Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1641352

EP1641352 - COMPOSITIONS FOR IMPROVED OXIDATIVE STATUS IN CATS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/14]COMPOSITIONS FOR IMPROVED OXIDATIVE STATUS IN COMPANION ANIMALS
[2010/08]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2019Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
400 Southwest 8th Avenue
Topeka, KS 66603 / US
[2017/19]
Former [2010/36]For all designated states
Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
400 Southwest 8th Street
Topeka, KS 66603 / US
Former [2006/14]For all designated states
Hill's Pet Nutrition Inc.
400 Southwest 8th Street
Topeka, KS 66603 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FRIESEN, Kim, Gene
2140 SW Arvonia Place
Topeka, KS 66614 / US
02 / JEWELL, Dennis, Edward
1752 E980
Lawrence, KS 66049 / US
 [2006/14]
Representative(s)Jenkins, Peter David , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/25]
Former [2009/13]Jenkins, Peter David , et al
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2006/14]Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F. , et al
Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date04756796.102.07.2004
[2006/14]
WO2004US21929
Priority number, dateUS20030485194P07.07.2003         Original published format: US 485194 P
[2006/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005006878
Date:27.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1641352
Date:05.04.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005
[2006/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1641352
Date:08.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1641352
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.01.2005
ClassificationInternational:A23K20/142, A23K50/40
[2018/46]
Former International [2006/14]A23K1/18, A23K1/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/25]
Former [2006/14]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR EINEN VERBESSERTEN OXIDATIONSSTATUS BEI KATZEN[2010/08]
English:COMPOSITIONS FOR IMPROVED OXIDATIVE STATUS IN CATS[2010/08]
French:COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LE STATUT D'OXYDATION CHEZ DES CHATS[2010/08]
Former [2006/14]ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR EINEN VERBESSERTEN OXIDATIONSSTATUS BEI HOBBYTIEREN
Former [2006/14]COMPOSITIONS FOR IMPROVED OXIDATIVE STATUS IN COMPANION ANIMALS
Former [2006/14]COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LE STATUT D'OXYDATION CHEZ DES ANIMAUX DE COMPAGNIE
Entry into regional phase19.12.2005National basic fee paid 
19.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/14]
02.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.05.2010Fee for grant paid
20.05.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.06.2011  15.07.2011  ADMISSIBLE
THE IAMS COMPANY
8060 South Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, OH 45040 / US
Opponent's representative
Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB, et al
Ganghoferstraße 68 B
80339 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/42]
Opponent(s)01  08.06.2011  15.07.2011  ADMISSIBLE
THE IAMS COMPANY
8060 South Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, OH 45040 / US
Opponent's representative
Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch, et al
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Straße 98
80339 München / DE
Former [2016/08]
Opponent(s)01  08.06.2011  15.07.2011  ADMISSIBLE
THE IAMS COMPANY
8060 South Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, OH 45040 / US
Opponent's representative
Koch, Andreas, et al
Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Straße 98
80339 München / DE
Former [2013/08]
Opponent(s)01  08.06.2011  15.07.2011  ADMISSIBLE
THE IAMS COMPANY
8060 South Mason-Montgomery Road
Mason, OH 45040 / US
Opponent's representative
Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2013/02]
Opponent(s)01  08.06.2011  15.07.2011  ADMISSIBLE
THE IAMS COMPANY
7250 Poe Avenue
Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US
Opponent's representative
Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2011/28]
Opponent(s)01  08.06.2011   
THE IAMS COMPANY
7250 Poe Avenue
Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US
Opponent's representative
Kellenberger, Jakob
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
22.07.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.11.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.03.2013Date of oral proceedings
10.04.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2018Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2018Reply to a communication from the opposition division
22.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2018Reply to a communication from the opposition division
23.10.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.11.2018Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.02.2019Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.05.2019Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition07.05.2013Appeal received No.  T1139/13
07.05.2013Statement of grounds filed
23.05.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
23.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
02.06.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
08.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
