Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1641822

EP1641822 - IL-17 A/F HETEROLOGOUS POLYPEPTIDES AND THERAPEUTIC USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2019New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/20]For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US
Former [2006/14]For all designated states
GENENTECH, INC.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARNOTT, David
366 E. 40th Avenue
San Mateo, California 94403 / US
02 / GURNEY, Austin
1 Debbie Lane
Belmont, California 94002 / US
03 / HASS, Philip
558 Sierra Street
Moss Beach, California 94038 / US
04 / LEE, James
705 Shelter Creek Lane
San Bruno, California 94066 / US
05 / WU, Yan
101 Challenge Court
Foster City, California 94404 / US
 [2006/14]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/20]Denison, Christopher Marcus
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2006/14]Denison, Christopher Marcus
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date04754234.502.06.2004
[2006/14]
WO2004US17581
Priority number, dateUS20030485599P08.07.2003         Original published format: US 485599 P
US20030486457P11.07.2003         Original published format: US 486457 P
[2006/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005010044
Date:03.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1641822
Date:05.04.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005
[2006/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1641822
Date:15.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/54, C12N15/24, C07K16/24, A61K38/20, A61K39/395, G01N33/53
[2012/50]
Former International [2006/14]C07K14/54, C12N15/24, C07K16/24, C12N15/13, A61K38/20, A61K38/17, A61K39/395, G01N33/563, G01N33/53, C12P21/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/14]
TitleGerman:HETEROLOGE IL-17-A/F-POLYPEPTIDE UND THERAPEUTISCHE ANWENDUNGEN DAVON[2006/14]
English:IL-17 A/F HETEROLOGOUS POLYPEPTIDES AND THERAPEUTIC USES THEREOF[2006/14]
French:POLYPEPTIDES HETEROLOGUES IL-17 A/F ET UTILISATION DES POLYPEPTIDES A DES FINS THERAPEUTIQUES[2006/14]
Entry into regional phase26.01.2006National basic fee paid 
26.01.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/14]
18.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
13.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2012
04.12.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
07.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2013Fee for grant paid
03.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10010285.4  / EP2277908
EP14163686.0  / EP2784084
EP19175735.0
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.05.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.02.2014  20.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Ablynx N.V.
Technologiepark 21
9052 Ghent-Zwijnaarde / BE
Opponent's representative
Kraft, Henricus Johannes, et al
Ablynx nv
Technologiepark 21
9052 Zwijnaarde / BE
 02  14.02.2014  06.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  14.02.2014  07.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 04  17.02.2014  20.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Janssen Biotech, Inc.
800/850 Ridgeview Drive
Horsham
PA 19044 / US
Opponent's representative
Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 05  17.02.2014  20.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Mathys & Squire LLP, et al
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 06  04.04.2018  04.04.2018  INTERVENTION
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
Opponent's representative
Ingham, Stephen Howard
Eli Lilly and Company Ltd
European Patent Operations
Lilly Research Centre
Erl Wood Manor, Sunninghill Road
Windlesham, Surrey, GU20 6PH / GB
 [2018/19]
Former [2016/30]
Opponent(s)01  14.02.2014  20.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Ablynx N.V.
Technologiepark 21
9052 Ghent-Zwijnaarde / BE
Opponent's representative
Kraft, Henricus Johannes, et al
Ablynx nv
Technologiepark 21
9052 Zwijnaarde / BE
 02  14.02.2014  06.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  14.02.2014  07.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 04  17.02.2014  20.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Janssen Biotech, Inc.
800/850 Ridgeview Drive
Horsham
PA 19044 / US
Opponent's representative
Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 05  17.02.2014  20.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Mathys & Squire LLP, et al
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
Former [2014/13]
Opponent(s)01  14.02.2014  20.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Ablynx N.V.
Technologiepark 21
9052 Ghent-Zwijnaarde / BE
Opponent's representative
Kraft, Henricus Johannes, et al
Ablynx nv
Technologiepark 21
9052 Zwijnaarde / BE
 02  14.02.2014   
Merck Patent GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Alt, Michael
Bird & Bird LLP
Maximiliansplatz 22
80333 München / DE
 03  14.02.2014   
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Opponent's representative
Didelon, Frédéric
Novartis Pharma AG
Patent Department
4002 Basel / CH
 04  17.02.2014  20.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Janssen Biotech, Inc.
800/850 Ridgeview Drive
Horsham
PA 19044 / US
Opponent's representative
Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 05  17.02.2014  20.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Opponent's representative
Mathys & Squire LLP, et al
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
18.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
24.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.11.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition31.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0304/17
04.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
25.05.2010Request for further processing filed
25.05.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.06.2010Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
24.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO0146420  (GENENTECH INC [US]) [X] 35-39 * page 6; example 15; claims 24,26 * [Y] 40-49,71-75;
 [XY]  - AGGARWAL S ET AL, "Interleukin-23 promotes a distinct CD4 T cell activation state characterized by the production of interleukin-17", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20030117), vol. 278, no. 3, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 1910 - 1914, XP002294203 [X] 59 * abstract * [Y] 1-34,50-58,60-70

