Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1641822

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 MC 
 NL 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 TR 
Examination procedure03.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase26.01.2006National basic fee paid 
26.01.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2006Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
24.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
European patent granted15.05.2013
Opposition procedure24.11.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked 
Appeal following opposition31.01.2017APPEAL FILED
04.04.2017APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.04.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20060126
 
Event date:05.04.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:05.04.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL HR LT LV MK
 
Event date:18.10.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:12.12.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 38/20 20060101ALI20121106BHEP
 
Event date:12.12.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C12N 15/24 20060101ALI20121106BHEP
 
Event date:12.12.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07K 16/24 20060101ALI20121106BHEP
 
Event date:12.12.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 39/395 20060101ALI20121106BHEP
 
Event date:12.12.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 33/53 20060101ALI20121106BHEP
 
Event date:12.12.2012 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07K 14/54 20060101AFI20121106BHEP
 
Event date:15.05.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:15.05.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.05.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.06.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 612124 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20130615
 
Event date:19.06.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:28.06.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG, CH
 
Event date:11.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602004042119 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20130711
 
Event date:22.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:13.08.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:27.08.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20130813
 
Event date:03.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:11.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:01.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2424353 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20131001
 
Event date:01.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20130401418 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20130829
 
Event date:15.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E008285 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20130808
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT
 
Event date:04.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 14606 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:JANSSEN BIOTECH, INC.
Effective DATE:20140217
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:NOVARTIS AG
Effective DATE:20140214
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:ABLYNX N.V.
Effective DATE:20140214
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:ADAMS, HARVEY VAUGHAN JOHN
Effective DATE:20140217
 
Event date:26.03.2014 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:MERCK PATENT GMBH
Effective DATE:20140214
 
Event date:30.04.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602004042119 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
Effective DATE:20140214
 
Event date:28.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E019316 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:10.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CP
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SECUKINUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980 20150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:15C0051
Filing DATE:20150710
 
Event date:14.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE APPLICATION FILED
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C20150036
 
Event date:24.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R065
Code Expl.:+REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE VALIDLY FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SECUKINUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980 20150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:122015000056
Filing DATE:20150714
Expiry DATE:20240603
 
Event date:04.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SELUKINUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980 20150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:1590038-4
 
Event date:12.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB CTFF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SECUKINUMAB; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/14/980 20150119
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SPC/GB15/043
Filing DATE:20150710
 
Event date:12.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE SPCF
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SECUKINUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980 20150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2015/040
Filing DATE:20150713
 
Event date:17.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE AA1Y E008285 EE
Code Expl.:+SPC FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SEKUKINUMAB;REG NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980 19.01.2015
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C20150031
Filing DATE:20150713
 
Event date:28.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CP
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SECUKINUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980 20150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:15C0051
Filing DATE:20150710
 
Event date:28.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AA1S E019316
Code Expl.:+INFORMATION ON APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SECUKINUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980 20150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:S1500041
Filing DATE:20150715
 
Event date:28.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SECUKINUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 63295 20.02.2015
Filing DATE:20150814
 
Event date:03.09.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK SPCF
Code Expl.:+FILING OF AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SEKUKINUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980/001 - EU/1/14/980/007 20150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:50015-2015
Filing DATE:20150713
 
Event date:07.09.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK CTFF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SECUKINUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980/001-007 20150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:CA 2015 00040
Filing DATE:20150713
Expiry DATE:20240602
Extension DATE:20290602
 
Event date:14.09.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LU CCP
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SECUKINUMAB; FIRST REGISTRATION DATE: 200150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:92773
Extension DATE:20290602
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCP
Code Expl.: CERTIFICATES - MODIFICATION OF FIRM
OWNER NAME:NOVARTIS AG, CH
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: GENENTECH, INC., US
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C01641822/02
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCP
Code Expl.: CERTIFICATES - MODIFICATION OF FIRM
OWNER NAME:F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG, CH
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: NOVARTIS AG, CH
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C01641822/01
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCP
Code Expl.: CERTIFICATES - MODIFICATION OF FIRM
OWNER NAME:NOVARTIS AG, CH
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: GENENTECH, INC., US
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C01641822/01
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: MACALLANIN; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 67444 26.09.2015
Filing DATE:20151025
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCP
Code Expl.: CERTIFICATES - MODIFICATION OF FIRM
OWNER NAME:F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG, CH
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: NOVARTIS AG, CH
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C01641822/02
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:27.07.2016 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:NOVARTIS AG
Effective DATE:20140214
 
Event date:21.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CP
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: IXEKIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1085 20160428
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:16C1008
Filing DATE:20161021
 
Event date:25.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE APPLICATION FILED
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C20160039
 
Event date:28.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: IXEKLZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1085 20160428
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:300841
Filing DATE:20161024
Expiry DATE:20240601
Extension DATE:20290601
 
Event date:15.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TALTZ - IXEKIZUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1085 20160428
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:1690049-0
 
