Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1651030

EP1651030 - METHOD FOR GENETIC IMPROVEMENT OF TERMINAL BOARS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.06.2009
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Newsham Choice Genetics, LLC
800 North Lindbergh Boulevard
St Louis, MO 63167 / US
[2008/17]
Former [2006/18]For all designated states
Monsanto Technology LLC
800 North Lindbergh Boulevard
St. Louis, MO 63137 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BUTTRAM, Samuel, T.
417 Morning Oaks Court
Ellisville, MO 63021 / US
02 / LOHUIS, Michael, M.
12959 Beaver Dam Road
Des Peres, MO 63131 / US
03 / GU, Youping
14162 Ladue Road
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
04 / WAGNER, Christina, M.
6881 Country Estates
Columbia, IL 62236 / US
 [2006/18]
Representative(s)Holmberg-Schwindt, Tor Martin , et al
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB
P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/26]Holmberg, Martin Tor , et al
Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Former [2006/18]Bosch, Henry
Monsanto Services International SA Avenue de Tervuren 270-272
1150 Bruxelles / BE
Application number, filing date04757318.326.07.2004
[2006/18]
WO2004US24168
Priority number, dateUS20030492395P04.08.2003         Original published format: US 492395 P
[2006/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005015989
Date:24.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1651030
Date:03.05.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005
[2006/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:A01K67/02
[2006/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR DIE GENETISCHE VERBESSERUNG VON ENDEBERN[2006/18]
English:METHOD FOR GENETIC IMPROVEMENT OF TERMINAL BOARS[2006/18]
French:PROCEDE DESTINE A AMELIORER GENETIQUEMENT LES VERRATS EN PHASE TERMINALE[2006/18]
Entry into regional phase02.02.2006National basic fee paid 
02.02.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/18]
11.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/30]
02.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search   [ ] BERTHELOT F. ET AL.: 'Birth of piglets after OPS vitrification and transfer of compacted morula stage embryos with intact zona pellucida' REPROD. NUTR. DEV. vol. 41, 2001, pages 267 - 272
International search[XY]WO0193676  (US AGRICULTURE [US]) [X] 66 * page 4, lines 9-17 * * examples 2-4 * [Y] 67-69;
 [Y]WO0235924  (SUIS TM INC [BS], et al) [Y] 66-69 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 17 *;
 [Y]  - WEBB J, "New technology for genetic improvement of lifestock", THE PORK INDUSTRY AND PUBLIC ISSUES, (20010405), pages 27 - 41, URL: http://www.londonswineconference.ca/proceedings/2001/LSC2001_JWebb.pdf, (20041125), XP002307851 [Y] 66-68 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - LI J ET AL, "Technical note: Porcine non-surgical embryo transfer", JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 74, no. 9, ISSN 0021-8812, pages 2263 - 2268, XP002307852 [Y] 66-69 * page 2266, paragraph L *
 [Y]  - ELLIS M, EASTER RA AND WOLTER B, "The current status and future for productivity improvements in swine", INTERNET ARTICLE, (1997), URL: http://www.aces.uiuc.edu/~ILwfood/papers/pigpap.PDF, (20041125), XP002307853 [Y] 66-69 * abstract *
 [Y]  - BRUESSOW KLAUS-PETER ET AL, "In vitro technologies related to pig embryo transfer", REPRODUCTION NUTRITION DEVELOPMENT, (200009), vol. 40, no. 5, ISSN 0926-5287, pages 469 - 480, XP002307854 [Y] 66-69 * page 470, paragraph 2. * * page 475, paragraph 7. *
 [Y]  - SMITS H, "Non surgical embryo transfer (ns-ET) in pigs", ADVANCES IN PORK PRODUCTION, (2002), vol. 13, pages 239 - 245, XP002307855 [Y] 66-69 * abstract *