blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1635735


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.10.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2012  [2012/47]
14.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2012  [2012/42]
10.08.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2012  [2012/37]
11.03.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.04.2011  [2011/15]
12.11.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.12.2010  [2010/50]
28.05.2010 No opposition filed within time limit published on  30.06.2010  [2010/26]
21.05.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.06.2010  [2010/25]
14.05.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.06.2010  [2010/24]
07.05.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.06.2010  [2010/23]
30.04.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.06.2010  [2010/22]
16.04.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.05.2010  [2010/20]
02.04.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.05.2010  [2010/18]
26.03.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.04.2010  [2010/17]
12.02.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.03.2010  [2010/11]
05.02.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.03.2010  [2010/10]
19.06.2009 (Expected) grant published on  22.07.2009  [2009/30]
16.06.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.06.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.06.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
23.01.2009 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.11.2008 Change - classification published on  10.12.2008  [2008/50]
13.11.2008 Change - classification published on  10.12.2008  [2008/50]
13.11.2008 Change - German title published on  10.12.2008  [2008/50]
05.09.2008 Change - applicant published on  08.10.2008  [2008/41]
06.05.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.04.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.03.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.12.2007 First examination report
11.12.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.06.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.08.2006 Change - extension states published on  20.09.2006  [2006/38]
05.04.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.03.2006 Change - inventor published on  10.05.2006  [2006/19]
03.02.2006 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.03.2006  [2006/12]
03.02.2006 Request for examination filed published on  22.03.2006  [2006/12]
24.01.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2006 Amendment by applicant
12.02.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
05.01.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
09.11.2004 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.2004 PCT data prior to European publication