Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1631949

EP1631949 - ELECTRONIC TEST ANSWER RECORD IMAGE QUALITY IMPROVEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.10.2009
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.11.2009  [2009/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harcourt Assessment, Inc.
19500 Bulverde Road
San Antonio, TX 78259 / US
[2006/10]
Inventor(s)01 / MOULTHROP, Scott E.
7607 Gander Park
Converse, TX 78109 / US
02 / REZNICK, Tom
9719 Kashmir Drive
San Antonio, Texas 78251 / US
03 / BARTH, Lois L.
10138 Sandbrook Hill
San Antonio, TX 78254 / US
04 / BOYD, David K.
2011 Shoreham
San Antonio, TX 78260 / US
 [2006/10]
Representative(s)Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/10]Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date04754519.904.06.2004
[2006/10]
WO2004US17925
Priority number, dateUS2003045987812.06.2003         Original published format: US 459878
[2006/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004111916
Date:23.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1631949
Date:08.03.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004
[2006/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.04.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:G09B25/00
[2006/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONIK-PRÜFANTWORT-AUFZEICHNUNGS-BILDQUALITÄTS-VERBESSERUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2006/10]
English:ELECTRONIC TEST ANSWER RECORD IMAGE QUALITY IMPROVEMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD[2006/10]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE ELECTRONIQUES D'AMELIORATION DE LA QUALITE DE L'IMAGE DES EPREUVES ENREGISTREES[2006/10]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2005National basic fee paid 
12.12.2005Search fee paid 
12.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/10]
17.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/46]
02.06.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200906   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US6173154  (KUCINSKI BERNARD [US], et al);
 [A]US6311040  (KUCINSKI BERNARD [US], et al);
 [AP]US2003224340  (HOUSMAN COY C [US], et al);
 [A]US5672060  (POOR DAVID D S [US]);
 [A]US6366760  (KUCINSKI BERNARD [US], et al)