Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1680467

EP1680467 - TACKIFIED AMORPHOUS-POLY-ALPHA-OLEFIN-BONDED STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.07.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
28.05.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
[2014/33]
Former [2006/29]For all designated states
KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC.
401 North Lake Street
Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CAMPBELL, Stephen, Michael
7222 Clow Road
Winneconne, WI 54986 / US
02 / HESSE, Daniel, William
1056 Brookwood Drive
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
03 / SCHULZ, Richard, D.
721 Kensington Road
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
04 / JUNG, Mark, J.
1601 Hickory Hollow Lane
Menasha, WI 54952-1005 / US
05 / HANSEN, Richard, M.
5024 Island View Drive
Oshkosh, WI 54901 / US
06 / NECULESCU, Cristian, M.
713 Kensington Road
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
07 / ROGERS, Sandra, Marie
W2527 Pioneer Court
Appleton, WI 54914 / US
08 / GRUBE, Violet, May
N1473 Keimar Ct.
Greenville, WI 54942 / US
09 / THORESEN, Rhiannon, L.
W2424 Valleywood Lane
Appleton, WI 54915 / US
10 / KILLIAN, Thomas, Michael
293 Maplewood Lane
Sobieski, WI 54171 / US
11 / RICE, Jonathan, K.
219 Nicklaus Court
Evans, Georgia 30809 / US
12 / WALLAJAPET, Palani, Raj, Ramaswami
808 Kensington Road
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
13 / SHEA, Courtney, Eileen
804 Masons Creek Circle
Atlanta, GA 30350 / US
14 / FAIRBANKS, Jason Sybren
7875 Trailside Way
Gainsville, GA 30506 / US
15 / POTNIS, Prasad, Shrikrishna
120 Winford Close
Duluth, GA 30097 / US
16 / PALMER, Randall, J.
106 Ashton Farms Drive
Canton, GA 30115 / US
 [2007/22]
Former [2006/29]01 / CAMPBELL, Stephen, Michael
7222 Clow Road
Winneconne, WI 54986 / US
02 / HESSE, Daniel, William
1056 Brookwood Drive
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
03 / SCHULZ, Richard, D.
721 Kensington Road
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
04 / JUNG, Mark, J.
1601 Hickory Hollow Lane
Menasha, WI 54952-1005 / US
05 / HANSEN, Richard, M.
5024 Island View Drive
Oshkosh, WI 54901 / US
06 / NECULESCU, Cristian, M.
713 Kensington Road
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
07 / ROGERS, Sandra, Marie
W2527 Pioneer Court
Appleton, WI 54914 / US
08 / GRUBE, Violet, May
N1473 Keimar Ct.
Greenville, WI 54942 / US
09 / THORESEN, Rhiannon, L.
W2424 Valleywood Lane
Appleton, WI 54915 / US
10 / KILLIAN, Thomas, Michael
293 Maplewood Lane
Sobieski, WI 54171 / US
11 / RICE, Jonathan, K.
5476 Michaels Dr., Apt. 4
Appleton, WI 54913 / US
12 / WALLAJAPET, Palani, Raj, Ramaswami
808 Kensington Road
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
13 / SHEA, Courtney, Eileen
804 Masons Creek Circle
Atlanta, GA 30350 / US
14 / FAIRBANKS, Jason Sybren
7875 Trailside Way
Gainsville, GA 30506 / US
15 / POTNIS, Prasad, Shrikrishna
120 Winford Close
Duluth, GA 30097 / US
16 / PALMER, Randall, J.
106 Ashton Farms Drive
Canton, GA 30115 / US
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/33]Beacham, Annabel Rose
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2009/15]Beacham, Annabel Rose
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2008/33]Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2006/29]Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date04755558.616.06.2004
[2006/29]
WO2004US19449
Priority number, dateUS2003070116104.11.2003         Original published format: US 701161
[2006/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005047389
Date:26.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1680467
Date:19.07.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005
[2006/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1680467
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/10, C09J123/10, B32B27/32
[2006/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/06]
Former [2006/29]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MIT KLEBRIGGEMACHTEM AMORPHEM POLY-ALPHA-OLEFIN VERBUNDENE STRUKTUREN[2006/29]
English:TACKIFIED AMORPHOUS-POLY-ALPHA-OLEFIN-BONDED STRUCTURES[2006/29]
French:STRUCTURES LIEES A DES POLY(ALPHA-OLEFINES) AMORPHES GLUANTES[2006/29]
Entry into regional phase24.02.2006National basic fee paid 
24.02.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
24.02.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/29]
13.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2014Fee for grant paid
28.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.01.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.05.2015  19.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2017/22]
Former [2015/26]
Opponent(s)01  13.05.2015  19.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
18.05.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition20.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0609/17
24.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
04.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]US4749739  (FOSTER BRUCE W [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]JPH01282279  ;
 [X]US2003096896  (WANG BAOYU [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-20 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900131), vol. 0140, no. 53, Database accession no. (C - 0683), & JP1282279 A 19891114 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-15 * abstract *
by applicantUS4749739
 JPH01282278
 US2008096896
 US3849241
 US4340563
 US3692618
 US3802817
 US3338992
 US3341394
 US3502763
 US3502538
 US3542615
 US6638636
 US5336545
 EP0217032
 US5858515
 US4704116
 US6075179
 US4949668