US30088001 25.06.2001
US31428001 22.08.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2645727 08.03.2001A1
Priority number Date
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US19100700 21.03.2000
US16949599 07.12.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0014042 22.05.2000
CA2380355 24.08.2000
US18720200 03.03.2000
US9920111 01.09.1999
US19939700 25.04.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US17548100 11.01.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0008439 30.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2648046 03.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US64365700 17.08.2000
US80270601 09.03.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US76760901 22.01.2001
US66535000 18.09.2000
US86602801 25.05.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US82836601 05.04.2001
US87057401 30.05.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US24292200 24.10.2000
US79649801 28.02.2001
CA2648046 20.06.2001
US70923800 08.11.2000
US66461000 18.09.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0117443 30.05.2001
US22269500 02.08.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US80868901 14.03.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
CA2412211 20.06.2001
US0020710 28.07.2000
US86603401 25.05.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US21363700 23.06.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2648048 03.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US64365700 17.08.2000
US80270601 09.03.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US76760901 22.01.2001
US66535000 18.09.2000
US86602801 25.05.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US82836601 05.04.2001
US87057401 30.05.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US24292200 24.10.2000
US79649801 28.02.2001
US70923800 08.11.2000
US66461000 18.09.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0117443 30.05.2001
US22269500 02.08.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US80868901 14.03.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
CA2412211 20.06.2001
US0020710 28.07.2000
US86603401 25.05.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US21363700 23.06.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2648051 03.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US64365700 17.08.2000
US80270601 09.03.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US76760901 22.01.2001
US66535000 18.09.2000
US86602801 25.05.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US82836601 05.04.2001
US87057401 30.05.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US24292200 24.10.2000
US79649801 28.02.2001
US70923800 08.11.2000
US66461000 18.09.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0117443 30.05.2001
US22269500 02.08.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US80868901 14.03.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
CA2412211 20.06.2001
US0020710 28.07.2000
US86603401 25.05.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US21363700 23.06.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2666549 05.06.2008A1
Priority number Date
WO2007US85269 20.11.2007
US60619206 29.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2708349 27.03.2003A1
Priority number Date
US33190601 20.11.2001
US36972402 03.04.2002
US40480902 19.08.2002
US33922701 19.10.2001
US34544402 02.01.2002
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
CA2460120 11.09.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2708411 27.03.2003A1
Priority number Date
US33190601 20.11.2001
US36972402 03.04.2002
US40480902 19.08.2002
US33922701 19.10.2001
US34544402 02.01.2002
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
CA2460120 11.09.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2709291 07.06.2001A1
Priority number Date
US9931243 30.12.1999
US0005004 24.02.2000
US0000277 06.01.2000
US0000376 06.01.2000
US17026299 09.12.1999
CA2491433 01.12.2000
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9928634 01.12.1999
US0015264 02.06.2000
US9930911 20.12.1999
US9930999 20.12.1999
US0004914 24.02.2000
US9928551 02.12.1999
US0006319 10.03.2000
US0013705 17.05.2000
US0005601 01.03.2000
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930095 16.12.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US0005841 02.03.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
US0006884 15.03.2000
US0007532 21.03.2000
US9931274 30.12.1999
US0004341 18.02.2000
US0004342 18.02.2000
US0007377 20.03.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US0023328 24.08.2000
US0014042 22.05.2000
US0020710 28.07.2000
US0030873 10.11.2000
US9928564 02.12.1999
US9928301 01.12.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US18720200 03.03.2000
