Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1635735

EP1635735 - SYSTEM FOR TREATING AN OSTIUM OF A SIDE-BRANCH VESSLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/12]METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING AN OSTIUM OF A SIDE-BRANCH VESSLE
[2008/50]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.05.2010
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic Vascular, Inc.
3576 Unocal Place
Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US
[2009/30]
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
Medtronic Vascular, Inc.
3576 Unocal Place
Santa Rosa CA 95403 / US
Former [2006/12]For all designated states
Medtronic Vascular, Inc.
3576 Unocal Place
Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GOSHGARIAN, Justin
4340 Leafwood Circle West
Santa Rosa, California 95405 / US
 [2006/19]
Former [2006/12]01 / GOSHGARIAN, Justin
2030 Knolls Drive
Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/12]Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date04755611.317.06.2004
[2006/12]
WO2004US19525
Priority number, dateUS2003046471617.06.2003         Original published format: US 464716
[2006/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004112654
Date:29.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1635735
Date:22.03.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004
[2006/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1635735
Date:22.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/84, A61M25/10
[2008/50]
Former International [2006/12]A61F2/06, A61M25/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/12]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES OSTIUMS EINES ABZWEIGENDEN GEFÄSSES[2008/50]
English:SYSTEM FOR TREATING AN OSTIUM OF A SIDE-BRANCH VESSLE[2008/50]
French:SYSTEME POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN ORIFICE D'UN VAISSEAU DE RAMIFICATION LATERALE[2008/50]
Former [2006/12]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES OSTIUMS EINES ABZWEIGENDEN GEFÄSSES
Former [2006/12]METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING AN OSTIUM OF A SIDE-BRANCH VESSLE
Former [2006/12]PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UN ORIFICE D'UN VAISSEAU DE RAMIFICATION LATERALE
Entry into regional phase12.01.2006National basic fee paid 
12.01.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.01.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/12]
13.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2009Fee for grant paid
25.05.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.04.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.07.2009
BE22.07.2009
CY22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IT22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
SK22.07.2009
TR22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
HU23.01.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/42]AT22.07.2009
BE22.07.2009
CY22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IT22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
SK22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
HU23.01.2010
Former [2012/37]AT22.07.2009
BE22.07.2009
CY22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IT22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
SK22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2011/15]AT22.07.2009
BE22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IT22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
SK22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/50]AT22.07.2009
BE22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
SK22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/25]AT22.07.2009
BE22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
SK22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/23]AT22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
SK22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/22]AT22.07.2009
CZ22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
RO22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/20]AT22.07.2009
DK22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/17]AT22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/11]AT22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
ES02.11.2009
Former [2010/10]AT22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
PL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
ES02.11.2009
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US5749890  (SHAKNOVICH ALEXANDER [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9 * figures 1a,1b * * column 4, line 40 - line 47 * * column 6, line 1 - line 5 * * column 6, line 56 - line 60 * * column 7, line 20 - line 24 * [A] 5 [Y] 7,8;
 [X]US6527739  (BIGUS STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 6 *;
 [X]DE19815296  (VALLBRACHT CHRISTIAN [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO02056799  (PARODI JUAN C [AR], et al) [X] 1 * page 10, line 12 - line 23 * * figure 8c *;
 [Y]US6027526  (LIMON TIMOTHY A [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * figures 2,15,16 *;
 [A]US5632762  (MYLER RICHARD K [US]) [A] 1-9 * figure 7 *;
 [A]WO0134061  (ANGIOMED GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 1a-1j * * page 19, line 20 - line 25 *;
 [A]US6013085  (HOWARD JOHN [US]) [A] 1-9 * figure 9 *;
 [A]WO9847446  (BARD GALWAY LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 4d *;
 [A]US2002099406  (ST GERMAIN JON P [US]) [A] 7,8 * paragraph [0033] * * figure 8 *