Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1654610

EP1654610 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING MULTIPLE QUESTIONNAIRE PAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAP AG
Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16
69190 Walldorf / DE
[2006/19]
Inventor(s)01 / TUNNEY, William, Patrick
1598 Avenue des Pins O.
Montreal, Québec H3G 1B4 / CA
 [2010/30]
Former [2006/19]01 / TUNNEY, William, Patrick
1598 Avenue des Pins O.
Montreal, Quebec H3G 1B4 / CA
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/19]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date04755960.423.06.2004
[2006/19]
WO2004US20151
Priority number, dateUS2003062559624.07.2003         Original published format: US 625596
[2006/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005010659
Date:03.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1654610
Date:10.05.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005
[2006/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1654610
Date:28.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.06.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00
[2006/20]
Former International [2006/19]G06F1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN MEHRERER FRAGEBOGEN-SEITEN[2006/19]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFYING MULTIPLE QUESTIONNAIRE PAGES[2006/19]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER DE MULTIPLES PAGES DE QUESTIONNAIRE[2006/19]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2006National basic fee paid 
16.02.2006Search fee paid 
16.02.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/19]
30.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2010Fee for grant paid
17.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.07.2010
BE28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
DK28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
HU28.07.2010
IT28.07.2010
NL28.07.2010
PL28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SE28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
TR28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
GR29.10.2010
ES08.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT28.07.2010
BE28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
DK28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
IT28.07.2010
NL28.07.2010
PL28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SE28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
TR28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
GR29.10.2010
ES08.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
Former [2011/32]AT28.07.2010
BE28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
DK28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
IT28.07.2010
NL28.07.2010
PL28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SE28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
GR29.10.2010
ES08.11.2010
PT29.11.2010
Former [2011/23]AT28.07.2010
BE28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
CZ28.07.2010
DK28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
NL28.07.2010
PL28.07.2010
SE28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
SK28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
GR29.10.2010
PT29.11.2010
Former [2011/19]AT28.07.2010
BE28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
DK28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
NL28.07.2010
PL28.07.2010
SE28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
GR29.10.2010
PT29.11.2010
Former [2011/16]AT28.07.2010
BE28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
NL28.07.2010
PL28.07.2010
SE28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
GR29.10.2010
PT29.11.2010
Former [2011/15]AT28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
NL28.07.2010
PL28.07.2010
SE28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
GR29.10.2010
PT29.11.2010
Former [2011/13]AT28.07.2010
CY28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
NL28.07.2010
PL28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
PT29.11.2010
Former [2011/11]AT28.07.2010
FI28.07.2010
NL28.07.2010
PL28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
PT29.11.2010
Former [2011/08]AT28.07.2010
NL28.07.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19740587  (MEDIDATA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 18 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 30 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 18 - line 47 * * column 5, line 45 - line 53 * * column 6, line 26 - line 30 *;
 [X]US2002107885  (BROOKS EZEKIEL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0049] * * paragraphs [0056] , [0057] *;
 [A]US5121442  (TOGAWA FUMIO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 36 * * column 2, paragraph L - column 3, paragraph 1 *
International search[Y]US4773860  (GANNAWAY THOMAS W [US], et al);
 [Y]US4358279  (LOUSIG-NONT GREGORY M);
 [YP]US6618504  (YOSHINO EIKO [JP])
by applicantDE19740587
 US2002107885