Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1641518

EP1641518 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING OSTEOARTHRITIS, CARTILAGE DISEASE, DEFECTS AND INJURIES IN THE HUMAN KNEE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.06.2009
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania
3160 Chestnut Street, Suite 200
Philadelphia, PA 19104-6283 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/14]For all designated states
THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA
3160 Chestnut Street, Suite 200 Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19104-6283 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRIGHTON, Carl, T.
14 Flintshire Road
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
02 / POLLACK, Solomon, R.
115 Westminster Drive
North Wales, PA 19454 / US
 [2006/14]
Representative(s)Small, Gary James , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2006/14]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels and Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date04754774.009.06.2004
[2006/14]
WO2004US18274
Priority number, dateUS2003045716709.06.2003         Original published format: US 457167
[2006/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004110552
Date:23.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1641518
Date:05.04.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004
[2006/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.12.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/32
[2008/47]
Former International [2006/14]A61N1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/14]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OSTEOARTHRITIS, KNORPELERKRANKUNGEN, DEFEKTEN UND VERLETZUNGEN IM MENSCHLICHEN KNIE[2006/14]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TREATING OSTEOARTHRITIS, CARTILAGE DISEASE, DEFECTS AND INJURIES IN THE HUMAN KNEE[2006/14]
French:METHODES ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE L'OSTEOATRHROSE, DES PATHOLOGIES DES CARTILAGES, DES DEFAUTS ET DES LESIONS DU GENOU CHEZ L'HOMME[2006/14]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2006National basic fee paid 
09.01.2006Search fee paid 
09.01.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/14]
10.03.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
06.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination16.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1871/15
16.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.02.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200805   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0162336  (TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF [US]; BRIGHTON CARL T [US]; POLLACK SOLO) [X] 1-7 * page 5, line 8 - line 24 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 5 * * page 8, line 22 - line 24 * * page 11, line 19 - page 12, line 19 * * page 13, line 1 - line 30 * * page 18, line 3 - line 19; figure - *;
 [A]WO9527533  (AUSTRALASIAN MED TECH [NZ]; EDWARDS JEFFREY D [AU]; GILMOUR ROBERT F [) [A] 1-7 * page 15, line 19 - page 16, line 9 * * page 29, line 19 - page 31, line 7; figures 4,5,21,22 *
International search[A]WO0162336  ;
 [A]  - BRIGHTON C.T., "Fracture healing in the rabbit fibula when subjected to various capacitively coupled electrical fields", JOURNAL OF ORTHOPAEDIC RESEARCH, (1985), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 331 - 340, XP008038857

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jor.1100030310
by applicant   - BRIGHTON ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1997), vol. 237, pages 225 - 229