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M207577200
 [Y]  - HYMOWITZ SARAH G ET AL, "IL-17s adopt a cystine knot fold: Structure and activity of a novel cytokine, IL-17F, and implications for receptor binding", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL, (20011001), vol. 20, no. 19, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 5332 - 5341, XP002321610 [Y] 1-34,50-58,60-70 * Abstract; Figures 1 and 5; Discussion *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/20.19.5332
 [YD]  - GERSTNER R B ET AL, "Sequence plasticity in the antigen-binding site of a therapeutic anti-HER 2 antibody", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (2002), vol. 321, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 851 - 862, XP002972421 [YD] 40-49,71-75 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2836(02)00677-0
 [A]  - AGGARWAL S ET AL, "IL-17: PROTOTYPE MEMBER OF AN EMERGING CYTOKINE FAMILY", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN SOCIETIES FOR EXPERIMENTAL, US, (200201), vol. 71, no. 1, ISSN 0741-5400, pages 1 - 8, XP008005877 [A] * the whole document *
 [A]  - MOSELEY T A ET AL, "Interleukin-17 family and IL-17 receptors.", CYTOKINE AND GROWTH FACTOR REVIEWS, (200304), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 1359-6101, pages 155 - 174, XP002321611 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6101(03)00002-9
ExaminationWO2010025400
 WO2008067223
 WO2006088833
    - ANONYMOUS, "Method for Making Hormone Heterodimer", URL: http://www.umdnj.edu/resrhweb/patents/for_licensing/fertility/97-01Moyleheterodimers.pdf
    - CHANG SEON HEE ET AL, "A novel heterodimeric cytokine consisting of IL-17 and IL-17F regulates inflammatory responses.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200705), Database accession no. LM17452998
    - WRIGHT JILL F ET AL, "Identification of an interleukin 17F/17A heterodimer in activated human CD4+ T cells", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC., BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20070504), vol. 282, no. 18, doi:DOI:10.1074/JBC.M700499200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 13447 - 13455, XP002463526

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M700499200
    - ANONYMOUS, "Minireviews Activin/Inhibin", URL: http://www.rndsystems.com/mini_review_detail_objectname_MR98_Activin.aspx
by applicant   - CHAMBERS, C. A.; ALLISON, J.P., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 9, page 396
    - SCHWARTZ, R. H., CELL, (1992), vol. 71, page 1065
    - LINSLEY, P. S.; LEDBETTER, J. A., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 11, page 191
    - JUNE, C. H. ET AL., IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1994), vol. 12, page 321
    - JENKINS, M. K., IMMUNITY, (1994), vol. 1, page 405
    - ALDERSON, M. E. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, page 2219
    - HELLSTROM, I.; HELLSTROM, K. E., CRIT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 18, page 1
    - WALUNAS, T. L. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1994), vol. 1, page 405
OppositionUS2007160576