Event date:15.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE AA1Y E008285 EE
Code Expl.:+SPC FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: IKSEKIZUMAB;REG NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1085 28.04.2016
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C20160031
Filing DATE:20161024
 
Event date:16.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE SPCF
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: IXEKIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1085 20160425
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2016/042
Filing DATE:20161024
 
Event date:18.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R065 602004042119 DE
Code Expl.:+REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE VALIDLY FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: LXEKIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1085 20160425
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:122016000078
Filing DATE:20161024
Expiry DATE:20240603
 
Event date:23.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB CTFF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: IXEKIZUMAB; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/15/1085 20160428
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SPC/GB16/056
Filing DATE:20161025
 
Event date:01.12.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK SPCF
Code Expl.:+FILING OF AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: IXEKIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1085/001 - EU/1/15/1085/006 20160428
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:50010-2016
Filing DATE:20161024
 
Event date:15.12.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT SPCF 612124 AT T
Code Expl.:+FILING AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: IXEKIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1085 (MITTEILUNG) 20160428
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:45/2016
Filing DATE:20161025
Effective DATE:20161215
 
Event date:28.12.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AA1S E019316
Code Expl.:+INFORMATION ON APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: IXEKIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1085 20160428
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:S1600046
Filing DATE:20161024
 
Event date:16.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG1Y E008285 EE
Code Expl.:+SPC GRANTED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: IKSEKIZUMAB;REG NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1085 28.04.2016
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C20160031 00196
Filing DATE:20161024
Extension DATE:20290602
 
Event date:16.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK CTFF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: IXEKIZUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1085/001-006 20160428
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:CA 2016 00047
Filing DATE:20161024
Expiry DATE:20240602
Extension DATE:20290602
 
Event date:15.05.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: IXEKIZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 65906 12.12.2016
Filing DATE:20170413
 
Event date:18.05.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:16.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S72Z
Code Expl.: CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)
Free Format Text:CLAIM LODGED; CLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED AT THE PATENTS COURT ON 03 JULY 2017 (HP-2017-000041)
 
Event date:16.08.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S72Z
Code Expl.: CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)
Free Format Text:NR=SPC/GB16/056, CODE=S72Z" CLAIM LODGED; CLAIM FOR REVOCATION FOR SPC/GB16/056 LODGED AT THE PATENTS COURT ON 12 JULY 2017 (HP-2017-000044)
Effective DATE:20170712
 
Event date:23.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CX
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION REJECTED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SECUKINUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980 20150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:15C0051
Filing DATE:20150710
 
Event date:24.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CX
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION REJECTED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SECUKINUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980 20150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:15C0051
Filing DATE:20150710
 
Event date:16.05.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:05.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCG
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SEKUKINUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980 20150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:1590038-4
Expiry DATE:20240603
Extension DATE:20290602
 
Event date:12.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR SPCP
Code Expl.: APPEAL FORMED BEFORE THE COURT OF APPEAL FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: SECUKINUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/14/980 20150115
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:15C0051
Filing DATE:20150710
 
Event date:17.08.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR RU
Code Expl.: APPEAL FORMED BEFORE THE COURT OF APPEALS
Effective DATE:20180712
 
Event date:12.12.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S75Z
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF PATENT IN INFRINGEMENT OR REVOCATION PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 75/PATENTS ACT 1977)
Free Format Text:APPLICATION OPEN FOR OPPOSITION; PATENT COURT ACTION NUMBER: HP-2017-000041 TITLE OF PATENT: IL-17 A/F HETEROLOGOUS POLYPEPTIDES AND THERAPEUTIC USES THEREOF INTERNATIONAL CLASSIFICATION: C07K NAME OF PROPRIETOR: GENENTECH, INC. PROPRIETOR'S ADDRESS FOR SERVICE: MARKS & CLERK SOLICITORS LLP 90 LONG ACRE LONDON WC2E 9RA THESE AMENDMENTS MAY BE VIEWED ON OUR WEBSITE AND HAVE BEEN OFFERED ON BOTH A CONDITIONAL AND UNCONDITIONAL BASIS AS INDEXED IN THE DOCUMENT.
 
Event date:28.12.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU FG4S E019316
Code Expl.:+GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:S1500041
Filing DATE:20150715
 
Event date:14.02.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES SPCD
Code Expl.:-SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE REJECTED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: IXEKIZUMAB; NATIONAL AUTHORISATION NUMBER: EU/1/15/1085; DATE OF AUTHORISATION: 20160425; NUMBER OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EUROPEAN ECONOMIC AREA (EEA): EU/1/15/1085; DATE OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EEA: 20160425
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C201630059
Effective DATE:20190208
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20190327
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20190327
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:28.06.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20190528
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20190528
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190515
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20190524
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20190522
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20190626
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20190606
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20190527
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20190528
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20190524
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20190529
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20190610
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20190521
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20190523
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20190524
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20190522
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20190522
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20190522
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.08.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20190516
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.09.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20190517
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:30.09.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20190425
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20190524
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20190524
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20190521
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:31.10.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20190701
Year of Fee Payment:16