US0014941 30.05.2000
US20983200 05.06.2000
US0022031 11.08.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2709771 03.01.2002A1
Priority number Date
US64365700 17.08.2000
US80270601 09.03.2001
US0117092 25.05.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US76760901 22.01.2001
US66535000 18.09.2000
US86602801 25.05.2001
US0106520 28.02.2001
US0106666 01.03.2001
US82836601 05.04.2001
US87057401 30.05.2001
US74725900 20.12.2000
US24292200 24.10.2000
US79649801 28.02.2001
US70923800 08.11.2000
US66461000 18.09.2000
US85420801 10.05.2001
US0117443 30.05.2001
US22269500 02.08.2000
US0023522 23.08.2000
US85428001 10.05.2001
US80868901 14.03.2001
US0023328 24.08.2000
CA2412211 20.06.2001
US0020710 28.07.2000
US86603401 25.05.2001
US0030873 10.11.2000
US21955600 20.07.2000
US22066400 25.07.2000
US0117800 01.06.2001
US21363700 23.06.2000
US0034956 20.12.2000
US81674401 22.03.2001
US22062400 25.07.2000
US0030952 08.11.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2712518 13.08.2009A1
Priority number Date
WO2009US30851 13.01.2009
US2381108 31.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2868140 15.04.2004A1
Priority number Date
US63300803 31.07.2003
US26554202 03.10.2002
CA2498631 01.10.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CL2007003439 18.07.2008A1
Priority number Date
US60619206 29.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CL2009000082 02.03.2012A1
Priority number Date
US2381108 31.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1210696C 13.07.2005C
CN1439158 27.08.2003A
Priority number Date
US23600900 27.09.2000
US21308700 22.06.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1387570 25.12.2002A
Priority number Date
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930999 20.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1425066B 26.05.2010B
CN1425066 18.06.2003A
Priority number Date
US22891400 29.08.2000
US0100847 11.01.2001
US19708900 14.04.2000
US17584900 13.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1449445B 18.07.2012B
CN1449445 15.10.2003A
Priority number Date
US0120116 22.06.2001
US23097800 07.09.2000
US21363700 23.06.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1560249 05.01.2005A
Priority number Date
US9920594 08.09.1999
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930999 20.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1720336 11.01.2006A
Priority number Date
US26554202 03.10.2002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1993146 04.07.2007A
Priority number Date
US57651704 01.06.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101107005B 10.07.2013B
CN101107005 16.01.2008A
Priority number Date
US96426304 12.10.2004
US15991905 22.06.2005
WO2005US37114 12.10.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101208431 25.06.2008A
Priority number Date
US10250105 08.04.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101263159 10.09.2008A
Priority number Date
US93662604 08.09.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101269214B 04.09.2013B
CN101269214 24.09.2008A
Priority number Date
US23097800 07.09.2000
US21363700 23.06.2000
US0032678 01.12.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101563098 21.10.2009A
Priority number Date
US60619206 29.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101643733 10.02.2010A
Priority number Date
US17584900 13.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102014964 13.04.2011A
Priority number Date
WO2009US30851 13.01.2009
US2381108 31.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102973947 20.03.2013A
Priority number Date
US61609804 05.10.2004
US57651704 01.06.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103349777B 09.03.2016B
CN103349777 16.10.2013A
Priority number Date
CN200580042653 12.10.2005
US96426304 12.10.2004
US15991905 22.06.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104784688 22.07.2015A
Priority number Date
US60619206 29.11.2006
CN200780040465 20.11.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109045307 21.12.2018A
Priority number Date
US61609804 05.10.2004
US57651704 01.06.2004
CN200580026066 31.05.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CO6160304 20.05.2010A2
Priority number Date
US93662604 08.09.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CO6180451 19.07.2010A2
Priority number Date
US60619206 29.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CR9486 20.02.2008A
Priority number Date
US10250105 08.04.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CR10824 12.08.2009A
Priority number Date
US60619206 29.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1106885T 26.09.2012T1
Priority number Date
US8557998 15.05.1998
US11362198 23.12.1998
EP99923088 14.05.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1108212T 12.02.2014T1
