Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1615862

EP1615862 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR CONVERSION OF ORGANIC, WASTE, OR LOW-VALUE MATERIALS INTO USEFUL PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.03.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee 
27.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Synpet Teknoloji Gelistirme A.S.
Yildirim Oguz Goker Cad.
Orkide Sok. No: 1 Oda No: 7
Besiktas Akatlar
Istanbul / TR
[2017/06]
Former [2006/03]For all designated states
AB-CWT, LLC
460 Hempstead Avenue
West Hempstead, NY 11552 / US
Inventor(s)01 / APPEL, Brian, S.
233 Locust Street
West Hempstead, NY 11552 / US
02 / ADAMS, Terry, N.
5950 Beverly Avenue, NE
Tacoma, WA 98422 / US
03 / ROBERTS, Michael J.
950 Willow Street
Itasca, DuPage County, IL 60143 / US
04 / LANGE, William, F.
1920-B Wilmette Avenue
Wilmette, IL 60091 / US
05 / FREISS, James, H.
25 Quaker Hill Road
Stony Brook, NY 11790 / US
06 / EINFELDT, Craig, Timothy
10 Medway Circle
Collegeville, PA 19426 / US
07 / CARNESI, Michael, Charles
1017 Brook Avenue
Secane, PA 19018 / US
 [2006/03]
Representative(s)Gibbs, Richard , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/03]Naismith, Robert Stewart , et al
Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE
Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date04758275.425.03.2004
[2006/03]
WO2004US09037
Priority number, dateUS20030458520P28.03.2003         Original published format: US 458520 P
US2003071707618.11.2003         Original published format: US 717076
US2003071683718.11.2003         Original published format: US 716837
US2003071683918.11.2003         Original published format: US 716839
[2006/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004087619
Date:14.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/42]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1615862
Date:18.01.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004
[2006/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.04.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07C1/00, C10L1/04, C02F11/18, C02F11/10, C10G1/00, C10G9/00
[2011/24]
Former International [2008/16]C07C1/00, C10L1/04
Former International [2007/15]C07C1/00
Former International [2006/03]C05G1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/03]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR DIE UMWANDLUNG VON ORGANISCHEM ABFALL ODER MINDERWERTIGEM MATERIAL IN NÜTZLICHE PRODUKTE[2006/03]
English:PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR CONVERSION OF ORGANIC, WASTE, OR LOW-VALUE MATERIALS INTO USEFUL PRODUCTS[2006/03]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CONVERSION DE MATIERES ORGANIQUES, DECHETS OU PRODUITS DE FAIBLE VALEUR EN PRODUITS UTILES[2006/03]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2005National basic fee paid 
27.10.2005Search fee paid 
27.10.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.2005Examination requested  [2006/03]
04.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
25.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination05.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0684/17
06.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
17.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.08.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
24.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201916   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0204354  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1-13,31-45 * page 1, lines 1-3 * * page 2, lines 11-20 * * page 4, lines 8-26 * * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 11 * * page 8, lines 8-12,19-34 * * example - * [A] 14-30;
 [XA]US5639934  (YAMASAKI NAKAMICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,10,13-19,35-38,40-45 * the whole document * [A] 9,11,12,20-34,39;
 [XA]US4089773  (ESPENSCHEID WILTON F) [X] 1-14,20,21,33,35-45 * the whole document * [A] 15-19,22-32,34
International search[P]US2006004237  (APPEL BRIAN S [US], et al);
 [P]US2005113611  (ADAMS TERRY N [US], et al)