blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1635735 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1635735



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 175
18.08.2004 Drawings International Searching Authority 7
18.08.2004 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
18.08.2004 Description International Searching Authority 9
18.08.2004 Claims International Searching Authority 4
18.08.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
15.11.2004 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
29.12.2004 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 21
29.12.2004 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
14.01.2005 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.01.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29
27.01.2005 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
27.01.2005 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
27.01.2005 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.07.2005 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.07.2005 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.07.2005 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
26.07.2005 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
26.07.2005 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.07.2005 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.07.2005 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.07.2005 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.11.2005 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.12.2005 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
12.01.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
12.01.2006 Description Search / examination 4
12.01.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
12.01.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
24.01.2006 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
01.02.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
08.02.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.02.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
01.03.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
15.03.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
17.03.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
13.12.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.12.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
18.04.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.04.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.04.2008 Description Search / examination 3
21.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
02.05.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.09.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
30.01.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.01.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.01.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
25.05.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
25.05.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
25.05.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.06.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.05.2010 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1