08.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
HU08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
TR08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
IE02.07.2011
LU02.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
IT02.07.2017
ES03.07.2017
DK31.07.2017
NL01.08.2017
[2019/13]
Former [2018/41]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
HU08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
TR08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
IE02.07.2011
LU02.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
IT02.07.2017
DK31.07.2017
NL01.08.2017
Former [2018/35]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
HU08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
TR08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
IE02.07.2011
LU02.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
DK31.07.2017
NL01.08.2017
Former [2018/23]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
HU08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
TR08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
IE02.07.2011
LU02.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
NL01.08.2017
Former [2013/45]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
HU08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
TR08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
IE02.07.2011
LU02.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2013/44]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
TR08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
IE02.07.2011
LU02.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2013/42]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
BG08.12.2010
GR09.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
IE02.07.2011
LU02.07.2011
CH31.07.2011
LI31.07.2011
MC31.07.2011
Former [2011/32]AT08.09.2010
BE08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
RO08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
Former [2011/24]AT08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
PT10.01.2011
Former [2011/23]AT08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
CZ08.09.2010
EE08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
SK08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
Former [2011/15]AT08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
SE08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
GR09.12.2010
Former [2011/13]AT08.09.2010
CY08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
Former [2011/11]AT08.09.2010
FI08.09.2010
PL08.09.2010
SI08.09.2010
Former [2011/08]AT08.09.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0044375  (MARS UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,8-12,14,18,22,23 * examples 14,15,17; claims 14-16 *;
 [XA]GB1497211  (SANDOZ LTD) [X] 11-15,18,19 * page 1, line 35 - line 40; claim 2 * [A] 16,17,20,21;
 [XA]US5883083  (HARLESS STANELY JAMES [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,12,22,23 * column 1, line 13 - line 26 * * column 4, line 1 - line 13 * [A] 10,14,18;
 [X]WO03037103  (NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY [US]) [X] 11-13,18,19,22,23 * claims 22,38 *;
 [X]CA2285490  (SOLE MICHAEL J [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,12,14,18,22,23 * claims 1,3 *;
 [XA]ZA9605149  (DAVIS HENRY JOHN, et al) [X] 11-13 * page 6, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5; example - * [A] 1-5,14,15,18,19;
 [XA]WO03015695  (MARS INC [US], et al) [X] 11,12,18,22,23 * example 1 * [A] 18;
 [XA]GB2315674  (CLEEVE RICHARD JOHN [GB]) [X] 11-13,18,22,24 * page 2, line 26 - line 28; table 2 * [A] 1-9,14-17,19-21;
 [XA]DE20104950U  (NEUENDORF ERNST GUENTER [DE]) [X] 11-14,18 * claim 4 * [A] 1-5,15,19;
 [XA]US4267195  (BOUDREAU JAMES C, et al) [X] 11-13,18 * column 3, line 7 - line 13 * [A] 16;
 [X]US3952115  (DAMICO RALPH ANTHONY, et al) [X] 1,2,11,14,18 * example IV *;
 [PX]GB2385768  (DODSON & HORRELL LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-3,8-12,14,18,22,23 * page 1, paragraph 4; example -; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO0235943  (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,9,11,14,18,22,23 * claims 1,7 *
ExaminationWO0245525
    - TEETER, R. G. ET AL, "Methionine and Cystine Requirements of the Cat", JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (1978), no. 108, pages 291 - 295
by applicantWO0044375
 GB1497211
 WO0245525
    - TEETER ET AL., JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (1978), vol. 108, pages 291 - 295
OppositionUS2003054048
 EP0655245
    - FETTMAN M.J. ET AL, "EFFECTS OF DIETARY CYSTEINE ON BLOOD SULFUR AMINO ACID, GLUTATHIONE, AND MALONDIALDEHYDE CONCENTRATIONS IN CATS", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF VETERINARY RESEA, Pubmed Abstract nr.10188815, American Veterinary Medicine Association, US, (19990301), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 328 - 333, XP XP009026406
    - Hayes K.C., "Taurine Nutrition", Nutrition Research Review, Massachusetts, USA, (19880000), pages 99 - 113
    - Debra L. Zoran, "The carnivore connection to nutrition in cats", Journal of the American Veterinary Medical Association, College of Veterinary Medicine, Texas A&M University, US, (20021201), vol. 221, no. 11, doi:https://doi.org/10.2460/javma.2002.221.1559, pages 1559 - 1567