Priority number Date
US7893698 20.03.1998
EP04010432 20.11.1998
US6636497 21.11.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1108500T 09.04.2014T1
Priority number Date
US4022098 17.03.1998
EP99912362 10.03.1999
US18421698 02.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1109518T 13.08.2014T1
Priority number Date
US0006884 15.03.2000
US25366500 28.11.2000
EP00990950 19.12.2000
US0003565 11.02.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1112055T 04.11.2015T1
Priority number Date
US30188001 29.06.2001
US36686902 20.03.2002
US30481301 11.07.2001
US33922701 19.10.2001
US29950001 20.06.2001
US31231201 13.08.2001
US33682701 07.11.2001
US32326801 18.09.2001
US37888502 08.05.2002
US30088001 25.06.2001
EP08012996 19.06.2002
US31428001 22.08.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1112334T 09.12.2015T1
Priority number Date
EP07016900 20.12.2000
US64484800 22.08.2000
US19100700 21.03.2000
US17548100 11.01.2000
US21380700 22.06.2000
US25364600 28.11.2000
US24283700 24.10.2000
US17209699 23.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1113126T 13.04.2016T1
Priority number Date
EP08012659 10.03.1999
US4022098 17.03.1998
US18421698 02.11.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1114370T 31.08.2016T1
Priority number Date
EP04754234 02.06.2004
US48559903 08.07.2003
US48645703 11.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1115252T 04.01.2017T1
Priority number Date
US52084203 17.11.2003
US53242603 24.12.2003
EP10010044 16.11.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1115505T 04.01.2017T1
Priority number Date
US52084203 17.11.2003
EP09004091 16.11.2004
US53242603 24.12.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60020213T 02.02.2006T2
DE60020213D 23.06.2005D1
Priority number Date
US0001441 19.01.2000
US23473099 21.01.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60028054T 21.12.2006T2
DE60028054D 22.06.2006D1
Priority number Date
US9920594 08.09.1999
US0006471 09.03.2000
US9921090 15.09.1999
US0004414 22.02.2000
US9930999 20.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60028564T 06.06.2007T2
DE60028564D 20.07.2006D1
Priority number Date
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
US0005601 01.03.2000
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60028830T 18.01.2007T2
DE60028830D 27.07.2006D1
Priority number Date
US0032378 28.11.2000
US18293800 16.02.2000
US22698600 22.08.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60032395T 27.09.2007T2
DE60032395D 25.01.2007D1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60034036T 06.12.2007T2
DE60034036D 03.05.2007D1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US9920594 08.09.1999
US0014941 30.05.2000
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US0013705 17.05.2000
US16250699 29.10.1999
US9928634 01.12.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60035076T 31.01.2008T2
DE60035076D 12.07.2007D1
Priority number Date
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US14697099 03.08.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60035077T 04.09.2008T2
DE60035077D 12.07.2007D1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60035231T 21.02.2008T2
DE60035231D 26.07.2007D1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60035693T 15.05.2008T2
DE60035693D 06.09.2007D1
Priority number Date
US0006884 15.03.2000
US14475899 20.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60036969T 14.08.2008T2
DE60036969D 13.12.2007D1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60037349T 23.10.2008T2
DE60037349D 17.01.2008D1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US14065399 22.06.1999
US14065099 22.06.1999
US12397299 11.03.1999
US14622299 28.07.1999
US0000219 05.01.2000
US9905028 08.03.1999
US13345999 11.05.1999
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60038740T 02.07.2009T2
DE60038740D 12.06.2008D1
Priority number Date
US9912252 02.06.1999
US9928565 02.12.1999
US9928313 30.11.1999
US9920111 01.09.1999
US0013705 17.05.2000
US14622299 28.07.1999
US9928409 30.11.1999
US0008439 30.03.2000
US14475899 20.07.1999
US14103799 23.06.1999
US14569899 26.07.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60038986D 03.07.2008D1
Priority number Date
US12577899 23.03.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60040354D 06.11.2008D1
Priority number Date
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60041090D 22.01.2009D1
Priority number Date
US12770699 05.04.1999
US13035999 21.04.1999
US13129199 27.04.1999
US17026299 09.12.1999
US12582699 24.03.1999
US12577899 23.03.1999
US12703599 31.03.1999
US12577499 23.03.1999
US13127099 27.04.1999
US13127299 27.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE60041266D 12.02.2009D1
Priority number Date